Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Joshua D Wolson
Case #: 2:19-cv-01463
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2019
Terminated:Sep 12, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 02, 2019 4:44 AM EDT
Defendant
RONAK FOODS
Plaintiff
SAMANTHA SCHALL
Represented By
ARI RISSON KARPF
Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti, P.C.
contact info
ADAM C. LEASE
Karpf Karpf & Cerutti PC
contact info

GPO Aug 27 2019
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 8/27/19. 8/27/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
GPO Aug 27 2019
ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF AND AGAINST DEFENDANT RONAK FOODS D/B/A PIZZA HUT AS TO COUNT II OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IN THE AMOUNT OF $88,326.61. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 8/27/19. 8/27/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )

Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago
Wednesday, June 24, 2020
20 20 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 06/25 10:25 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SAMANTHA SCHALL re: U.S. MARSHALS served Summons and Complaint upon RONAK FOODS by PERSONAL. RONAK FOODS served on 4/7/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (jaa, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
19 19 misc Praecipe/Request Tue 02/25 3:37 PM
Praecipe for the issuance of a Writ of Execution by SAMANTHA SCHALL. (LEASE, ADAM)
Related: [-]
order Writ Issued Thu 02/27 11:23 AM
WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED AS TO CITIZENS BANK, AS GARNISHEE. FORWARDED TO U.S. MARSHALS ON 2/27/20. (jaa, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2020
18 18 service Certificate of Service Fri 01/10 9:34 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAMANTHA SCHALL re17 Order on Motion for Contempt, (LEASE, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2020
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Contempt Thu 01/09 9:46 AM
ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO HOLD DEFENDANT IN CONTEMPY OF COURT TO WHICH DEFENDANT RONAK FOODS D/B/A PIZZA HUT HAS FAILED TO RESPOND IS GRANTED ETC. AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL PROVIDE A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO DEFENDANT AND TO MESSRS. PANDYA AND PATEL VIA CERTIFIED MAIL OR OTHER METHOD THAT PROVIDES VERIFICATION OF DELIVERY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 1/8/20.1/9/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2019
16 16 motion Contempt Fri 12/20 11:48 AM
MOTION for Contempt filed by SAMANTHA SCHALL.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(LEASE, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, November 20, 2019
15 15 service Certificate of Service Wed 11/20 10:48 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAMANTHA SCHALL re14 Order on Motion to Compel, (LEASE, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2019
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Wed 11/20 9:21 AM
ORDERED AND DECREED THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO HER POST-JUDGMENT DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND DEPOSITION NOTICES IS HEREBY GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 11/19/19.11/20/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Compel Tue 11/19 10:10 AM
MOTION to Compel Defendant to provide responses to her post-judgment discovery requests and deposition notices filed by SAMANTHA SCHALL.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(LEASE, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Thursday, September 12, 2019
12 12 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Thu 09/12 12:30 PM
ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS CASE CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 9/12/19. 9/12/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2019
11 11 1 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Tue 08/27 2:21 PM
ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF AND AGAINST DEFENDANT RONAK FOODS D/B/A PIZZA HUT AS TO COUNT II OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IN THE AMOUNT OF $88,326.61. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 8/27/19. 8/27/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
Related: [-]
10 10 10 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Tue 08/27 2:18 PM
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 8/27/19. 8/27/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2019
9 9 misc Request for Default Judgment Tue 07/16 8:49 AM
Memorandum of law in support of Request for Default Judgment by SAMANTHA SCHALL against All Defendants.(LEASE, ADAM) Modified on 7/16/2019 (nd, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certification of Plaintiff,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Judgment on Default
Wednesday, July 03, 2019
8 8 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Wed 07/03 3:38 PM
ORDERED THAT THE DAMAGES HEARING SCHEDULED FOR JULY 25, 2019, AT 10:00 A.M. IS CANCELLED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL SUBMIT INFORMATION SUPPORTING HER DAMAGES CLAIMS IN WRITING NO LATER THAN JULY 19, 2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 7/3/19. 7/3/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2019
7 7 misc Praecipe/Request Mon 07/01 10:10 AM
Request to provide written submissions on the issue of damages in lieu of evidentiary hearing by SAMANTHA SCHALL.(LEASE, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Correspondence,
Att: 2 Exhibit Memorandum
Friday, June 28, 2019
6 6 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 06/28 4:15 PM
ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL APPEAR FOR A DAMAGES HEARING IN COURTROOM 3B AT 10:00 AM ON 7/25/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 6/28/19. 6/28/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2019
5 5 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 06/27 9:34 AM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE TO HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 06/27/2019. 06/27/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(nd, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2019
4 4 misc Request for Default Wed 06/26 9:11 AM
Request for Default and the scheduling of an appropriate damages hearing by SAMANTHA SCHALL against All Defendants.(LEASE, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - request to waive service,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - affidavit of service,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - correspondence to Defendant
order Clerks Entry of Default Wed 06/26 4:45 PM
DEFAULT BY RONAK FOODS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (jaa, )
Related: [-]
misc Default Entered Wed 06/26 4:46 PM
Default Entered (jaa, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2019
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/16 1:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SAMANTHA SCHALL re: Neil Poritsky served Summons and Complaint upon RONAK FOODS by Personal Service. RONAK FOODS served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (KARPF, ARI)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2019
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/03 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM C. LEASE on behalf of SAMANTHA SCHALL (LEASE, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Fri 04/05 4:28 PM
COMPLAINT against RONAK FOODS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13462485.), filed by SAMANTHA SCHALL.(KARPF, ARI)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Mon 04/08 10:12 AM
Summons Issued as to RONAK FOODS. One Forwarded To: Counsel on 4/8/19 (jwl, )
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Mon 04/08 10:12 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by SAMANTHA SCHALL. (jwl, )
Related: [-]