Doe 1 et al v. United States Olympic Committee
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Philip A Brimmer |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-00902 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 20:1681 Title IX Educational Amendments 1992 |
Case Filed: | Mar 26, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 09, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 22, 2019 2:45 AM MDT |
Defendant
Pisei Whitney Ping
|
|
Defendant
James L. Easton
|
|
Defendant
John S. Hendricks
|
|
Defendant
Nina M. Kemppel
|
|
Defendant
Susanne D. Lyons
|
|
Defendant
William C. Marlot
|
|
Defendant
Mary R. McCagg
|
|
Defendant
Steven M. Mesler
|
|
Defendant
Dave W. Ogrean
|
|
Defendant
Lawrence F. Probst
|
|
Defendant
Angela M. Ruggiero
|
|
Defendant
United States Olympic Committee
|
|
Defendant
Kevin M. White
|
|
Defendant
Robert L. Wood
|
|
Defendant
Alan Ashley
|
|
Defendant
Daniel L. Doctoroff
|
|
Defendant
Anita L. DeFrantz
|
|
Defendant
Ursula M. Burns
|
|
Defendant
Larry Buendorf
|
|
Defendant
Robert Bowlsby
|
|
Defendant
Scott Blackmun
|
|
Defendant
James M. Benson
|
|
Defendant
Robert J. Bach
|
|
Plaintiff
Jane MPW Doe 13
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane RAE Doe 25
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane RAD Doe 24
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane RAC Doe 23
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane JJF Doe 22
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane CT Doe 21
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane KK Doe 20
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane MLG Doe 2
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane LD Doe 19
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane BD Doe 18
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane MN Doe 17
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane KM Doe 15
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane KN Doe 14
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane SM Doe 9
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane RK Doe 12
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane KJ Doe 11
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
C.S.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane BR Doe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane LH Doe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane NT Doe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Doe AA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe PJ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane ME Doe 10
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane RGC Doe 1
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane RS Doe 39
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane RAG Doe 27
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane ALC Doe 29
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane LVB Doe 3
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane BH Doe 30
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane DC Doe 31
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane KRA Doe 32
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane AW Doe 33
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane AG Doe 34
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane CP Doe 35
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane TB Doe 36
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane KB Doe 37
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane MH Doe 38
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane RAF Doe 26
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane GK Doe 4
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane NLF-2 Doe 40
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane NLF-4 Doe 41
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane SAF Doe 42
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane RG Doe 46
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane TMB Doe 47
