Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-60030

Montana Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Benjamin P Hursh
Case #: 2:19-ap-00014
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2019
Terminated:Feb 03, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
DAVID RAYMOND SMITH
975 SOMEESCH LANE
HAMILTON, MT 59840
Represented By
DAVID RAYMOND SMITH
contact info
Plaintiff
TrailWest Bank f/k/a Bitterroot Valley Bank d/b/a Ravalli County Bank
P.O. Box 9
Lolo, MT 59847
Represented By
DAN G CEDERBERG
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, February 03, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Mon 02/03 2:30 PM
Adversary Case 2:19-ap-14 Closed. (Cunningham, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2020
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings Fri 01/24 10:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/24/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)16 Order Dismissing Proceedings
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
16 16 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Proceedings Wed 01/22 11:49 AM
Order Dismissing Proceedings with Prejudice Signed on 1/22/2020 Related [+]. (Grady, Colleen)
Related: [-] (s)15 Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant DAVID RAYMOND SMITH
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
15 15 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Tue 01/21 9:39 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by DAVID RAYMOND SMITH. (BINNEY, JON)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2019
14 14 notice Notice Fri 07/12 3:07 PM
Notice Initial Disclosures Filed by TrailWest Bank f/k/a Bitterroot Valley Bank d/b/a Ravalli County Bank. (CEDERBERG, DAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2019
13 13 notice Notice - ADV Thu 06/20 11:18 AM
Notice of Consent to Court Finally Adjudicating Claims Filed by TrailWest Bank f/k/a Bitterroot Valley Bank d/b/a Ravalli County Bank. (CEDERBERG, DAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2019
12 12 notice Notice - ADV Wed 06/12 2:44 PM
Notice consent for court to obtain jurisdiction Filed by DAVID RAYMOND SMITH. (BINNEY, JON)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2019
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Trial Fri 05/31 10:59 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Trial. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/31/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)10 Order Setting Trial
Wednesday, May 29, 2019
10 10 4 pgs order Order Setting Trial Wed 05/29 4:36 PM
Order Setting Trial Signed on 5/29/2019 Related [+]. On or before June 21, 2019, the parties shall file a notice stating consent to this Court finally adjudicating the claims alleged in this adversary proceeding. An initial disclosure deadline for all parties is July 12, 2019. Discovery due by 11/1/2019. Disclosure of Experts due by 1/24/2020. Amendments to Pleadings or to Join Additional Parties due by 7/26/2019. Pre-Trial Motions due by 12/12/2019. Mediation or Settlement Conference Completed by 12/20/2019. Pre-Trial Order, List of Witnesses & List of Exhibits due by 1/17/2020. Pre-Trial Memorandum due by 1/24/2020. TRIAL scheduled for 1/31/2020 at 09:00 AM at MISSOULA HEARINGS 201 E BROADWAY; CRTRM #200A, MISSOULA, MT . (Grady, Colleen)
Related: [-] (s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff TrailWest Bank f/k/a Bitterroot Valley Bank d/b/a Ravalli County Bank
Sunday, May 05, 2019
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing Sun 05/05 10:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/05/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)8 Order Setting Hearing
Friday, May 03, 2019
8 8 2 pgs order Order Setting Hearing Fri 05/03 4:32 PM
Order Setting Pretrial Scheduling Conference Hearing. Signed on 5/3/2019 Related [+]. PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE set for 5/29/2019 at 09:00 AM at Telephonic Hearing . (Cunningham, Pamela)
Related: [-] (s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff TrailWest Bank f/k/a Bitterroot Valley Bank d/b/a Ravalli County Bank
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/03 3:48 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by DAVID RAYMOND SMITH. (BINNEY, JON)
Related: [-]
6 6 utility Corrective Entry (No Signature) - ADV Fri 05/03 3:13 PM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY - PARTY FILER IS HEREBY INSTRUCTED TO IMMEDIATELY RE-SUBMIT FILING - NO SIGNATURE(S) ON PDF. Related [+]. (Cunningham, Pamela)
Related: [-] (s)5 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant DAVID RAYMOND SMITH
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/03 2:02 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by DAVID RAYMOND SMITH. (BINNEY, JON)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2019
4 4 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 04/08 11:50 AM
Filing fee information: Receipt number A2497945 . Regarding the filing fee for Complaint([LINK 19-00014 BPH] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Friday, April 05, 2019
3 3 court Summons Issued Fri 04/05 5:23 PM
Summons Issued on DAVID RAYMOND SMITH Date Issued 4/5/2019, Answer Due 5/6/2019. (Grady, Colleen)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Exhibit - Attorney Event Fri 04/05 5:02 PM
Exhibit A to Complaint to Except from Discharge Filed by TrailWest Bank f/k/a Bitterroot Valley Bank d/b/a Ravalli County Bank. (CEDERBERG, DAN)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/05 4:51 PM
Adversary case 19-00014 Complaint by DAN G CEDERBERG on behalf of TrailWest Bank f/k/a Bitterroot Valley Bank d/b/a Ravalli County Bank, DAVID RAYMOND SMITH against DAVID RAYMOND SMITH. Fee Amount $350. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (CEDERBERG, DAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
Att: 3 Summons