Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-34156

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:A Benjamin Goldgar
Case #: 1:19-ap-00133
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2019
Terminated:May 14, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Sarah Duff
1234 N Grove Ave
Oak Park, IL 60302
Represented By
Sarah Duff
contact info
Plaintiff
Discover Bank
180 North LaSalle Street, Suite 2400
Chicago, IL 60601
Represented By
Monette W Cope
Weltman Weinberg & Reis Co Lpa
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:06 PM CDT
Tuesday, May 14, 2019
11 11 court Close Adversary Case Tue 05/14 8:01 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-133 Closed . (Rodarte, Aida)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2019
10 10 1 pgs order Default Judgment Tue 05/14 8:00 AM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Related [+]. Signed on 5/13/2019. (Rodarte, Aida)
Related: [-] 9
Monday, April 29, 2019
9 9 7 pgs motion Default Judgment Mon 04/29 2:08 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Monette W Cope on behalf of Discover Bank. Hearing scheduled for 5/13/2019 at 10:00 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 642, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Cope, Monette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, April 22, 2019
8 8 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Mon 04/22 10:09 AM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 642 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 04/22/2019. (Castellano, Nancy)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, March 21, 2019
7 7 2 pgs cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 03/21 7:37 AM
Summons Service Executed on Sarah Duff Related [+]. (Cope, Monette)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Monday, March 18, 2019
6 6 utility U - Corrective Entry Mon 03/18 2:40 PM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: PDF Error, See entry 5 Related [+]. (Sirmons, Dornesa)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
5 5 24 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/18 2:12 PM
Amended Complaint by Monette W Cope on behalf of Discover Bank against Sarah Duff. Related [+]. (Cope, Monette)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, March 15, 2019
4 4 misc Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Form 1040) Fri 03/15 2:36 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Filed by Monette W Cope on behalf of Discover Bank Related [+]. (Cope, Monette)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
3 3 crditcrd none Fri 03/15 2:34 PM
Receipt of Complaint 19-00133 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 39296485. Fee Amount $ 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 03/15 2:29 PM
Summons Issued on Sarah Duff Answer Due 04/15/2019 (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/15 2:29 PM
Adversary case 19-00133 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)): Complaint by Discover Bank against Sarah Duff. Fee Amount $350. Status hearing to be held on 4/22/2019 at 09:30 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 642, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Cope, Monette)
Related: [-]