Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:George Caram Steeh
Referred: Mona K Majzoub
Case #: 2:19-cv-10811
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2019
Terminated:May 10, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Sep 15, 2019 5:52 AM EDT
Defendant
Borgers Ohio, Inc.
4400 Easton Commons Way Suite 125
Columbus, OH 43219
Represented By
John B. Kopf, III
Thopson Hine LLP
contact info
Defendant
Borgers USA Corp.
17490 Brookwood Parkway
Vance, AL 35490
Represented By
John B. Kopf, III
Thopson Hine LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Howa USA Holdings, Inc.
25125 Regency Drive
Novi, MI 48375
Represented By
Jay M. Berger
Clark Hill (detroit)
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 10, 2019
11 11 notice Voluntary Dismissal Fri 05/10 11:11 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Howa USA Holdings, Inc. With Prejudice (Berger, Jay)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2019
10 10 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/11 12:27 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to respond to1 Complaint Response due by 5/10/2019 Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
minutes Status Conference Wed 04/03 10:02 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge George Caram Steeh: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/2/2019. Settlement pending. (MBea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2019
9 9 notice Appear* Thu 03/28 11:10 AM
NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 4/2/2019 @ 10:00 AM before District Judge George Caram Steeh (LBar)
Related: [-]
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Thu 03/28 11:12 AM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Hearing on Motion for TRO set for March 28, 2019 @ 1:30 pm is Cancelled. re6 Notice of Hearing on Motion (LBar)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2019
8 8 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/22 4:15 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Borgers Ohio, Inc. served on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019; Borgers USA Corp. served on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019. (Berger, Jay)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Attorney Appearance Fri 03/22 9:38 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John B. Kopf, III appearing on behalf of Borgers Ohio, Inc., Borgers USA Corp. (Kopf, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2019
6 6 notice Hearing on Motion* Thu 03/21 12:12 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING on4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2019 01:30 PM before District Judge George Caram Steeh in Courtroom #1080 (10th Floor) (MBea)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Thu 03/21 12:10 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge George Caram Steeh: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/21/2019. Set hearing on motion for TRO for 3/28 at 1:30 pm. (MBea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2019
5 5 notice Appear* Tue 03/19 3:41 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 3/21/2019 09:30 AM before District Judge George Caram Steeh, plaintiff's counsel to arrange call to the court. (MBea)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Temporary Restraining Order Tue 03/19 3:07 PM
Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Howa USA Holdings, Inc.. (Berger, Jay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Temporary Restraining Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Verified Complaint
3 3 service Summons Issued* Tue 03/19 2:13 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Borgers Ohio, Inc.* (DPer)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued* Tue 03/19 2:13 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Borgers USA Corp.* (DPer)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Tue 03/19 2:10 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Howa USA Holdings, Inc. against Borgers Ohio, Inc., Borgers USA Corp.. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7159285 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Berger, Jay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Supply Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Termination,
Att: 4 Index of Exhibits 3 - Clark Hill Demand for Return,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4- Borgers' Response letter
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Tue 03/19 2:12 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (DPer)
Related: [-]