Case Filed:Feb 21, 2019
Terminated:Dec 12, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Mar 23, 2019 3:13 AM EDT
Defendant
Bryan Paul Winquist (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
William M. Gilmore
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 9:55 PM EDT
Thursday, February 21, 2019
1 1 6 pgs INDICTMENT The foreperson's signature has been redacted pursuant to the E-Government Act. The unredacted version of this document has been filed under seal. as to Bryan Paul Winquist (1) count(s) 1, 2. (Gessner, M.)
Related: [-]
2 2 Unredacted Document1 Indictment. (Gessner, M.)
Related: [-]
3 3 Warrant Requested by USA as to Bryan Paul Winquist. (Gessner, M.)
Related: [-]
4 4 Arrest Warrant Issued by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court in case as to Bryan Paul Winquist. Original to US Marshal's Office for service. (Gessner, M.)
Related: [-]
5 5 Penalty Sheet (Selected Participants Only) as to Bryan Paul Winquist. (Gessner, M.)
Related: [-]