Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Avern Cohn
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 2:19-cv-11004
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Trademark
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2019
Terminated:May 20, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 02, 2019 4:54 AM EDT
Defendant
Graydar Properties, LLC
Defendant
Darlene Marshall
Plaintiff
Massage Green International Franchise Corp.
Represented By
Bernard J. Fuhs
Butzel Long
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Grayson Marshall
Terminated: 05/22/2019


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, May 28, 2019
21 21 misc Patent/Copyright/Trademark Report Tue 05/28 9:53 AM
Trademark Report Sent To Washington (SSch)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2019
20 20 notice Voluntary Dismissal Wed 05/22 10:55 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Massage Green International Franchise Corp. as to Grayson Marshall (Fuhs, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2019
19 19 order Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order Mon 05/20 9:55 AM
STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2019
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Fri 05/17 11:25 AM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Status Conference on 5/20/2019 is Cancelled re18 Notice to Appear. Counsel have indicated case has settled. (MVer)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2019
18 18 notice Appear* Fri 05/10 1:37 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference set for 5/20/2019 10:00 AM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
17 17 order Stipulation and Order Wed 04/17 10:13 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2019
order Text-Only Order Tue 04/16 1:15 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER CANCELLING re16 Notice to Appear. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer) Modified on 4/16/2019 (MVer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2019
16 16 notice Appear* Wed 04/10 2:03 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR: Miscellaneous Hearing on TRO is Rescheduled for 4/18/2019 02:00 PM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Certificate of Service Wed 04/10 9:01 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Massage Green International Franchise Corp. re Service of Notice of Appear on Darlene Marshall (Fuhs, Bernard)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/10 8:58 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Darlene Marshall served on 4/6/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Fuhs, Bernard)
Related: [-]
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Wed 04/10 2:01 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Hearing on 4/11/2019 is Cancelled re13 Notice to Appear (MVer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2019
13 13 notice Appear* Tue 04/09 9:43 AM
NOTICE TO APPEAR: Miscellaneous Hearing ON REQUEST FOR TRO IS RESCHEDULED for 4/11/2019 11:00 AM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice - Other Tue 04/09 9:34 AM
NOTICE by Massage Green International Franchise Corp. April 9, 2019 Notice of Filing Supplemental Exhibits to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint and Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Fuhs, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit J. April 6, 2019 Facebook Screenshot from Defendant Grayson Marshall,
Att: 2 Exhibit D. April 6, 2019 Facebook Screenshot from Defendant Grayson Marshall,
Att: 3 Exhibit K. April 8, 2019 Instagram Screenshots,
Att: 4 Exhibit E. April 8, 2019 Instagram Screenshots,
Att: 5 Exhibit L. April 8, 2019 Facebook Screenshots from Defendant Ms. Darlene M. Marshall,
Att: 6 Exhibit F. April 8, 2019 Facebook Screenshots from Defendant Ms. Darlene M. Marshall,
Att: 7 Exhibit M. April 3, 2019 Application for Registrtion of Fictitious Name,
Att: 8 Exhibit G. April 3, 2019 Application for Registrtion of Fictitious Name,
Att: 9 Exhibit N. Additional Cases Supporting Injunctive Relief Against Non-Signatories,
Att: 10 Exhibit H. Additional Cases Supporting Injunctive Relief Against Non-Signatories
11 11 notice Notice - Other Tue 04/09 8:52 AM
NOTICE by Massage Green International Franchise Corp. April 9, 2019 Certification and Proof of Service (Fuhs, Bernard)
Related: [-]
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Tue 04/09 9:41 AM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Hearing on 4/11/2019 is Cancelled re9 Notice to Appear (MVer)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2019
10 10 misc Patent/Copyright/Trademark Report Mon 04/08 3:38 PM
Trademark Report Sent To Washington (Fuhs, Bernard)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Appear* Mon 04/08 12:16 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR: Miscellaneous Hearing ON REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER set for 4/9/2019 11:00 AM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice - Other Mon 04/08 10:37 AM
NOTICE by Massage Green International Franchise Corp. Notice of Filing Supplemental Exhibits to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint and Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Fuhs, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit I. Photos of Franchised Location,
Att: 2 Exhibit C. Photos of Franchised Location
7 7 notice Notice - Other Mon 04/08 10:16 AM
NOTICE by Massage Green International Franchise Corp. Amended Rule 65 Certification (Fuhs, Bernard)
Related: [-]
notice Error Mon 04/08 9:49 AM
NOTICE of Error directed to: Bernard J. Fuhs. Form AO 120 is missing. The filing attorney must file the form found on www.uscourts.gov with the Court to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SSch)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2019
6 6 motion Preliminary Injunction Fri 04/05 3:39 PM
Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Massage Green International Franchise Corp.. (Fuhs, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A. Unpublished Westlaw Cases,
Att: 3 Exhibit B. Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order
5 5 notice Notice - Other Fri 04/05 3:29 PM
NOTICE by Massage Green International Franchise Corp. Certification (Fuhs, Bernard)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Preliminary Injunction Fri 04/05 3:25 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Massage Green International Franchise Corp.. (Fuhs, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A. Unpublished Westlaw Cases,
Att: 3 Exhibit B. Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order
3 3 service Summons Issued* Fri 04/05 1:03 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Graydar Properties, LLC, Darlene Marshall, Grayson Marshall* (SKra)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Fri 04/05 12:40 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Massage Green International Franchise Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Massage Green Holding, Inc. for Massage Green International Franchise Corp.. (Fuhs, Bernard)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Fri 04/05 12:33 PM
COMPLAINT Verified and for Injunctive and Other Relief filed by Massage Green International Franchise Corp. against Graydar Properties, LLC, Darlene Marshall, Grayson Marshall. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7185052 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Clay. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Fuhs, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Franchise Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B. Lease Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit C. November 16, 2018 Letter,
Att: 4 Exhibit D. December 13, 2018,
Att: 5 Exhibit E. December 20, 2018 Correspondence,
Att: 6 Exhibit F. January 25, 2019 Letter,
Att: 7 Exhibit G. Excerpts from Consent Final Judgmenet of Dissolution of Marriage,
Att: 8 Exhibit H. April 4, 2019 Letter
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Fri 04/05 1:10 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (SKra)
Related: [-]