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane MLM Doe 48
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane MML Doe 49
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane BC Doe 5
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane MLJ Doe 50
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane JA Doe 7
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Thursday, October 27, 2022 | ||
34 | 34
order
~Util - Set/Clear Flags Minute Order
Thu 10/27 3:07 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/27/2022. It is ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 33 Order. (jtorr, ) |
|
Monday, May 02, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Mon 05/02 2:50 PM
ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/02/2022 re:32 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Deadline to Dismiss or Re-open Case is GRANTED. This case remains administratively closed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2 subject to being reopened for good cause shown. If no party files a stipulation to dismiss the case or a motion to reopen the case on or before October 26, 2022 , this case will be dismissed with prejudice without further notice to the parties and without further action by the Court. Text Only Entry(pabsec, ) |
||
Thursday, April 28, 2022 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 04/28 5:46 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Deadline to Dismiss or Re-open Case by Plaintiff Jane RGC Doe 1. (Luther, Sommer) |
|
Wednesday, October 27, 2021 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Wed 10/27 7:55 AM
ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/27/2021. Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Dismiss or Re-Open Case [Docket No.30 ] is GRANTED. This case remains administratively closed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2 subject to being reopened for good cause shown. If no party files a stipulation to dismiss the case or a motion to reopen the case on or before May 2, 2022 , this case will be dismissed with prejudice without further notice to the parties and without further action by the Court. Text Only Entry(pabsec) |
||
Monday, October 25, 2021 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 10/25 9:40 PM
Final MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Deadline or Re-Open Case by Plaintiff Jane RGC Doe 1.(Luther, Sommer) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Mon 10/25 9:37 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Sommer D. Luther by Sommer D. Luther on behalf of Jane RGC Doe 1Attorney Sommer D. Luther added to party Jane RGC Doe 1(pty:pla) (Luther, Sommer) |
|
Friday, April 30, 2021 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Fri 04/30 10:17 AM
ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/30/2021 re:25 Motion for Extension of Time to File is GRANTED. This case remains administratively closed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2 subject to being reopened for good cause shown. If no party files a stipulation to dismiss the case or a motion to reopen the case on or before November 1, 2021 , this case will be dismissed with prejudice without further notice to the parties and without further action by the Court. Text Only Entry(pabsec2) |
|
Thursday, April 29, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Advisory Document Noncompliance
Thu 04/29 2:29 PM
ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re:26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Deadline to Dismiss or Re-Open Case filed by attorney Vance R. Andrus .The document is filed in the wrong civil case. The document shows a case number of 19-cv-00737-PAB-KMT. Action to take - REFILE THE DOCUMENT in the correct case number . (Text Only Entry) (sphil, ) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 04/29 12:37 PM
DISREGARD, FILED IN ERROR Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Deadline to Dismiss or Re-Open Case by Plaintiffs C.S., Jane NT Doe, et al.(Andrus, Vance) Modified on 4/29/2021 (sphil, ). Modified on 4/29/2021 (jgonz, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 3, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order | ||
