City of Auburn v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45188 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Maine, 2:19-cv-00013 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:22 PM EST |
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maine, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Douglas J. Jorgensen
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mark E. Cieniawski
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 110, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael B. Bruehl
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Auburn
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:42 PM EDT |
Wednesday, January 09, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Androscoggin County Superior Court, case number CV-18-155. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. , filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION. (Service of Process Deadline 4/9/2019) Fee due by 1/11/2019.(bfa) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
Att: 1 declaration of JOSHUA D. DUNLAP, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 Demand letter to Actavis, Inc, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 Demand letter to Actavis LLC, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 Demand letter to Actavis Pharma, Inc, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 Demand letter to Allergan PLC, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 Demand letter to Allergan PLC, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 Demand letter to Amerisourcebergen Corporation, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 Demand letter to Dr. Bruehl, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 Demand letter to Cardinal Health, Inc, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 Demand letter to Cephalon, Inc, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 Demand letter to Dr. Cieniawski, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 11 Demand letter to Endo Health Solutions Inc, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 12 Demand letter to Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 13 Demand letter to Insys Therapeutics, Inc, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit A complaint | ||
2 | 2 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION re1 Notice of Removal. Main Document: Exhibit 14 - Demand letter to Dr. Cieniawski.(bfa) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 15 Demand letter to Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 16 Demand letter to Johnson & Johnson, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 17 Demand letter to Dr. Jorgensen, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 18 Demand letter to Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 19 Demand letter to Mckesson Corporation, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 20 Demand letter to Orthomcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 21 Demand letter to Orthomcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 22 Demand letter to The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 23 Demand letter to Purdue Pharma Inc, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 24 Demand letter to Purdue Pharma L.P., | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 25 Demand letter to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 26 Demand letter to Watson Laboratories, Inc | ||
3 | 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
4 | 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION. (bfa) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
11 | 11 Consent MOTION to Extend Time for all defendants to File Answer until March 4, 2019 filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION. No pdf document attached. See ECF #1. (slg) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
Thursday, January 10, 2019 | ||
Set Deadlines: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from PURDUE PHARMA LP, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, CEPHALON INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC, WATSON LABORATORIES INC, ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA INC, ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC, MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, CVS PHARMACY INC, WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC, WALMART INC, RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID OF MARYLAND INC, RITE AID OF MAINE INC due by 1/16/2019. (bfa) Modified on 1/11/2019 to add parties that need to file corporate disclosure statement (slg). [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | ||
Set Answer Deadline for AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION : Answer due by 1/16/2019. (bfa) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | ||
Set Deadlines: Pro Hac Vice Certificate due from MARK CHEFFO, CHARLES C. LIFLAND, DONNA WELCH, CONOR B. O'CROININ by 1/16/2019. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at[LINK:http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms] . (bfa) Modified on 1/11/2019 to add attorneys to who need to file Pro Hac Vice certificates (slg). [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | ||
Set Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificate due by 1/16/2019. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at[LINK:http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms] . (bfa) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | ||
Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1956583.), filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION.(DUNLAP, JOSHUA) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | ||
5 | 5 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 1/17/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
6 | 6 LETTER from Clerk's Office to MDL Panel. (bfa) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
Monday, January 14, 2019 | ||
7 | 7 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Conor B. O'Croinin filed by GERALDINE G. SANCHEZ on behalf of CVS PHARMACY INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1958235.) (SANCHEZ, GERALDINE) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
8 | 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CVS PHARMACY INC. (SANCHEZ, GERALDINE) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
Reset Answer Deadline per Order #17: Answer due by 3/4/2019 from PURDUE PHARMA LP, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, CEPHALON INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC, WATSON LABORATORIES INC, ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA INC, ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC, MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY INC, WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC, WALMART INC, RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID OF MARYLAND INC, RITE AID OF MAINE INC, DOUGLAS J JORGENSEN, DO, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD, and MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD. (slg) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | ||
9 | 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MCKESSON CORPORATION. (HANLON, MELISSA) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
10 | 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (WOLF, KAREN) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
12 | 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CITY OF AUBURN. (BELLEAU, JAMES) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
13 | 13 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION. (DUNLAP, JOSHUA) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
14 | 14 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS & MARK G. LAVOIE on behalf of MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD (HADIARIS, JOSHUA) Modified on 1/16/2019 to reflect that the appearance is also on behalf of Mark G. Lavoie (mnw). [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
15 | 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC. (WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
16 | 16 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brien T. O'Connor and Andrew J. O'Connor filed by TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK on behalf of MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number 0100-1959365.)(WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice - Andrew J. O'Connor | ||
17 | 17 ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Time is extended to March 4, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
37 | 37 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION re13 State Court Record. Main Document: Androscoggin County Superior Court Docket Record for Case AUBSC-CV-2018-00155.(mnw) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Actavis Inc, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Actavis LLC, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Actavis Pharma Inc, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Allergan PLC, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Allergan PLC, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 to Complaint - Demand Letter to AmerisourceBergen Corp, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Dr. Bruehl, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Cardinal Health Inc, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Cephalon Inc, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Dr. Cieniawski, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 11 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Endo Health Solutions Inc, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 12 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 13 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Insys Therapeutics Inc, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 14 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 15 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 16 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Johnson & Johnson, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 17 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Dr. Jorgensen, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 18 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 19 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Mckesson Corp, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit 20 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit 21 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit 22 to Complaint - Demand Letter to The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit 23 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Purdue Pharma Inc, | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit 24 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Purdue Pharma LP, | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit 25 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, | ||
Att: 27 Exhibit 26 - Demand Letter to Watson Laboratories Inc, | ||
Att: 28 McKesson Corp's Assented to Motion to Extend Deadline, | ||
Att: 29 Notice of Entry of Appearance of Hanlon, | ||
Att: 30 AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp's Consent Motion for Extension of Time, | ||
Att: 31 Entry of Appearance of Petruccelli, | ||
Att: 32 Cardinal Health 110 LLC's Assented to Motion to Extend Time, | ||
Att: 33 Entry of Appearance of Hawkins, | ||
Att: 34 Order granting McKesson Corp's Assented to Motion, | ||
Att: 35 Moving Defendants' Assented to Motion to Extend Deadline, | ||
Att: 36 Entry of Appearance of Cahoon, | ||
Att: 37 Retail Pharmacy Defendants' Assented to Motion to Extend Deadlines, | ||
Att: 38 Order Granting AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp's Consent Motion, | ||
Att: 39 Order Granting Cardinal Health 110 LLC's Assented to Motion, | ||
Att: 40 Order Granting Moving Defendants' Assented to Motion, | ||
Att: 41 Order Granting Retail Pharmacy Defendants' Assented to Motion | ||
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
18 | 18 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan Zane Watts filed by KAREN FRINK WOLF on behalf of ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1959744.) (WOLF, KAREN) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
19 | 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA INC, CEPHALON INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, WATSON LABORATORIES INC. (GOLDMAN, JEFF) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
20 | 20 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD F. PETRUCCELLI on behalf of RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID OF MAINE INC, RITE AID OF MARYLAND INC (PETRUCCELLI, GERALD) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
21 | 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID OF MAINE INC, RITE AID OF MARYLAND INC. (PETRUCCELLI, GERALD) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
22 | 22 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK on behalf of MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC (WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
23 | 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WALMART INC. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
24 | 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC. (PERRY, KATHARINE) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
25 | 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC. (CAHOON, JOSEPH) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
26 | 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC. (HAWKINS, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
Thursday, January 17, 2019 | ||
27 | 27 NOTICE of Appearance by MAUREEN M. STURTEVANT on behalf of DOUGLAS J JORGENSEN, DO (STURTEVANT, MAUREEN) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
28 | 28 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by CVS PHARMACY INC, RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID OF MAINE INC, RITE AID OF MARYLAND INC, WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC, WALMART INC Responses due by 2/7/2019. (SANCHEZ, GERALDINE) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
Reset Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificate due from MARK CHEFFO, CHARLES C. LIFLAND & DONNA WELCH by 1/28/2019. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at[LINK:http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms] . (mnw) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | ||
Reset Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from PURDUE PHARMA LP, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC & ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC by 1/28/2019. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | ||
29 | 29 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Lovrien filed by DANIEL R. MAWHINNEY on behalf of WALMART INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1961255.) (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL) Modified on 1/18/2019 to add name of PHV attorney (slg). [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
30 | 30 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of K. Neil Austin filed by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS on behalf of MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1961301.) (HADIARIS, JOSHUA) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
