Owobu v. Westlake Services, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-34196
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-34196
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:19-ap-03358 |
Nature of Suit | 1 null 21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2019 |
Terminated: | Feb 10, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Westlake Services, LLC
4751 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 100
Los Angles, CA 90010 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fidelis Owobu
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:10 PM CDT |
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
48 | 48
trustee
Remark (batch)
Tue 10/17 1:08 PM
Remark: Case Reassigned from Judge Jones to Judge Norman . (RobbieWestmoreland) |
|
Wednesday, March 04, 2020 | ||
47 | 47
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 03/04 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/04/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, March 02, 2020 | ||
46 | 46
notice
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript (Form)
Mon 03/02 8:24 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to45 Transcript. Parties notified (dhan) |
|
Sunday, March 01, 2020 | ||
45 | 45
court
Transcript
Sun 03/01 7:25 PM
Transcript RE: Partial Transcript of Hearing (Testimony of Said Nasr Only) held on October 1, 2019 before Judge David R. Jones. Transcript is available for viewing in the Clerk's Office. Filed by Transcript access will be restricted through 06/1/2020. (mhen) |
|
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
44 | 44
misc
AO435 Transcript Request
Fri 02/21 11:07 AM
AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM (14-Day) by Fidelis Owobu. This is to order a transcript of Witness Testimony 10/1/2019 before Judge David R. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas (Filed By Fidelis Owobu ). (Moll, Robert) |
|
Thursday, February 13, 2020 | ||
43 | 43
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 02/13 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 02/13/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, February 10, 2020 | ||
42 | 42
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Tue 02/11 9:26 AM
Order of Dismissal Signed on 2/10/2020 (VrianaPortillo) |
|
court
Courtroom Minutes (Text)
Mon 02/10 9:42 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 9:30 AM. Appearances: Charles Biles, Afton Sands The parties appeared by phone and announced that they have settled. The Court to enter an order dismissing and closing this adversary. (aalo) |
||
Friday, October 18, 2019 | ||
court
Certificate of Notice
Fri 10/18 12:47 PM
Certificate of Email Notice. The parties have contacted the Courts case manager and indicated that they have agreed in principle to resolve the matter. The Court will defer its ruling while the parties attempt to do so. Movant to notice all interested parties and file a certificate of service with the court The Court has set a Status Hearing for 2/10/2020 at 09:30 AM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). (aalo) |
||
Thursday, October 10, 2019 | ||
41 | 41
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 10/10 11:58 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 10/10/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, October 08, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
order
Generic Order
Tue 10/08 3:40 PM
Order Approving Joint Pre-Trial Stipulation as to the Admissibility of Certain Exhibits Signed on 10/8/2019 (VrianaPortillo) |
|
Tuesday, October 01, 2019 | ||
court
Courtroom Minutes (Text)
Tue 10/01 3:53 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 9:07 AM. Appearances: Robert Moll for Fidelis Owobu, Dunham Biles for Westlake Services, LLC, Afton Sands for Nations Equipment Finance, LLC Witnesses: Fidelis Owobu, Olusegen Odunsi, Samson Ukaegbu, Liliana Landa, Said Nasr. By agreement the Court admitted the following exhibits: Plaintiffs Exhibits 1, 1A, 1B, 1C, 1D, 1E, 1F, 1G, 1H, 1J, 1K, 1L, 1M, 1N, 2, 2A, 2B, 2C, 2D, 2E, 3, 4, 6 and 7. Westlake and Nations Exhibits 1, 1A, 1B, 1C, 2, 2A, 2B, 2C, 2D, 2E, 2F, 2G, 2H, 2I, 2J, 2K, 7, 8, 9, 10, 12 and 17. Trial commenced and the Court heard testimony from the witnesses. The parties to submit legal briefs by 10/17/2019 and may contact the Courts Case Manager to request the Court to rule or defer ruling. (VrianaPortillo) |
||
Friday, September 27, 2019 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Brief
Fri 09/27 8:39 AM
Brief (Filed By Fidelis Owobu ). (Moll, Robert) |
|
Friday, September 20, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
answer
Objection
Fri 09/20 7:06 PM
Objection to Defendants' Trial Exhibit List . Filed by Fidelis Owobu (Moll, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
37 | 37
answer
Objection
Fri 09/20 4:54 PM
Objection to Plaintiff's Evidence . Filed by Nations Equipment Finance, LLC, Nations Fund I, LLC, Westlake Services, LLC (Sands-Puryear, Afton) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
36 | 36
misc
Stipulation
Fri 09/20 3:53 PM
Stipulation By Nations Equipment Finance, LLC, Nations Fund I, LLC, Fidelis Owobu, Westlake Services, LLC and. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Nations Equipment Finance, LLC, Nations Fund I, LLC, Fidelis Owobu, Westlake Services, LLC ). (Sands-Puryear, Afton) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Sunday, August 04, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 08/04 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 08/04/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
order
Continue Hearing
Fri 08/02 4:54 PM
Order Granting Motion To Continue/Reschedule Hearing O , Granting Emergency Motion Signed on 8/1/2019. Hearing scheduled for 10/1/2019 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). (emiller) |
|
33 | 33
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 08/01 11:57 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 08/01/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Emergency Motion
Wed 07/31 3:15 PM
Supplemental Emergency Motion Reply in Support of Joint Emergency Motion For Continuance Or, Alternatively, For Immediate Deposition Filed by Defendant Westlake Services, LLC (Platt, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit D | ||
31 | 31
answer
Response
Wed 07/31 11:08 AM
Response . Filed by Fidelis Owobu (Moll, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
30 | 30
motion
Continue Hearing
