IBC Advanced Technologies et al v. Ucore Rare Metals et al
Utah District Court | |
Judge: | Howard C Nielson, Jr |
Referred: | Dustin B Pead |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-00222 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2019 |
Terminated: | Feb 26, 2021 |
Case in other court: | 3rd District, Salt Lake County, 190901487 |
Last checked: Thursday Oct 08, 2020 11:46 AM MDT |
Consol Defendant
Michael Schrider
|
Represented By
|
Consol Defendant
6th Wave Innovations
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Paul J. Talbot
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Liisa Marianne Silander-Izatt
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Reed M and Helen F Izatt Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Reed M Izatt Trust
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Jerald S Bradshaw Trust
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Reed M. Izatt
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Ronald L. Bruening
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Jerald S. Bradshaw
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Ucore Rare Metals
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
IBC Advanced Technologies
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Steven R. Izatt
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ucore Rare Metals
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jim McKenzie
|
|
Defendant
Peter Manuel
|
|
Plaintiff
Steven R. Izatt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
IBC Advanced Technologies
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, March 01, 2021 | ||
197 | 197
notice
Notice Vacating Hearing
Mon 03/01 11:41 AM
VACATING Status Conference set for 3/18 @ 3:00 pm before Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. (Notice generated by HCN chambers). Case closed. (mlp) |
|
Friday, February 26, 2021 | ||
196 | 196
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 02/26 12:50 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 195 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Each side to bear their own fees and costs. Case Closed. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr on 2/26/21. No attached document. (dla) |
|
Thursday, February 25, 2021 | ||
195 | 195
3
pgs
motion
Dismiss
Thu 02/25 11:16 AM
Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Counter Defendants IBC Advanced Technologies, Steven R. Izatt, Plaintiffs IBC Advanced Technologies, Steven R. Izatt.(Weinberg, Brenda) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Dismiss |