25 | 25
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 04/29 12:34 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Deadline to Dismiss or Re-Open Case by Plaintiffs C.S., Jane NT Doe, et al .(Andrus, Vance) Modified on 4/29/2021 to edit text. (sphil, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 3, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 03, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Tue 11/03 1:48 PM
ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/3/2020. The matter before the Court is plaintiffs'23 Motion to Extend Deadline to Dismiss or Re-open Case and to Withdraw Minute Order Dated November 2, 2020, in which plaintiffs move for an extension of the deadline to file either a stipulated dismissal of the case or a motion to reopen the case. The motion is GRANTED. This case remains administratively closed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2 subject to being reopened for good cause shown. If no party files a stipulation to dismiss the case or a motion to reopen the case on or before May 1, 2021 , this case will be dismissed with prejudice without further notice to the parties and without further action by the Court. Text Only Entry (pabsec2) |
|
Monday, November 02, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 11/02 4:40 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to to Extend Deadline to Dismiss or Re-Open Case And to Withdraw Minute Order by Plaintiffs C.S., Jane NT Doe, Jane LH Doe, Jane BR Doe, Jane RGC Doe 1, Jane ME Doe 10, Jane KJ Doe 11, Jane RK Doe 12, Jane MPW Doe 13, Jane KN Doe 14, Jane KM Doe 15, Jane MN Doe 17, Jane BD Doe 18, Jane LD Doe 19, Jane MLG Doe 2, Jane KK Doe 20, Jane CT Doe 21, Jane JJF Doe 22, Jane RAC Doe 23, Jane RAD Doe 24, Jane RAE Doe 25, Jane RAF Doe 26, Jane RAG Doe 27, Jane ALC Doe 29, Jane LVB Doe 3, Jane BH Doe 30, Jane DC Doe 31, Jane KRA Doe 32, Jane AW Doe 33, Jane AG Doe 34, Jane CP Doe 35, Jane TB Doe 36, Jane KB Doe 37, Jane MH Doe 38, Jane RS Doe 39, Jane GK Doe 4, Jane NLF-2 Doe 40, Jane NLF-4 Doe 41, Jane SAF Doe 42, Jane RG Doe 46, Jane TMB Doe 47, Jane MLM Doe 48, Jane MML Doe 49, Jane BC Doe 5, Jane MLJ Doe 50, Jane JA Doe 7, Jane SM Doe 9, John Doe AA, Jane Doe PJ, L.C..(Andrus, Vance) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 | ||
22 | 22
order
Minute Order
Mon 11/02 11:08 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/2/2020. Pursuant to this Courts May 1, 2020 minute order [Docket No. 21 ], this case will be dismissed with prejudice on November 6, 2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2) |
|
Friday, May 01, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Fri 05/01 11:16 AM
MINUTE ORDER. The matter before the Court is the parties' Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Extend Deadline to Dismiss or Re-Open Case20 , in which the parties jointly move for an extension of the deadline to file either a stipulated dismissal of the case or a motion to reopen the case. The motion is GRANTED. This case remains administratively closed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2 subject to being reopened for good cause shown. If no party files a stipulation to dismiss the case or a motion to reopen the case on or before November 1, 2020 , this case will be dismissed with prejudice without further notice to the parties and without further action by the Court. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/1/2020. Text Only Entry(pabsec2) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 05/01 10:36 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to to Extend Deadline to Dismiss or Re-Open Case by Plaintiffs C.S., Jane NT Doe, Jane LH Doe, Jane BR Doe, Jane RGC Doe 1, Jane ME Doe 10, Jane KJ Doe 11, Jane RK Doe 12, Jane MPW Doe 13, Jane KN Doe 14, Jane KM Doe 15, Jane MN Doe 17, Jane BD Doe 18, Jane LD Doe 19, Jane MLG Doe 2, Jane KK Doe 20, Jane CT Doe 21, Jane JJF Doe 22, Jane RAC Doe 23, Jane RAD Doe 24, Jane RAE Doe 25, Jane RAF Doe 26, Jane RAG Doe 27, Jane ALC Doe 29, Jane LVB Doe 3, Jane BH Doe 30, Jane DC Doe 31, Jane KRA Doe 32, Jane AW Doe 33, Jane AG Doe 34, Jane CP Doe 35, Jane TB Doe 36, Jane KB Doe 37, Jane MH Doe 38, Jane RS Doe 39, Jane GK Doe 4, Jane NLF-2 Doe 40, Jane NLF-4 Doe 41, Jane SAF Doe 42, Jane RG Doe 46, Jane TMB Doe 47, Jane MLM Doe 48, Jane MML Doe 49, Jane BC Doe 5, Jane MLJ Doe 50, Jane JA Doe 7, Jane SM Doe 9, John Doe AA, Jane Doe PJ, L.C..(Andrus, Vance) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Thursday, October 31, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
order
Minute Order
Thu 10/31 11:52 AM
MINUTE ORDER. The matter before the Court is the parties' Joint Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Dismiss18 , which indicates that the parties have stipulated to an extension of the deadline to file either a stipulated dismissal of the case or a motion to reopen the case. Construing the stipulation as a motion, the motion is granted. This case remains administratively closed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2 subject to being reopened for good cause shown. If no party files a stipulation to dismiss the case or a motion to reopen the case on or before May 1, 2020, this case will be dismissed with prejudice without further notice to the parties and without further action by the Court.By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/31/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec) |
|
Wednesday, October 30, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation
Wed 10/30 12:29 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to Dismiss or Re-Open Case by Plaintiffs C.S., Jane NT Doe, Jane LH Doe, Jane BR Doe, Jane RGC Doe 1, Jane ME Doe 10, Jane KJ Doe 11, Jane RK Doe 12, Jane MPW Doe 13, Jane KN Doe 14, Jane KM Doe 15, Jane MN Doe 17, Jane BD Doe 18, Jane LD Doe 19, Jane MLG Doe 2, Jane KK Doe 20, Jane CT Doe 21, Jane JJF Doe 22, Jane RAC Doe 23, Jane RAD Doe 24, Jane RAE Doe 25, Jane RAF Doe 26, Jane RAG Doe 27, Jane ALC Doe 29, Jane LVB Doe 3, Jane BH Doe 30, Jane DC Doe 31, Jane KRA Doe 32, Jane AW Doe 33, Jane AG Doe 34, Jane CP Doe 35, Jane TB Doe 36, Jane KB Doe 37, Jane MH Doe 38, Jane RS Doe 39, Jane GK Doe 4, Jane NLF-2 Doe 40, Jane NLF-4 Doe 41, Jane SAF Doe 42, Jane RG Doe 46, Jane TMB Doe 47, Jane MLM Doe 48, Jane MML Doe 49, Jane BC Doe 5, Jane MLJ Doe 50, Jane JA Doe 7, Jane SM Doe 9, John Doe AA, Jane Doe PJ, L.C..(Andrus, Vance) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Tuesday, July 09, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
order
~Util - Terminate Civil Case Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Tue 07/09 4:00 PM
ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/9/2019. ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Restrict and Proceed Anonymously3 is GRANTED . ORDERED that this case is administratively closed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2, subject to being reopened for good cause shown. ORDERED that if no party files a stipulation to dismiss the case or a motion to reopen the case on or before November 1, 2019 , this case will be dismissed with prejudice without further notice to the parties and without further action by the Court. ORDERED that, within seven days of either party filing a motion to reopen the case, plaintiffs shall file with the Court a copy of the complaint containing the legal names of each plaintiff, which shall be maintained at Level 2 Restriction pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR. 7.2. (sphil, ) |
|
Friday, May 24, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Fri 05/24 11:24 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/24/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec) |
|
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Thu 05/23 11:06 AM
ORDER Directing Reassignment. The above-captioned matter is REASSIGNED to Chief Judge Brimmer for all purposes. ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/23/2019. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-902-PAB (angar, ) |
