Original Case: 1:18-cv-05292

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:19-cv-00820
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2019
Terminated:Jul 19, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 03, 2019 4:25 AM EDT
Petitioner - Appellee
Isacco Jacky Saada
Represented By
Robert D. Arenstein
Law Offices of Robert D. Arenstein
contact info
Richard Min
Camhi & Min LLC
contact info
Respondent - Appellant
Narkis Aliza Golan
Represented By
Karen King
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info

GPO Jul 19 2019
OPINION, the district court's 03/22/2019 order is affirmed in part and vacated in part, and the cause is remanded for further proceedings, by RKW, JAC, RR, FILED.[2612400] [19-820]

Docket last updated: 02/13/2023 1:37 PM EST
Monday, April 01, 2019
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED. [2530185] [19-820] [Entered: 04/01/2019 04:41 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 12 pgs Case FILED
2 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, district court receipt # ANYEDC-11337990, FILED.[2530188] [19-820] [Entered: 04/01/2019 04:44 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 03/22/2019, RECEIVED.[2530189] [19-820] [Entered: 04/01/2019 04:44 PM]
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED. Service date 04/01/2019 by CM/ECF.[2530266] [19-820] [Entered: 04/01/2019 06:34 PM]
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, pursuant to Local Rule 4.3, this case includes a claim under the 1980 Hague Convention on the Civil Aspects of International Child Abduction and the International Child Abduction Remedies Act, 22 U.S.C. § 9001 et seq., RECEIVED. Service date 04/01/2019 by CM/ECF.[2530267] [19-820]--[Edited 04/02/2019 by TT] [Entered: 04/01/2019 06:36 PM]
Related: [-]
7 7 44 pgs MOTION, to expedite appeal, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED. Service date 04/01/2019 by CM/ECF. [2530269] [19-820] [Entered: 04/01/2019 07:26 PM]
Related: [-]