Original Case: 3:18-cv-00009

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:19-cv-15511
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2019
Terminated:Jun 22, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 24, 2020 1:33 AM PDT
Defendant
VISHAL D. JANGLA
Defendant
SAN MATEO COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
Defendant
CITY OF SAN MATEO
Defendant
NICOLAS RYAN
Defendant - Appellant
JEFFREY S. CICHOCKI
Represented By
Fletcher C. Alford
Gordon Rees LLP
contact info
Ryan Polk
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Alexander Francuzenko
Cook Craig & Francuzenko, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JOHN FINKELSTEIN
Represented By
Mark E. Merin
LAW OFFICE OF MARK E. MERIN
contact info
Julius Finkelstein
Law Office of Julius L. Finkelstein
contact info
Paul H. Masuhara III
LAW OFFICE OF MARK E. MERIN
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JENNIFER FINKELSTEIN
Represented By
Mark E. Merin
LAW OFFICE OF MARK E. MERIN
contact info
Julius Finkelstein
Law Office of Julius L. Finkelstein
contact info
Paul H. Masuhara III
LAW OFFICE OF MARK E. MERIN
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/24/2020 1:31 AM PDT
Wednesday, March 20, 2019
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/27/2019. Transcript ordered by 04/19/2019. Transcript due 05/20/2019. Appellant Jeffrey S. Cichocki opening brief due 06/28/2019. Appellees Jennifer Finkelstein and John Finkelstein answering brief due 07/29/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11236572] (RT) [Entered: 03/20/2019 04:49 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter
Att: 2 1 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 3 22 pgs Case Opening Packet