|
Monday, May 20, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter Reassigning Case
Mon 05/20 3:11 PM
CASE REASSIGNED. All parties do not consent pursuant to13 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00902-WJM. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, ) |
|
Friday, May 17, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge
Fri 05/17 9:46 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs C.S., Jane NT Doe, Jane LH Doe, Jane BR Doe, Jane RGC Doe 1, Jane ME Doe 10, Jane KJ Doe 11, Jane RK Doe 12, Jane MPW Doe 13, Jane KN Doe 14, Jane KM Doe 15, Jane MN Doe 17, Jane BD Doe 18, Jane LD Doe 19, Jane MLG Doe 2, Jane KK Doe 20, Jane CT Doe 21, Jane JJF Doe 22, Jane RAC Doe 23, Jane RAD Doe 24, Jane RAE Doe 25, Jane RAF Doe 26, Jane RAG Doe 27, Jane ALC Doe 29, Jane LVB Doe 3, Jane BH Doe 30, Jane DC Doe 31, Jane KRA Doe 32, Jane AW Doe 33, Jane AG Doe 34, Jane CP Doe 35, Jane TB Doe 36, Jane KB Doe 37, Jane MH Doe 38, Jane RS Doe 39, Jane GK Doe 4, Jane NLF-2 Doe 40, Jane NLF-4 Doe 41, Jane SAF Doe 42, Jane RG Doe 46, Jane TMB Doe 47, Jane MLM Doe 48, Jane MML Doe 49, Jane BC Doe 5, Jane MLJ Doe 50, Jane JA Doe 7, Jane SM Doe 9, John Doe AA, Jane Doe PJ, L.C. All parties do not consent.. (Andrus, Vance) |
|
Friday, May 10, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order
Fri 05/10 7:21 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for 6/10/2019 is VACATED. No later than 5/17/2019, the parties shall complete and file the Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction indicating either unanimous consent of the parties or that consent has been declined. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/10/19. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 ) |
|
Thursday, May 09, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Advisory Notice Attorney Not Admitted
Thu 05/09 10:39 AM
ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Christopher Y. L. Yeung attempted to enter his appearance in this case by affixing his " s/ " signature to the Document No. 9. Mr. Yeung does not appear on the Court's attorney roll as a member of the bar of this court. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a)(5), his purported appearance will not be recognized. (Text Only Entry) (mfred) |
|
Tuesday, May 07, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Exhibits
Tue 05/07 2:41 PM
Exhibits in Support of9 Stipulation,,, and Notice of Order Entered by the U.S. Bankruptcy Court of Southern District of Indiana by Plaintiffs C.S., Jane NT Doe, Jane LH Doe, Jane BR Doe, Jane RGC Doe 1, Jane ME Doe 10, Jane KJ Doe 11, Jane RK Doe 12, Jane MPW Doe 13, Jane KN Doe 14, Jane KM Doe 15, Jane MN Doe 17, Jane BD Doe 18, Jane LD Doe 19, Jane MLG Doe 2, Jane KK Doe 20, Jane CT Doe 21, Jane JJF Doe 22, Jane RAC Doe 23, Jane RAD Doe 24, Jane RAE Doe 25, Jane RAF Doe 26, Jane RAG Doe 27, Jane ALC Doe 29, Jane LVB Doe 3, Jane BH Doe 30, Jane DC Doe 31, Jane KRA Doe 32, Jane AW Doe 33, Jane AG Doe 34, Jane CP Doe 35, Jane TB Doe 36, Jane KB Doe 37, Jane MH Doe 38, Jane RS Doe 39, Jane GK Doe 4, Jane NLF-2 Doe 40, Jane NLF-4 Doe 41, Jane SAF Doe 42, Jane RG Doe 46, Jane TMB Doe 47, Jane MLM Doe 48, Jane MML Doe 49, Jane BC Doe 5, Jane MLJ Doe 50, Jane JA Doe 7, Jane SM Doe 9, John Doe AA, Jane Doe PJ, L.C.. (Andrus, Vance) |
|
Friday, May 03, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation
Fri 05/03 9:33 PM
STIPULATION and Notice of Order Entered by the U.S. Bankruptcy Court of Southern District of Indiana by Plaintiffs C.S., Jane NT Doe, Jane LH Doe, Jane BR Doe, Jane RGC Doe 1, Jane ME Doe 10, Jane KJ Doe 11, Jane RK Doe 12, Jane MPW Doe 13, Jane KN Doe 14, Jane KM Doe 15, Jane MN Doe 17, Jane BD Doe 18, Jane LD Doe 19, Jane MLG Doe 2, Jane KK Doe 20, Jane CT Doe 21, Jane JJF Doe 22, Jane RAC Doe 23, Jane RAD Doe 24, Jane RAE Doe 25, Jane RAF Doe 26, Jane RAG Doe 27, Jane ALC Doe 29, Jane LVB Doe 3, Jane BH Doe 30, Jane DC Doe 31, Jane KRA Doe 32, Jane AW Doe 33, Jane AG Doe 34, Jane CP Doe 35, Jane TB Doe 36, Jane KB Doe 37, Jane MH Doe 38, Jane RS Doe 39, Jane GK Doe 4, Jane NLF-2 Doe 40, Jane NLF-4 Doe 41, Jane SAF Doe 42, Jane RG Doe 46, Jane TMB Doe 47, Jane MLM Doe 48, Jane MML Doe 49, Jane BC Doe 5, Jane MLJ Doe 50, Jane JA Doe 7, Jane SM Doe 9, John Doe AA, Jane Doe PJ, L.C.. (Andrus, Vance) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
