Mercedes Benz USA LLC v. Bombardier
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Avern Cohn |
Referred: | Elizabeth A Stafford |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-10951 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement |
Case Filed: | Mar 29, 2019 |
Terminated: | Sep 26, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 25, 2019 4:37 AM EDT |
Defendant
Daniel Bombardier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mercedes Benz USA LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 30, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Copyright Report Sent To Washington (SSch) |
|
Thursday, September 26, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Notice to Parties Regarding Consolidated Case: Order of consolidation entered on *09/26/19*. Designated lead case number is 19-10948 . (DPer) |
|
24 | 24
![]() ORDER consolidating cases 19-10948 19-10949 and 19-10951 Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (DPer) |
|
Wednesday, September 11, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
![]() NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference set for 9/26/2019 11:00 AM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer) |
|
22 | 22
![]() MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer) |
|
Tuesday, September 10, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
![]() TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Motions to Dismiss held on 09/09/2019. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sheri Ward, www.transcriptorders.com) (Number of Pages: 15) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 10/1/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/11/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/9/2019. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Ward, S) |
|
Monday, September 09, 2019 | ||
minutes
Motion Hearing
Mon 09/09 1:26 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Avern Cohn: Motion Hearing held on 9/9/2019 re8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Daniel Bombardier Disposition: Motion taken under advisement (Court Reporter: Sheri Ward) (MVer) |
||
Friday, September 06, 2019 | ||
order
Text-Only Order
Fri 09/06 1:37 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER re20 Notice of Hearing on Motion. TIME CHANGE ONLY TO 11:00 A.M. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer) |
||
Tuesday, August 06, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
![]() NOTICE OF HEARING on8 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing IS RESCHEDULED for 9/9/2019 02:30 PM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
![]() NOTICE OF HEARING on8 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing IS RESCHEDULED for 8/14/2019 02:00 PM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer) |
|
Wednesday, June 12, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Maaren Alia Shah on behalf of Mercedes Benz USA LLC. (Shah, Maaren) |
|
Monday, June 10, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
![]() NOTICE OF HEARING on8 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 8/7/2019 11:00 AM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer) |
|
Monday, June 03, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Luke W Nikas on behalf of Mercedes Benz USA LLC. (Nikas, Luke) |
|
Friday, May 31, 2019 | ||
order
Text-Only Order
Fri 05/31 9:08 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING re13 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Defendant's Unopposed Ex Parte Motion to Extend Page Limit of Reply Brief Re Motion to Dismiss filed by Daniel Bombardier. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer) |
||
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
![]() REPLY to Response re8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Daniel Bombardier. (Erikson, David) |
|
14 | 14
![]() ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David A. Erikson appearing on behalf of Daniel Bombardier (Erikson, David) |
|
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
![]() MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Defendant's Unopposed Ex Parte Motion to Extend Page Limit of Reply Brief Re Motion to Dismiss by Daniel Bombardier. (Lippitt, Norman) |
|
Wednesday, May 15, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
![]() RESPONSE to8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Palizzi, A.) |
|
Tuesday, May 14, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline B. Giordano on behalf of Mercedes Benz USA LLC. (Giordano, Caroline) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
![]() DECLARATION by Daniel Bombardier re8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Defendants (Lippitt, Norman) |
|
9 | 9
![]() DECLARATION by Jeffrey Gluck re8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Defendants (Lippitt, Norman) |
|
8 | 8
![]() MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Lippitt, Norman) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Copyright Report Sent To Washington (SSch) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Daniel Bombardier served on 4/3/2019, answer due 4/24/2019. (DeFranco, Edward) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() EXHIBIT A re1 Complaint,, by Mercedes Benz USA LLC (DeFranco, Edward) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge George Caram Steeh and Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti to District Judge Avern Cohn and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (NAhm) |
|
notice
Error
Tue 04/02 9:21 AM
NOTICE of Error directed to: Edward J. DeFranco. Form AO 121 is missing. The filing attorney must file the form found on www.uscourts.gov with the Court to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SSch) |
||
Monday, April 01, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() SUMMONS Issued for *Daniel Bombardier* (SKra) |
|
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by A. Michael Palizzi on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Palizzi, A.) |
|
notice
Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option
Mon 04/01 10:40 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (SKra) |
||
Friday, March 29, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT filed by Mercedes Benz USA LLC against Daniel Bombardier. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7176625 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: New Castle, Delaware - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Not a U.S Resident. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (DeFranco, Edward) |