Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Joseph G Rosania Jr
Case #: 1:19-bk-12400
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2019
Terminated:Dec 07, 2022
Plan Confirmed:Apr 08, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Skyfuel, Inc.
200 Union Blvd Ste 530
Lakewood, CO 80228-1832
Represented By
Skyfuel, Inc.
contact info
Last checked: never
Petitioning Creditor
Nathan Schuknecht
2310 Table Heights Drive
Golden, CO 80401
Represented By
Jonathan Dickey
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Matthew Gray
913 Eldorado Lane
Louisville, CO 80027
Represented By
Jonathan Dickey
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Wurth Timberline Fasteners,Inc.
Debra Wolfe, CFO 6195 Clermont Street
Commerce City, CO 80022
Represented By
Jonathan Dickey
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
HAWE North America, Inc.
Kristina Smith, CFO 9009-K Perimiter Woods Drive
Charlotte, NC 28216
Represented By
Jonathan Dickey
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
The Kinetic Co., Inc.
Jared Masters, President PO Box 200
Greendale, WI 53129
Represented By
Jonathan Dickey
contact info
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Byron G. Rogers Federal Building 1961 Stout St. Ste. 12-200
Denver, CO 80294


Docket last updated: 19 minutes ago
Friday, January 20, 2023
474 474 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Quarterly Report Fri 01/20 2:12 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 12/01/2022 Filed by Amy M. Leitch on behalf of Skyfuel, Inc.. (Leitch, Amy)
Related: [-]