Delaware District Court
Judge:Richard G Andrews
Case #: 1:19-cv-00664
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2019
Terminated:Jul 01, 2020
Last checked: Monday Oct 07, 2019 4:58 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Deborah R. Greene
Represented By
Ronald S. Gellert
Gellert Scali Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Live A Moment, Inc.
Represented By
Ronald S. Gellert
Gellert Scali Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Natalie Grainger
Represented By
Callan R. Jackson
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info
Christopher Nicholas Kelly
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info
Alan Richard Silverstein
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Peer T. Pedersen, Jr.
Represented By
Callan R. Jackson
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info
Christopher Nicholas Kelly
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info
Alan Richard Silverstein
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Deborah R. Greene
Represented By
Ronald S. Gellert
Gellert Scali Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Live A Moment, Inc.
Represented By
Ronald S. Gellert
Gellert Scali Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Natalie Grainger
Represented By
Callan R. Jackson
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info
Christopher Nicholas Kelly
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info
Alan Richard Silverstein
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Peer T. Pedersen, Jr.
Represented By
Callan R. Jackson
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info
Christopher Nicholas Kelly
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info
Alan Richard Silverstein
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 01, 2020
45 45 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 07/01 4:14 PM
SO ORDERED Granting44 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/1/2020. (nms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
44 44 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 06/30 5:00 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Natalie Grainger, Peer T. Pedersen, Jr. (Silverstein, Alan)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 22, 2020
minutes Oral Argument Fri 05/22 3:00 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Oral Argument held on 5/22/2020 re39 MOTION for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel to Defendants. Counsel for plaintiffs: A. Silverstein. Counsel for defendants: R. Gellert. (Court Reporter Heather Triozzi.) (crb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 19, 2020
43 43 order Oral Order Tue 05/19 2:39 PM
ORAL ORDER: The hearing scheduled for May 22, 2020, will now be held using Skype for business. A joint email with the email addresses for all those participating (including the defendant client) in the hearing shall be due to the Court's Case Manager by 4:00 PM on 5/20/2020.. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/19/2020. (nms)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 30, 2020
42 42 13 pgs order Order Mon 03/30 3:35 PM
SO ORDERED Granting Stipulation and Order for the Production and Exchange of Confidential Information. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/30/2020. (nms)
Related: [-]
41 41 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/30 11:28 AM
Joint Motion for Entry of an Order for the Production and Exchange of Confidential Information - filed by Natalie Grainger, Peer T. Pedersen, Jr.(Silverstein, Alan) Modified on 3/30/2020 (nms)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, March 25, 2020
40 40 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 03/25 2:00 PM
ORDER: A hearing on the Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel (D.I.39 ) is set for 5/22/2020, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 6A. Defendants' counsel shall provide notice of the hearing to Live A Moment, Inc. and Deborah R. Greene. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/25/2020. (nms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 24, 2020
39 39 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 03/24 3:16 PM
MOTION for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel to Defendants - filed by Deborah R. Greene, Live A Moment, Inc..(Gellert, Ronald) Modified on 3/24/2020 (nms)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, March 17, 2020
order SO ORDERED Tue 03/17 1:16 PM
SO ORDERED, re38 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to substantially complete document production to April 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/17/2020. (nms)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 16, 2020
38 38 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Mon 03/16 6:56 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to substantially complete document production to April 1, 2020 - filed by Natalie Grainger, Peer T. Pedersen, Jr. (Silverstein, Alan)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 13, 2020
order Oral Order Fri 03/13 11:12 AM
ORAL ORDER- At the present time, Judge Fallon has decided to conduct the mediation scheduled for March 17, 2020 telephonically. The logistics of the telephonic mediation shall be as follows: Plaintiffs counsel shall make arrangements for a dial-in number for all counsel, including the Judge, to use throughout the mediation process when the mediation begins. This line should be available throughout the mediation should the Judge wish to have discussions with all parties. Plaintiffs counsel shall also arrange for a separate line for their private discussions with the Judge throughout the mediation process. Defense counsel shall arrange for a separate line for their private discussions with the Judge throughout the mediation process. These lines should remain open for use by counsel and the Court until the mediation is concluded. Plaintiffs counsel shall provide all of the dial-in information by email to Judge Fallon, with a copy to her Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Hicks, by 12:00 Noon Eastern Time Monday, March 16, 2020. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/13/2020. (lih)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 04, 2020
37 37 misc Letter Wed 03/04 11:18 AM
Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Christopher N. Kelly re36 Letter. (Kelly, Christopher) Modified on 3/4/2020 (lih)
Related: [-]
order Oral Order Wed 03/04 11:38 AM
ORAL ORDER- denying36 Letter Request. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/4/2020. (lih)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 03, 2020
36 36 misc Letter Tue 03/03 3:34 PM
Letter to Magistrate Judge Fallon, from Ronald S. Gellert, Esq., regarding request for Deborah R. Greene to appear telephonically at mediation conference. (Gellert, Ronald) Modified on 3/3/2020 (nms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2020
