New York Southern District Court
Judge:Katherine Polk Failla
Case #: 1:19-cv-02735
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2019
Last checked: Saturday May 11, 2019 5:37 AM EDT
Defendant
TGI Fridays Inc.
Plaintiff
Solange Troncoso
Represented By
William Michael Brown
Lee Litigation Group, PLLC
contact info
Anne Melissa Seelig
Lee Litigation Group, PLLC
contact info
C.K. Lee
Lee Litigation Group, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, May 16, 2019
notice Notice (Other) Thu 12:44 PM
NOTICE REGARDING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: An Initial Pretrial Conference is currently scheduled for June 25, 2019. Please note that since the conference was scheduled, the Court has changed its individual rules, and would like to bring the following paragraph to the parties' attention: The Court schedules initial pretrial conferences with the expectation that one or more of the parties would like an in-person opportunity to bring matters to the Court's attention, and it welcomes that opportunity. However, the Court recognizes that in certain circumstances as, for example, where the parties are in agreement about the proposed discovery schedule and have no issues to raise with the Court such conferences may represent less-efficient uses of the parties' time and resources. If the parties agree on a schedule that calls for the close of all discovery within six months, and have no other issues to raise with the Court, the parties can, if they wish, submit a Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order and request in their joint letter that the initial pretrial conference be cancelled. The Court will ordinarily grant such requests. ***No PDF is attached to this entry. (tn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2019
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12:00 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anne Melissa Seelig on behalf of Solange Troncoso. (Seelig, Anne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
8 8 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Wed 3:37 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/25/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/17/2019) (rro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2019
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 2:04 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Michael Brown on behalf of Solange Troncoso. (Brown, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 7:03 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. TGI Fridays Inc. waiver sent on 3/28/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. Document filed by Solange Troncoso. (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2019
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 10:59 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to TGI Fridays Inc.. (jgo)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 10:53 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Thu 10:10 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney C.K. Lee to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF was not signed or dated by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 10:16 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 10:17 AM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 10:17 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2019
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 12:01 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 12:00 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TGI Fridays Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Solange Troncoso. (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 11:59 AM
COMPLAINT against TGI Fridays Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16569791)Document filed by Solange Troncoso.(Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit