New Jersey District Court
Judge:Robert B Kugler
Referred: Ann Marie Donio
Case #: 1:19-cv-08751
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2019
Terminated:Jun 18, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 11, 2019 4:54 AM EDT
Defendant
WILDWOOD CITY MUNICIPAL COURT
Plaintiff
FREDERICK A. RALSTON
P.O. BOX 18053
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19147


Docket last updated: 55 minutes ago
Friday, June 18, 2021
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 06/18 8:24 AM
***Civil Case Terminated per Order #6. (dd, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 03, 2021
6 6 2 pgs order Order Granting/Denying In Forma Pauperis Thu 06/03 3:21 PM
Granting Application for In forma pauperis and dismissing the complaint without prejudice. Granting Plaintiff leave to file an Amended Complaint no later than June 16, 2021. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/3/2021. (pr, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2019
5 5 misc Letter Tue 08/20 11:15 AM
Letter from FREDERICK A. RALSTON dated 8/19/2019. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2019
4 4 misc Exhibit (to Document) Mon 05/06 11:26 AM
Exhibit to1 Complaint Received re: Signature page by FREDERICK A. RALSTON. (cry, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2019
3 3 misc Application to Proceed IFP Thu 04/18 11:03 AM
APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by FREDERICK A. RALSTON. (cry, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2019
2 2 misc Letter: Filing Fee or IFP due Wed 03/20 10:16 AM
Clerk's Letter: Complaint not accompanied by the filing fee or application to proceed in forma pauperis. (ssp, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2019
1 1 3 pgs service Complaint Received Wed 03/20 10:14 AM
Complaint Received.. Complaint not signed. NO FF/IFP.(ssp, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Envelope