5
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/02 3:05 PM
ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 6/10/2019 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 6/3/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 04/02/2019. (ksena) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Return of Service - Executed - Complaint
Fri 03/29 12:32 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jane AW Doe 33, Jane KRA Doe 32, Jane CT Doe 21, Jane JA Doe 7, Jane RAF Doe 26, Jane BD Doe 18, L.C., Jane NT Doe, Jane RAG Doe 27, Jane KK Doe 20, Jane ME Doe 10, Jane DC Doe 31, Jane CP Doe 35, Jane KJ Doe 11, Jane MLM Doe 48, Jane ALC Doe 29, Jane MLJ Doe 50, Jane RS Doe 39, Jane NLF-4 Doe 41, Jane RK Doe 12, Jane KM Doe 15, Jane LH Doe, Jane LD Doe 19, Jane MN Doe 17, Jane MLG Doe 2, Jane RGC Doe 1, Jane BH Doe 30, Jane RAE Doe 25, C.S., Jane NLF-2 Doe 40, Jane KN Doe 14, Jane MML Doe 49, Jane RAD Doe 24, Jane JJF Doe 22, Jane SAF Doe 42, Jane RG Doe 46, Jane RAC Doe 23, Jane MPW Doe 13, John Doe AA, Jane TB Doe 36, Jane LVB Doe 3, Jane SM Doe 9, Jane TMB Doe 47, Jane MH Doe 38, Jane Doe PJ, Jane GK Doe 4, Jane AG Doe 34, Jane KB Doe 37, Jane BR Doe, Jane BC Doe 5. All Defendants.(Andrus, Vance) |
|
Att: 1 Waiver of Service - Alan Ashley, | ||
Att: 2 Waiver of Service - Angela M. Ruggiero, | ||
Att: 3 Waiver of Service - Anita L. DeFrantz, | ||
Att: 4 Waiver of Service - Daniel D. Doctoroff, | ||
Att: 5 Waiver of Service - Dave W. Ogrean, | ||
Att: 6 Waiver of Service - James L. Easton, | ||
Att: 7 Waiver of Service - James M. Benson, | ||
Att: 8 Waiver of Service - John S. Hendricks, | ||
Att: 9 Waiver of Service - Kevin M. White, | ||
Att: 10 Waiver of Service - Larry Buendorf, | ||
Att: 11 Waiver of Service - Lawrence F. Probst, | ||
Att: 12 Waiver of Service - Mary R. McCagg, | ||
Att: 13 Waiver of Service - Nina M. Kemppel, | ||
Att: 14 Waiver of Service - Pisei Whitney Ping, | ||
Att: 15 Waiver of Service - Robert Bowlsby, | ||
Att: 16 Waiver of Service - Robert J. Bach, | ||
Att: 17 Waiver of Service - Robert L. Wood, | ||
Att: 18 Waiver of Service - Scott Blackmun, | ||
Att: 19 Waiver of Service - Steven M. Mesler, | ||
Att: 20 Waiver of Service - Susanne D. Lyons, | ||
Att: 21 Waiver of Service - Ursula M. Burns, | ||
Att: 22 Waiver of Service - William C. Marlot | ||
Wednesday, March 27, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Summons Issued
Wed 03/27 9:22 AM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (cmadr, ) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form | ||
Tuesday, March 26, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Wed 03/27 8:52 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) |
|
4 | 4
respm
Brief in Support of Motion
Tue 03/26 5:13 PM
BRIEF in Support of3 MOTION for Order to Restrict and Proceed Anonymously filed by Plaintiffs Jane RGC Doe 1, Jane ME Doe 10, Jane KJ Doe 11, Jane RK Doe 12, Jane MPW Doe 13, Jane KN Doe 14, Jane KM Doe 15, Jane AC Doe 16, a minor, by her next friend L.C., Jane MN Doe 17, Jane BD Doe 18, Jane LD Doe 19, Jane MLG Doe 2, Jane KK Doe 20, Jane CT Doe 21, Jane JJF Doe 22, Jane RAC Doe 23, Jane RAD Doe 24, Jane RAE Doe 25, Jane RAF Doe 26, Jane RAG Doe 27, Jane RAH Doe 28, a minor by her next friend C.S., Jane ALC Doe 29, Jane LVB Doe 3, Jane BH Doe 30, Jane DC Doe 31, Jane KRA Doe 32, Jane AW Doe 33, Jane AG Doe 34, Jane CP Doe 35, Jane TB Doe 36, Jane KB Doe 37, Jane MH Doe 38, Jane RS Doe 39, Jane GK Doe 4, Jane NLF-2 Doe 40, Jane NLF-4 Doe 41, Jane SAF Doe 42, Jane BRS Doe 43, a minor by her next friend Jane BR Doe, Jane ANT Doe 44, a minor by her next friend Jane NT Doe, Jane ILH Doe 45, a minor by her next friend Jane LH Doe, Jane RG Doe 46, Jane TMB Doe 47, Jane MLM Doe 48, Jane MML Doe 49, Jane BC Doe 5, Jane MLJ Doe 50, Jane AC Doe 6, a minor, by Next Friend John Doe AA, Jane JA Doe 7, Jane PH Doe 8, a minor, by Next Friend Jane Doe PJ, Jane SM Doe 9. (Andrus, Vance) |