31 | 31 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David R. Geiger filed by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS on behalf of MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1961307.) (HADIARIS, JOSHUA) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
32 | 32 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Madeleine K. Rodriguez filed by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS on behalf of MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1961309.) (HADIARIS, JOSHUA) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
33 | 33 ORDER granting without objection28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Time is extended to (1) 30 days after this Court rules on any motion to remand that might be filed, or (2) 30 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues a final decision as to whether to transfer the case to the Multidistrict Litigation, whichever date is later. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
34 | 34 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to AmerisourceBergen, Cardinal, Dr. Cieniawski, Dr. Bruehl, Dr. Jorgensen and McKesson .(BELLEAU, JAMES) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Acceptance of Service-AmerisourceBergen, | ||
Att: 2 Acceptance of Service-Cardinal, | ||
Att: 3 Acceptance of Services-Drs. Bruehl and Cieniawski, | ||
Att: 4 Acceptance of Service-Dr. Jorgensen, | ||
Att: 5 Acceptance of Service-McKesson | ||
35 | 35 AFFIDAVIT of Service by CITY OF AUBURN.(BELLEAU, JAMES) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service on Janssen Pharmaceutica, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of Service on Ortho-McNeil-Janssen, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit of Service on Rite Aid of Maryland | ||
36 | 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CITY OF AUBURN.(BELLEAU, JAMES) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Summons served on Actavis LLC, | ||
Att: 2 Summons served on Actavis Pharma, | ||
Att: 3 Summons served on Allergan Finance, | ||
Att: 4 Summons served on Cephalon, | ||
Att: 5 Summons served on CVS, | ||
Att: 6 Summons served on Endo Health, | ||
Att: 7 Summons served on Endo Pharm, | ||
Att: 8 Summons served on Insys, | ||
Att: 9 Summons served on Janssen Pharmaceuticals, | ||
Att: 10 Summons served on Johnson & Johnson, | ||
Att: 11 Summons served on Mallinckrodt, | ||
Att: 12 Summons served on Purdue Frederick, | ||
Att: 13 Summons served on Purdue Pharma Inc., | ||
Att: 14 Summons served on Purdue Pharma LP, | ||
Att: 15 Summons served on Rite Aid Corporation, | ||
Att: 16 Summons served on Rite Aid of Maine, | ||
Att: 17 Summons served on Teva, | ||
Att: 18 Summons served on Walgreens, | ||
Att: 19 Summons served on Walmart, | ||
Att: 20 Summons served on Watson Lab | ||
Friday, January 25, 2019 | ||
38 | 38 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Donna M. Welch, P.C. filed by SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ on behalf of ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1965079.) (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
39 | 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC. (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
40 | 40 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION Responses due by 2/19/2019. (DUNLAP, JOSHUA) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
Reset Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificate due from MARK CHEFFO & CHARLES C. LIFLAND by 2/8/2019. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at[LINK:http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms] . (mnw) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | ||
Reset Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from PURDUE PHARMA LP, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC & JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC by 2/8/2019. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | ||
41 | 41 ORDER granting without objection40 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Time is extended to (1) 30 days after this Court rules on any motion to remand that might be filed, or (2) 30 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues a final decision as to whether to transfer the case to the Multidistrict Litigation, whichever date is later. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
42 | 42 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by DOUGLAS J JORGENSEN, DO Responses due by 2/20/2019. (STURTEVANT, MAUREEN) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
43 | 43 ORDER granting without objection42 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Time is extended for all Defendants to (1) 30 days after this Court rules on any motion to remand that might be filed, or (2) 30 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues a final decision as to whether to transfer the case to the Multidistrict Litigation, whichever date is later. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
Thursday, February 07, 2019 | ||
44 | 44 NOTICE of Appearance by RITCHIE E. BERGER on behalf of PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE PHARMA LP (BERGER, RITCHIE) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
45 | 45 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE PHARMA LP. (BERGER, RITCHIE) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
46 | 46 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark S. Cheffo filed by RITCHIE E. BERGER on behalf of PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE PHARMA LP (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1972362.) (BERGER, RITCHIE) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
Reset Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificate due from CHARLES C. LIFLAND by 2/19/2019. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at[LINK:http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms] . (mnw) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | ||
Reset Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC & JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC by 2/19/2019. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | ||
Friday, February 15, 2019 | ||
47 | 47 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELLE I. SCHAFFER on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC (SCHAFFER, MICHELLE) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
48 | 48 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charles C. Lifland filed by MICHELLE I. SCHAFFER on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1976651.) (SCHAFFER, MICHELLE) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
49 | 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (SCHAFFER, MICHELLE) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
50 | 50 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES M. CAMPBELL on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC (CAMPBELL, JAMES) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
Tuesday, March 26, 2019 | ||
51 | 51 MDL ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER AND VACATING THE MARCH 28, 2019, HEARING SESSION ORDER (mnw) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
52 | 52 MDL CERTIFIED ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER AND VACATING THE MARCH 28, 2019, HEARING SESSION ORDER (mnw) [Transferred from med on 3/28/2019.] | |
Thursday, March 28, 2019 | ||
53 | 53 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Maine. Case number 2:19-cv-00013. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |