District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Rudolph Contreras
Case #: 1:19-cv-00880
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2019
Terminated:Jun 05, 2019
Last checked: Monday Sep 23, 2019 5:19 AM EDT
Defendant
SOFYAN SAORI BEY
Represented By
Mikhael D. Charnoff
Perry Charnoff PLLC
contact info
Defendant
ROBERT GORDON LAMOND, III
Represented By
Maria Christina Simon
The Geller Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
REDLINE PRODUCTIONS MEDIA GROUP, INC.
Represented By
Stephen D. Charnoff
Rees Broome, PC
contact info
Defendant
BLAKELY RYAN WARUSZEWSKI
Represented By
Mikhael D. Charnoff
Perry Charnoff PLLC
contact info
Defendant
ADAM CAMPBELL ZAHN
Represented By
Maria Christina Simon
The Geller Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JACKSON PHILLIP MOSLEY
2030 8th Street, NW #306
Washington, DC 20001


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, May 31, 2019
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 06/03 4:58 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JACKSON PHILLIP MOSLEY. (tth)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2019
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 04/05 11:37 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 5/10/2019 (tj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2019
10 10 order Fox/Neal Order Thu 04/04 10:24 AM
Order advising plaintiff to respond by May 10, 2019, to the motion to dismiss of defendants Sofyan Saori Bey and Blakely Ryan Waruszewski, or risk dismissal of the complaint against those defendants based solely on their assertions in the motion (see document for details). Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/4/19.(ah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2019
9 9 motion Dismiss Wed 04/03 8:00 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by SOFYAN SAORI BEY, BLAKELY RYAN WARUSZEWSKI(Charnoff, Mikhael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, March 28, 2019
8 8 order Fox/Neal Order Thu 03/28 3:10 PM
Order advising plaintiff to respond by May 10, 2019, to the motion to dismiss of Redline Productions Media Group, Inc., and that of defendants Robert Gordon Lamond, III, and Adam Campbell Zahn, or risk dismissal of the complaint against those defendants based solely on their assertions in the respective motion (see document for details). Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/28/19.(ah)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Dismiss Thu 03/28 10:34 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by ROBERT GORDON LAMOND, III, ADAM CAMPBELL ZAHN(Simon, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of their Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
6 6 misc Errata Thu 03/28 9:47 AM
ERRATA TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL by REDLINE PRODUCTIONS MEDIA GROUP, INC.5 Notice to Counsel/Party.(Charnoff, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel/Party Thu 03/28 9:08 AM
NOTICE to Counsel/Party re1 Notice of Removal, (zef, )
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 03/28 9:04 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 03/28 3:44 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 5/10/2019 (tj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2019
4 4 notice Notice of Related Case Thu 03/28 8:54 AM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by REDLINE PRODUCTIONS MEDIA GROUP, INC. Case related to Case No. 19-cv-695-RC. (zef, )
Related: [-]
3 3 13 pgs misc Memorandum Wed 03/27 5:30 PM
MEMORANDUM re2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by REDLINE PRODUCTIONS MEDIA GROUP, INC. by REDLINE PRODUCTIONS MEDIA GROUP, INC.. (Charnoff, Stephen)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Dismiss Wed 03/27 5:28 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by REDLINE PRODUCTIONS MEDIA GROUP, INC.(Charnoff, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 03/27 5:27 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2018 CA 007844 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-6026397 filed by REDLINE PRODUCTIONS MEDIA GROUP, INC..(Charnoff, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 9 Related case form