Wed 07/31 8:50 AM
Joint Motion to Continue Hearing On . Filed by Defendant Westlake Services, LLC (Platt, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 23, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
order
Generic Order
Tue 07/30 3:11 PM
Order Granting Joint Motion Requesting Rule 29 Agreement to be Treated as Rule 26(f) Report Signed on 7/23/2019 (aalo) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Exhibit List
Wed 07/17 6:14 PM
Witness List, Exhibit List (Filed By Nations Equipment Finance, LLC, Nations Fund I, LLC, Westlake Services, LLC ). (Sands-Puryear, Afton) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Notice
Wed 07/17 6:05 PM
Notice of Certification of Business Records under Federal Rule of Evidence 902 . Filed by Nations Equipment Finance, LLC, Nations Fund I, LLC, Westlake Services, LLC(Sands-Puryear, Afton) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Exhibit List
Wed 07/17 9:19 AM
Exhibit List (Filed By Fidelis Owobu ). (Moll, Robert) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
court
Courtroom Minutes (CM)
Thu 06/20 2:53 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 2:37 PM. Appearances: Robert Moll for Fielis Owobu, Dunham Biles (via phone), Mark Platt (via phone) for Westlake Services, LL, Afton Sands (via phone). The court approved the Joint Motion Requesting Rule 26 Agreement be Treated as Rule 26(f) Report. Proposed order submitted at docket no. 24 was signed on the record. Trial date set for 8/12/2019 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). (VrianaPortillo) |
|
Friday, June 14, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Proposed Order
Fri 06/14 2:49 PM
Proposed Order RE: Requesting Rule 29 Agreement be Treated as Rule 26(f) Report (Filed By Nations Equipment Finance, LLC, Nations Fund I, LLC, Fidelis Owobu, Westlake Services, LLC ) (Sands-Puryear, Afton) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
23 | 23
motion
Generic Motion
Fri 06/14 2:37 PM
Joint Motion Requesting Rule 29 Agreement be Treated as Rule 26(f) Report Filed by Defendants Nations Equipment Finance, LLC, Nations Fund I, LLC, Westlake Services, LLC, Plaintiff Fidelis Owobu (Sands-Puryear, Afton) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Saturday, June 01, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 06/01 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/01/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
order
Adversary Order Setting Hearing
Thu 05/30 4:00 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 6/20/2019 at 02:30 PM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). (aalo) |
|
Friday, May 24, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
answer
Reply
Fri 05/24 2:10 PM
Joint Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint . Filed by Westlake Services, LLC (Biles, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 | ||
Friday, May 17, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
answer
Response
Fri 05/17 2:16 PM
Joint Response . Filed by Westlake Services, LLC (Biles, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order Denying Plaintiff's 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss | ||
18 | 18
answer
Response
Fri 05/17 9:13 AM
Opposition Response to Defendants' Joint Motion to Strike . Filed by Fidelis Owobu (Moll, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 10, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 05/10 3:28 PM
Amended Answer to Complaint Filed by Nations Equipment Finance, LLC, Nations Fund I, LLC (Sands-Puryear, Afton) |
|
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 05/10 2:49 PM
Amended Answer to Complaint Filed by Westlake Services, LLC (Biles, Charles) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Strike
Fri 05/10 2:35 PM
Joint Motion to Strike. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days . Filed by Nations Equipment Finance, LLC, Nations Fund I, LLC, Westlake Services, LLC (Biles, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order proposed order to strike | ||
Friday, April 26, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss/Withdraw Document
Fri 04/26 9:17 AM
Motion to Dismiss/Withdraw Document . Filed by Fidelis Owobu (Moll, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
13 | 13
answer
Response
Fri 04/26 9:11 AM
Opposition Response . Filed by Fidelis Owobu (Moll, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 04/26 9:06 AM
Second Amended Complaint (Moll, Robert) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/19 3:09 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Nations Equipment Finance, LLC, Nations Fund I, LLC (Sands-Puryear, Afton) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/19 3:09 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Westlake Services, LLC (Biles, Charles) |
|
9 | 9
cmp
Counterclaim
Fri 04/19 2:56 PM
Joint Counterclaim by Nations Equipment Finance, LLC, Westlake Services, LLC against Fidelis Owobu (Biles, Charles) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 04/19 2:33 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Westlake Services, LLC (Biles, Charles) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Response
Fri 04/05 10:30 AM
Opposition Response . Filed by Fidelis Owobu (Moll, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 29, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 03/29 8:39 AM
First Amended Complaint (Moll, Robert) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Mon 03/25 4:41 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Westlake Services, LLC (Platt, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 20, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 03/20 11:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/20/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Mon 03/18 6:00 AM
|
|
Sunday, March 17, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Statement
Sun 03/17 5:44 PM
Statement Rule 7007.1 Corporate Ownership Statement (Filed By Westlake Services, LLC ). (Platt, Mark) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal [system event]
Sun 03/17 5:22 PM
Adversary case 19-03358 Nature of Suit: (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)),(21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) Notice of Removal Fidelis Owobu. Fee Amount $350 (Platt, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Stipulated Order) | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B (Copies of pleadings from state court action) |