|
3 | 3
10
pgs
motion
Order
Tue 03/26 5:11 PM
MOTION for Order to Restrict and Proceed Anonymously by Plaintiffs Jane RGC Doe 1, Jane ME Doe 10, Jane KJ Doe 11, Jane RK Doe 12, Jane MPW Doe 13, Jane KN Doe 14, Jane KM Doe 15, Jane AC Doe 16, a minor, by her next friend L.C., Jane MN Doe 17, Jane BD Doe 18, Jane LD Doe 19, Jane MLG Doe 2, Jane KK Doe 20, Jane CT Doe 21, Jane JJF Doe 22, Jane RAC Doe 23, Jane RAD Doe 24, Jane RAE Doe 25, Jane RAF Doe 26, Jane RAG Doe 27, Jane RAH Doe 28, a minor by her next friend C.S., Jane ALC Doe 29, Jane LVB Doe 3, Jane BH Doe 30, Jane DC Doe 31, Jane KRA Doe 32, Jane AW Doe 33, Jane AG Doe 34, Jane CP Doe 35, Jane TB Doe 36, Jane KB Doe 37, Jane MH Doe 38, Jane RS Doe 39, Jane GK Doe 4, Jane NLF-2 Doe 40, Jane NLF-4 Doe 41, Jane SAF Doe 42, Jane BRS Doe 43, a minor by her next friend Jane BR Doe, Jane ANT Doe 44, a minor by her next friend Jane NT Doe, Jane ILH Doe 45, a minor by her next friend Jane LH Doe, Jane RG Doe 46, Jane TMB Doe 47, Jane MLM Doe 48, Jane MML Doe 49, Jane BC Doe 5, Jane MLJ Doe 50, Jane AC Doe 6, a minor, by Next Friend John Doe AA, Jane JA Doe 7, Jane PH Doe 8, a minor, by Next Friend Jane Doe PJ, Jane SM Doe 9.(Andrus, Vance) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Association
Tue 03/26 5:03 PM
NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Vance Robert Andrus on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Andrus, Vance) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/26 5:01 PM
COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Alan Ashley, Robert J. Bach, James M. Benson, Scott Blackmun, Robert Bowlsby, Larry Buendorf, Ursula M. Burns, Anita L. DeFrantz, Daniel L. Doctoroff, James L. Easton, John S. Hendricks, Nina M. Kemppel, Susanne D. Lyons, William C. Marlot, Mary R. McCagg, Steven M. Mesler, Dave W. Ogrean, Lawrence F. Probst, Angela M. Ruggiero, United States Olympic Committee, Kevin M. White, Pisei Whitney Ping, Robert L. Wood (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6603008)Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane RGC Doe 1(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane ME Doe 10(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane KJ Doe 11(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane RK Doe 12(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane MPW Doe 13(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane KN Doe 14(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane KM Doe 15(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane AC Doe 16, a minor, by her next friend L.C.(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane MN Doe 17(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane BD Doe 18(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane LD Doe 19(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane MLG Doe 2(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane KK Doe 20(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane CT Doe 21(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane JJF Doe 22(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane RAC Doe 23(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane RAD Doe 24(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane RAE Doe 25(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane RAF Doe 26(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane RAG Doe 27(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane RAH Doe 28, a minor by her next friend C.S.(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane ALC Doe 29(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane LVB Doe 3(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane BH Doe 30(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane DC Doe 31(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane KRA Doe 32(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane AW Doe 33(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane AG Doe 34(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane CP Doe 35(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane TB Doe 36(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane KB Doe 37(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane MH Doe 38(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane RS Doe 39(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane GK Doe 4(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane NLF-2 Doe 40(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane NLF-4 Doe 41(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane SAF Doe 42(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane BRS Doe 43, a minor by her next friend Jane BR Doe(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane ANT Doe 44, a minor by her next friend Jane NT Doe(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane ILH Doe 45, a minor by her next friend Jane LH Doe(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane RG Doe 46(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane TMB Doe 47(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane MLM Doe 48(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane MML Doe 49(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane BC Doe 5(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane MLJ Doe 50(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane AC Doe 6, a minor, by Next Friend John Doe AA(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane JA Doe 7(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane PH Doe 8, a minor, by Next Friend Jane Doe PJ(pty:pla), Attorney Vance Robert Andrus added to party Jane SM Doe 9(pty:pla), filed by Jane AW Doe 33, Jane KRA Doe 32, Jane CT Doe 21, Jane JA Doe 7, Jane RAF Doe 26, Jane BD Doe 18, Jane AC Doe 16, a minor, by her next friend L.C., Jane ANT Doe 44, a minor by her next friend Jane NT Doe, Jane RAG Doe 27, Jane KK Doe 20, Jane ME Doe 10, Jane DC Doe 31, Jane CP Doe 35, Jane KJ Doe 11, Jane MLM Doe 48, Jane ALC Doe 29, Jane MLJ Doe 50, Jane RS Doe 39, Jane NLF-4 Doe 41, Jane RK Doe 12, Jane KM Doe 15, Jane ILH Doe 45, a minor by her next friend Jane LH Doe, Jane LD Doe 19, Jane MN Doe 17, Jane MLG Doe 2, Jane RGC Doe 1, Jane BH Doe 30, Jane RAE Doe 25, Jane RAH Doe 28, a minor by her next friend C.S., Jane NLF-2 Doe 40, Jane KN Doe 14, Jane MML Doe 49, Jane RAD Doe 24, Jane JJF Doe 22, Jane SAF Doe 42, Jane RG Doe 46, Jane RAC Doe 23, Jane MPW Doe 13, Jane AC Doe 6, a minor, by Next Friend John Doe AA, Jane TB Doe 36, Jane LVB Doe 3, Jane SM Doe 9, Jane TMB Doe 47, Jane MH Doe 38, Jane PH Doe 8, a minor, by Next Friend Jane Doe PJ, Jane GK Doe 4, Jane AG Doe 34, Jane KB Doe 37, Jane BRS Doe 43, a minor by her next friend Jane BR Doe, Jane BC Doe 5.(Andrus, Vance) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons USOC, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Lawrence F. Probst, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Robert J. Bach, | ||
Att: 5 Summons James M. Benson, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Robert Bowlsby, | ||
Att: 7 Summons Ursula M. Burns, | ||
Att: 8 Summons Anita L. DeFrantz, | ||
Att: 9 Summons Daniel L. Doctoroff, | ||
Att: 10 Summons James L. Easton, | ||
Att: 11 Summons John S. Hendricks, | ||
Att: 12 Summons Nina M. Kemppel, | ||
Att: 13 Summons Susanne D. Lyons, | ||
Att: 14 Summons William C. Marlot, | ||
Att: 15 Summons Mary R. McCagg, | ||
Att: 16 Summons Steven M. Mesler, | ||
Att: 17 Summons Dave W. Orgrean, | ||
Att: 18 Summons Pisei Whitney Ping, | ||
Att: 19 Summons Angela M. Ruggiero, | ||
Att: 20 Summons Kevin M. White, | ||
Att: 21 Summons Robert L. Wood, | ||
Att: 22 Summons Scott Blackmun, | ||
Att: 23 Summons Alan Ashley, | ||
Att: 24 Summons Larry Buendorf |