35 35 5 pgs order Order Setting Mediation Conferences Wed 02/19 10:16 AM
ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: A Mediation Conference is set for 3/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/19/2020. (lih)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2020
34 34 discov Notice of Service Mon 02/17 3:40 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs'/Counterclaim Defendants' Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Defendants/Counterclaim Plaintiffs filed by Natalie Grainger, Peer T. Pedersen, Jr.(Silverstein, Alan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2020
33 33 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Thu 01/30 3:02 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Extension of Time - filed by Natalie Grainger, Peer T. Pedersen, Jr. (Silverstein, Alan) Modified on 1/30/2020 (nms)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Thu 01/30 3:30 PM
SO ORDERED, re33 STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/30/2020. (nms)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2019
32 32 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Thu 12/12 2:41 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to substantially complete document production to February 14, 2020 - filed by Natalie Grainger, Peer T. Pedersen, Jr. (Silverstein, Alan)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Thu 12/12 4:14 PM
SO ORDERED, re32 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to substantially complete document production to February 14, 2020. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/12/2019. (nms)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2019
31 31 discov Notice of Service Fri 11/15 11:06 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Defendants/Counterclaim Plaintiffs Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs/Counterclaim Defendants First Set of Interrogatories, (ii) Defendants/Counterclaim Plaintiffs Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs/Counterclaim Defendants First Set of Requests For Production of Documents and (iii) Defendants/Counterclaim Plaintiffs Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs/Counterclaim Defendants First Set of Requests for Admissions filed by Deborah R. Greene, Live A Moment, Inc..(Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2019
30 30 discov Notice of Service Thu 11/14 5:53 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Peer T. Pedersen Jr.'s and Natalie Grainger's Responses and Objections to Defendants' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents; and Plaintiffs Peer T. Pedersen Jr.'s and Natalie Grainger's Responses and Objections to Defendants' First Set of Requests for Admission and Interrogatories filed by Natalie Grainger, Peer T. Pedersen, Jr.(Silverstein, Alan)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Thu 11/14 11:52 AM
SO ORDERED, re29 STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/13/2019. (nms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2019
29 29 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Wed 11/13 4:58 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Parties to serve responses and objections to various discovery requests to November 14, 2019 - filed by Natalie Grainger, Peer T. Pedersen, Jr. (Silverstein, Alan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2019
28 28 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Wed 11/06 12:20 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to various discovery to November 13, 2019 - filed by Natalie Grainger, Peer T. Pedersen, Jr. (Silverstein, Alan)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Wed 11/06 2:53 PM
SO ORDERED, re28 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to various discovery to November 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/6/2019. (nms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2019
order SO ORDERED Wed 10/23 10:59 AM
SO ORDERED, re27 STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Extension of Time to respond to various discovery to November 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/22/2019. (nms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2019
27 27 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Tue 10/22 3:46 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to various discovery to November 7, 2019 - filed by Natalie Grainger, Peer T. Pedersen, Jr. (Silverstein, Alan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2019
26 26 discov Notice of Service Wed 10/02 1:28 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Live A Moment, Inc., and Deborah R. Greene's First Set of Requests for Admissions and Interrogatories filed by Deborah R. Greene, Live A Moment, Inc..(Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2019
25 25 discov Notice of Service Tue 10/01 4:34 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs'-Counterclaim Defendants' First Set of Requests for Admission Directed to Defendants-Counterclaim Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs'-Counterclaim Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants-Counterclaim Plaintiffs filed by Natalie Grainger, Peer T. Pedersen, Jr.(Silverstein, Alan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2019
24 24 discov Notice of Service Tue 09/24 5:48 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs'-Counterclaim Defendants' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Defendants-Counterclaim Plaintiffs filed by Natalie Grainger, Peer T. Pedersen, Jr.(Silverstein, Alan)
Related: [-]
23 23 discov Notice of Service Tue 09/24 4:48 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Live A Moment, Inc., and Deborah R. Greenes First Set of Requests for Production of Documents filed by Deborah R. Greene, Live A Moment, Inc..(Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2019
22 22 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Mon 09/23 9:40 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to serve initial requests for production to September 24, 2019 - filed by Deborah R. Greene, Live A Moment, Inc.. (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Mon 09/23 2:28 PM
SO ORDERED, re22 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to serve initial requests for production to September 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/23/2019. (nms)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2019
order SO ORDERED Mon 09/16 11:18 AM
SO ORDERED, re21 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to serve initial requests for production to September 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/16/2019. (nms)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2019
21 21 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Fri 09/13 5:07 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to serve initial requests for production to September 20, 2019 - filed by Deborah R. Greene, Live A Moment, Inc.. (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2019
order SO ORDERED Tue 09/10 9:03 AM
SO ORDERED, re20 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to serve initial requests for production to September 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/6/2019. (nms)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Tue 09/10 9:15 AM
SO ORDERED, re13 Stipulation and Proposed Order for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/10/2019. (nms)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2019
20 20 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Fri 09/06 5:05 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to serve initial requests for production to September 13, 2019 - filed by Natalie Grainger, Peer T. Pedersen, Jr. (Silverstein, Alan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2019
19 19 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Thu 08/29 4:21 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to serve initial requests for production to September 6, 2019 - filed by Deborah R. Greene, Live A Moment, Inc.. (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Thu 08/29 4:44 PM
SO ORDERED, re19 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to serve initial requests for production to September 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/29/2019. (nms)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2019
18 18 discov Notice of Service Mon 07/22 4:35 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Peer T. Pedersen Jr.'s and Natalie Grainger's Initial Disclosures filed by Natalie Grainger, Peer T. Pedersen, Jr.(Silverstein, Alan)
Related: [-]
17 17 discov Notice of Service Mon 07/22 4:23 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Live A Moment, Inc., and Deborah R. Greenes Initial Disclosures filed by Deborah R. Greene, Live A Moment, Inc..(Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2019
16 16 4 pgs order Order Setting Teleconference Mon 07/08 2:21 PM
ORDER Setting Teleconference: plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 7/29/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/8/2019. (lih)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Mediation - Magistrate Judge only Mon 07/08 10:40 AM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at[LINK:http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/general-orders/magistrate-judges-standing-order-adr-mediation] (cak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
15 15 order Scheduling Order - General Tue 07/02 12:53 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 3/16/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 3/16/2010. Fact Discovery completed by 6/5/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2020. A Pretrial Conference is set for 2/5/2021, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A. A 3-day Jury Trial is set for 2/16/2021, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/2/2019. (nms)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Oral Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Tue 07/02 12:47 PM
ORAL ORDER: The Rule 16(b) Conference set for July 2, 2019, is now CANCELLED. The Court will enter the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/2/2019. (nms)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2019
13 13 misc Proposed Order Fri 06/28 2:35 PM
PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by Natalie Grainger, Peer T. Pedersen, Jr. (Silverstein, Alan) Modified on 6/28/2019 (nms)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2019
12 12 answer Answer to Counterclaim Fri 06/21 12:16 PM
ANSWER to11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Natalie Grainger, Peer T. Pedersen, Jr.(Kelly, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2019
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Fri 05/31 4:47 PM
Amended ANSWER to2 Complaint, and COUNTERCLAIMS against All Plaintiffs, by Deborah R. Greene, Live A Moment, Inc..(Gellert, Ronald) Modified on 5/31/2019 (nms)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, May 21, 2019
10 10 1 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference Tue 05/21 12:08 PM
Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 7/2/2019, at 4:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/21/2019. (nms)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2019
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Fri 05/10 4:53 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Live A Moment, Inc.. (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/10 4:52 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint, by Deborah R. Greene, Live A Moment, Inc..(Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
7 7 misc Redacted Document Wed 04/17 5:36 PM
REDACTED VERSION of2 Complaint, by Natalie Grainger, Peer T. Pedersen, Jr. (Kelly, Christopher)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/17 12:15 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2019
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/11 4:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peer T. Pedersen, Jr, Natalie Grainger. Live A Moment, Inc. served on 4/11/2019, answer due 5/2/2019. (Kelly, Christopher)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/11 4:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peer T. Pedersen, Jr, Natalie Grainger. Deborah R. Greene served on 4/11/2019, answer due 5/2/2019. (Kelly, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2019
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Wed 04/10 4:37 PM
ORDER granting D.I.1 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/10/2019. (nmg)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Wed 04/10 3:10 PM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Wed 04/10 3:10 PM
[SEALED] COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Deborah R. Greene and Live A Moment, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number DEX031641.) - filed by Peer T. Pedersen Jr. and Natalie Grainger.(nmg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 motion Seal Wed 04/10 3:06 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal - filed by Natalie Grainger and Peer T. Pedersen, Jr.(nmg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
service Summons Issued Wed 04/10 3:12 PM
Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Deborah R. Greene on 4/10/2019; Live A Moment, Inc. on 4/10/2019. (nmg)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Wed 04/10 3:13 PM
Remark: Exit Copies to Duty Judge (RGA). (nmg)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Wed 04/10 4:38 PM
Remark : Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (nmg)
Related: [-]