City of Nettleton, Mississippi v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45151 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1391 Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Mississippi Northern, 1:19-cv-00050 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:18 PM EST |
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Nettleton, Mississippi
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:39 PM EDT |
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla) [Transferred from msnd on 3/25/2019.] | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1650689, filed by City of Nettleton, Mississippi. (jla) [Transferred from msnd on 3/25/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Thursday, March 21, 2019 | ||
2 | 2 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - Case Transferred to Northern District of Ohio. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. CASE CLOSED. (jtm) [Transferred from msnd on 3/25/2019.] | |
Monday, March 25, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Mississippi Northern. Case number 1:19-cv-00050. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |