Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Timothy S Black
Case #: 1:14-cv-00151
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2014
Re-opened:Sep 30, 2015
Terminated:Aug 30, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 09, 2014 1:21 AM EST
Defendant
Blue Ash, City of
Represented By
Gary Edward Becker
contact info
Kirk M Wall
Dinsmore & Shohl LLP
contact info
Bryan E Pacheco
contact info
Mark Alan VanderLaan
contact info
Plaintiff
Ingrid Anderson
Represented By
Timothy Michael Burke
Manley Burke Lipton & Cook
contact info
Kathleen Farro
Manley Burke
contact info
Plaintiff
Housing Opportunities Made Equal, Inc.
Represented By
Timothy Michael Burke
Manley Burke Lipton & Cook
contact info
Kathleen Farro
Manley Burke
contact info

GPO Jul 07 2014
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Doc. 13). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 7/7/2014. (mr1)

Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, October 03, 2016
47 47 order Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment Mon 10/03 12:17 PM
CONSENT DECREE. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 10/3/2016. (mr)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2016
46 46 motion Approve Consent Judgment Fri 09/30 4:22 PM
Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Enter by Defendant Blue Ash, City of. Responses due by 10/24/2016 (Cassady, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2016
45 45 order Order Dismissing Case Tue 08/30 2:38 PM
CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The parties having successfully mediated a settlement in the presence of this Judge on August 30, 2016; It is ORDERED that this action is to be DISMISSED with prejudice, provided that any of the parties may, upon good cause shown within 45 days, move to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. Counsel shall forthwith submit to this Court by email to Black_Chambers@ohsd.uscourts.gov the proposed Consent Decree. Also, if desired, the parties may timely move to substitute a judgment entry contemplated by the settlement agreement. The Court expressly and explicitly retains jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement of the parties. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 8/30/2016. (mr)
Related: [-]
minutes Settlement Conference Tue 08/30 2:35 PM
Minute Entry: This civil action came before the Court on 8/30/2016 at 9:30 a.m. for a settlement conference. For Plaintiff: Attorneys Tim Burke and Kathleen Ryan appeared with Plaintiff, Ingrid Anderson, and Plaintiff Housing Opportunities Made Equal, Inc. representative, Brandon Craig. For Defendant: Attorney Gary Becker appeared with City Manager David Waltz, Treasurer Sherry Poppe, and Miami Valley Risk Management representative, Craig Blair. The parties successfully mediated; settlement terms were placed on the record. A Conditional Order of Dismissal will be docketed by separate entry. (Court Reporter: Luke Lavin) (mr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2016
44 44 order Order Thu 08/25 5:03 PM
ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - This case is hereby set for settlement conference on August 30, 2016 at 9:30 a.m., at the Potter Stewart U.S. Courthouse, 100 E. 5th Street, Room 815, Cincinnati, Ohio. Not later than August 29, 2016 at 12:00 p.m., each party shall submit to the Judge only, and without formal filing with the Clerk, a confidential letter of three pages or less and should be delivered by email (black_chambers@ohsd.uscourts.gov). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 8/25/2016. (mr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2016
order Order Thu 08/11 10:16 AM
Notation order: This matter is before the Court on the parties' joint request for an extension of time to submit a proposed order and amended calendar to the Court. For good cause shown, the parties' request is granted. On or before 8/24/16, counsel shall meet and confer and jointly email chambers (black_chambers@ohsd.uscourts.gov): (1) a proposed order memorializing the terms of the oral agreement to stay the case; and (2) a joint proposed amended calendar, including a trial date in August 2017. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 8/10/16. (sct)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 03, 2016
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 08/03 5:41 PM
Minute Entry and Notation Order: This civil action came before the Court for a status conference by telephone on 8/3/16 at 12:15 p.m. Attorneys Kathleen Ryan, Timothy Burke, and Kelly Pitcher participated. On or before 8/10/16, counsel shall meet and confer and jointly email chambers (black_chambers@ohsd.uscourts.gov): (1) a proposed order memorializing the terms of the oral agreement to stay the case; and (2) a joint proposed amended calendar, including a trial date in August 2017. IT IS SO ORDERED. (mr)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2016
notice Notice of Hearing Fri 07/29 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: A Status Conference by telephone is set for 8/3/2016 at 12:15 p.m. before Judge Timothy S. Black. COUNSEL SHALL CALL 1-888-684-8852; Access code: 8411435; Security code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. (mr)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2016
43 43 order Cincinnati Preliminary Pretrial Order ~Util - Terminate Motions 1 - Terminate Cincinnati Preliminary PTO Deadlines Fri 07/01 9:07 AM
AMENDED CALENDAR ORDER:42 MOTION to Amend/Correct is GRANTED and the Court enters the following Amended Calendar Order: Lay Witness due by 9/2/2016, Status Conference set for 2/7/2017 10:30 AM in Teleconference before Judge Timothy S. Black, Plaintiff Rebuttal Expert due by 8/1/2016, Discovery due by 10/3/2016, Motions not directed to pleadings due by 10/24/2016, Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/8/2017 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Timothy S. Black, Jury Trial set for 5/15/2017 09:30 AM before Judge Timothy S. Black. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 6/30/2016. (jee)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2016
42 42 motion Amend/Correct Thu 06/30 1:58 PM
Motion to Amend Scheduling Order by Defendant Blue Ash, City of. Amendment to33 Preliminary Pretrial Order, Set Deadlines,, Proposed Amended Scheduling Order . (Cassady, Andrew) Modified to create motion on 6/30/2016 (jee)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2016
minutes Status Conference Wed 06/29 12:31 PM
Minute Entry and Notation Order: This civil action came on before the Court for a status conference by telephone on 6/29/16 at 10:00 a.m. Attorneys Kathleen Ryan, Timothy Burke, Gary Becker, and Andrew Cassady participated. On or before 7/29/16, counsel shall meet and confer and jointly email chambers (black_chambers@ohsd.uscourts.gov): (1) with a joint statement defining the scope of trial or a proposal regarding how counsel intends to brief the issue in order for the Court to determine the scope of trial; and (2) proposed trial dates in May 2017. IT IS SO ORDERED. (jee)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2016
41 41 order Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 05/16 9:44 AM
HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 5/16/2016. (mr)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2016
40 40 motion Protective Order Fri 05/13 3:15 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiffs Ingrid Anderson, Housing Opportunities Made Equal, Inc.. Responses due by 6/6/2016 (Ryan, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A
39 39 service Certificate of Service Fri 05/13 11:56 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Blue Ash, City of re38 Notice of Appearance of Andrew B. Cassady (Cassady, Andrew)
Related: [-]
notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/13 11:14 AM
Notice Other re Notice of Appearance38 : The document was filed without a certificate of service which is required pursuant to S.D. Ohio Civ. R. 5.2. To correct the filing use the Certificate of Service event found under Civil Events-Initial Pleadings and Service-Service of Process and link the event to the Notice of Appearance when prompted. (jee)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2016
38 38 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/12 12:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Cassady for Defendant Blue Ash, City of (Cassady, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 25, 2016
37 37 trial Witness List Thu 02/25 1:57 PM
Expert Witness List by Plaintiffs Ingrid Anderson, Housing Opportunities Made Equal, Inc.. (Ryan, Kathleen) Modified docket text on 2/25/2016 (eh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 15, 2015
36 36 trial Witness List Tue 12/15 2:48 PM
Witness List by Plaintiffs Ingrid Anderson, Housing Opportunities Made Equal, Inc.. (Ryan, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
35 35 trial Witness List Tue 12/15 2:08 PM
Witness List by Defendant Blue Ash, City of. (Pacheco, Bryan)
Related: [-]
34 34 trial Witness List Tue 12/15 12:15 PM
Witness List by Defendant Blue Ash, City of. (Pacheco, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 05, 2015
33 33 order Cincinnati Preliminary Pretrial Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 11/05 5:00 PM
CALENDAR ORDER: Motions directed to pleadings: 12/1/2015. Lay Witness disclosures: 12/15/2015. Primary expert designations: 2/29/16. Rebuttal expert designations: 5/15/16. Status Conference by telephone: 6/29/2016 at 10:00 AM. Discovery deadline: 8/31/2016. Dispositive Motion deadline: 9/15/2016. Final Pretrial Conference in Cincinnati Chambers, Room 815: 1/17/2017 at 1:00 PM. Jury Trial in Cincinnati: 1/23/2017 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/15/15. (sct)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 16, 2015
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 10/16 2:48 PM
Minute Entry and Notation Order: This civil action came before the Court for a status conference by telephone on 10/16/15 at 12:00 p.m. Attorneys Timothy Burke, Kathleen Ryan, Bryan Pacheco, Gary Becker, and Mark VanderLaan participated. The parties shall submit a joint proposed calendar to Chambers' email (black_chambers@ohsd.uscourts.gov) on or before 10/23/15. IT IS SO ORDERED. (mr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 01, 2015
notice Notice of Hearing Thu 10/01 2:20 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: A Status Conference by telephone is set for 10/16/2015 at 12:00 p.m. before Judge Timothy S. Black. COUNSEL SHALL CALL 1-888-684-8852; Access code: 8411435; Security code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. (mr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 30, 2015
32 32 appeal USCA Mandate Wed 09/30 11:47 AM
MANDATE of USCA - Pursuant to the court's disposition that was filed 08/14/2015 the mandate for this case hereby issues today 9/29/15 as to30 Notice of Appeal filed by Ingrid Anderson, Housing Opportunities Made Equal, Inc. (pb)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 14, 2015
31 31 appeal USCA Judgment Mon 08/17 12:29 PM
USCA OPINION and JUDGMENT as to30 Notice of Appeal affirming in part and reversing in part the judgment of the district court and remanding the case forfurther proceedings consistent with the opinion of this court. Note: Mandate to issue. (sct)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 01, 2014
USCA Case Number 14-3754 for30 Notice of Appeal filed by Ingrid Anderson, Housing Opportunities Made Equal, Inc. Case Manager - Linda M. Niesen. (sct1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 24, 2014
30 30 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Plaintiffs Ingrid Anderson, Housing Opportunities Made Equal, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0648-4661507. Appeal Record due by 8/6/2014. (Farro, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Order 7-7-14
Monday, July 07, 2014
29 29 CLERK'S JUDGMENT AFFIRMING ORDER28 . (mr1)
Related: [-]
28 28 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Doc.13 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 7/7/2014. (mr1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 19, 2014
NOTATION ORDER: In light of the parties' joint email of 6/19/14, the informal discovery conference of 6/20/14 is VACATED. Discovery is STAYED until the pending Motion for Summary Judgment is resolved. IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Timothy S. Black on 6/19/2014. (mr1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 17, 2014
NOTATION ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 37.1 and at the parties' request, this case is set for an informal discovery dispute conference by telephone on 6/20/14 at 10:30 a.m. COUNSEL SHALL CALL 1-888-684-8852 and use the following codes: Access Code: 8411435; Security Code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. Prior to the conference, by 6/19/14 at 12:00 p.m., counsel for Plaintiffs and counsel for Defendant shall each email to chambers (black_chambers@ohsd.uscourts.gov) and to each other a 1-2 page explanation of the dispute. IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Timothy S. Black on 6/17/2014. (mr1)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 02, 2014
27 27 Lay Witness List by Defendant Blue Ash, City of. (Pacheco, Bryan) Modified docket text on 6/4/2014 (eh1).
Related: [-]
Friday, May 30, 2014
26 26 Witness List by Plaintiffs Ingrid Anderson, Housing Opportunities Made Equal, Inc.. (Farro, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2014
25 25 NOTICE by Defendant Blue Ash, City of re13 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Supplemental Authority (Pacheco, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Witschger v. E.I. Dupont De Nemours and Company
Wednesday, April 30, 2014
24 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Blue Ash, City of. (VanderLaan, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2014
23 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Ingrid Anderson, Housing Opportunities Made Equal, Inc.. (Burke, Timothy)
Related: [-]
22 22 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Doc.2 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 4/16/2014. (mr1)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2014
21 21 CALENDAR ORDER: Disclosure of lay witnesses: 6/1/2014. Motions directed to the pleadings: 7/1/2014. Disclosure of primary expert witnesses: 7/1/2014. Motions to amend the pleadings and add additional parties: 8/1/2014. Status conference by telephone: 8/15/2014 at 11:00 a.m. Disclosure of rebuttal expert witnesses: 9/1/2014. Discovery deadline: 11/2/2014. Dispositive motion deadline: 12/1/2014.Status conference by telephone: 1/2/2015 at 10:00 a.m. Final pretrial conference in Cincinnati Chambers, room 815: 3/30/2015 at 10:00 a.m. Jury Trial in Cincinnati: 4/6/2015 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 4/14/2014. (mr1)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry: This civil action came before the Court for a preliminary pretrial conference on 4/14/14 at 12:30 p.m. Attorneys Timothy Burke, Kathleen Farro, Mark VanderLaan, and Bryan Pacheco participated. A calendar order will issue by separate entry. (mr1)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2014
20 20 RULE 26(f) REPORT of Parties by Defendant Blue Ash, City of. (Pacheco, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2014
19 19 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re15 MOTION to Strike10 Reply to Response to Motion, (Portions of Plaintiff's Reply) ,2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Blue Ash, City of. (Pacheco, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, April 02, 2014
18 18 AFFIDAVIT of Alicia Bond-Lewis, Esq. by Defendant Blue Ash, City of. (VanderLaan, Mark)
Related: [-]
17 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re15 MOTION to Strike10 Reply to Response to Motion, (Portions of Plaintiff's Reply) filed by Defendant Blue Ash, City of. (VanderLaan, Mark)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry and NOTATION ORDER: This civil action came before the Court for a hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc.2 ) on 4/2/14 at 1:00 p.m. Attorneys Timothy Burke and Kathleen Farro appeared for Plaintiffs, along with Plaintiff Ingrid Anderson and representatives of Plaintiff HOME. Attorneys Mark VanderLaan and Bryan Pacheco appeared on behalf of Defendant, along with Defendant's Community Development Director, Daniel Johnson. Arguments were presented to the Court. Defendant's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Reply to Blue Ashs Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc.15 ) is hereby DENIED, but the Court sua sponte GRANTS Defendant the opportunity to file a sur-reply on or before 4/4/14. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Court Reporter Jodie Perkins (Official).) (mr1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2014
16 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION to Strike10 Reply to Response to Motion, (Portions of Plaintiff's Reply) filed by Plaintiffs Ingrid Anderson, Housing Opportunities Made Equal, Inc.. (Farro, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
15 15 MOTION to Strike10 Reply to Response to Motion, (Portions of Plaintiff's Reply) by Defendant Blue Ash, City of. (VanderLaan, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2014
NOTICE of Hearing: The oral argument on the TRO/PI set for 4/2/2014 at 1:00 p.m. HAS A LOCATION CHANGE to Cincinnati Courtroom 1 (Room 805) before Judge Timothy S. Black. (mr1)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2014
14 14 AFFIDAVIT of Kathleen Farro (Second) by Plaintiffs Ingrid Anderson, Housing Opportunities Made Equal, Inc.. (Farro, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2014
NOTICE of Hearing: The Status Conference set for 3/27/2014 HAS A TIME CHANGE to 11:30 a.m. before Judge Timothy S. Black. COUNSEL SHALL CALL 1-888-684-8852; Access code: 8411435; Security code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. (mr1)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry: This civil action came on before the Court for a status conference by telephone on 3/27/14 at 11:30 a.m. Attorneys Kathleen Farro, Timothy Burke, Bryan Pacheco, and Mark VanderLaan participated. The Court anticipates that each side will present an oral argument of 30 minutes or less at the 4/2/14 hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (mr1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2014
13 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Blue Ash, City of. Responses due by 4/21/2014 (VanderLaan, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from Ingrid Anderson Deposition,
Att: 2 Second Affidavit of Bryan E. Pacheco
12 12 DEPOSITION of Daniel Johnson taken on 03/18/2014 by Plaintiffs Ingrid Anderson, Housing Opportunities Made Equal, Inc.. (Farro, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
11 11 DEPOSITION of Ingrid Anderson taken on 3/10/2014 by Defendant Blue Ash, City of. (VanderLaan, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Part 2 of Anderson Deposition,
Att: 2 Part 3 of Anderson Deposition,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 Part 1 to Anderson Deposition,
Att: 4 Exhibit 1 Part 2 to Anderson Deposition,
Att: 5 Exhibit 1 Part 3 to Anderson Deposition,
Att: 6 Exhibit 2-5 to Anderson Deposition
Monday, March 24, 2014
10 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiffs Ingrid Anderson, Housing Opportunities Made Equal, Inc.. (Farro, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Summary,
Att: 2 Affidavit Ingrid Anderson,
Att: 3 Affidavit Kathleen Farro,
Att: 4 Exhibit 1 through 10,
Att: 5 Exhibit 11 through 20,
Att: 6 Exhibit 21 through 30,
Att: 7 Exhibit 31 though 40,
Att: 8 Exhibit 41 through 50,
Att: 9 Exhibit 51 through 60
Friday, March 21, 2014
9 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 3/24/2014. by Plaintiffs Ingrid Anderson, Housing Opportunities Made Equal, Inc.. (Farro, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
NOTATION ORDER: This civil action is before the Court on Plaintiffs' Motion for an Extension of Time to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc.9 ). As it is unopposed and for good cause shown, this motion is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file their reply memorandum on or before 3/24/14. IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Timothy S. Black on 3/21/2014. (mr1)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2014
8 8 AFFIDAVIT re7 Response in Opposition to Motion (In Support of) by Defendant Blue Ash, City of. (VanderLaan, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-K,
Att: 2 Exhibit L,
Att: 3 Exhibit M-T,
Att: 4 Exhibit U - Part 1,
Att: 5 Exhibit U - Part 2,
Att: 6 Exhibit U - Part 3,
Att: 7 Exhibit U - Part 4,
Att: 8 Exhibit U - Part 5,
Att: 9 Exhibit U - Part 6,
Att: 10 Exhibit V - AA
Friday, March 14, 2014
7 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Defendant Blue Ash, City of. (VanderLaan, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Summary of Argument and Table of Contents
6 6 ANSWER to1 Complaint filed by Blue Ash, City of. (VanderLaan, Mark)
Related: [-]
NOTICE of Hearing: A Preliminary Pretrial Conference is set before Judge Timothy S. Black for 4/14/2014 at 12:30 p.m. Counsel shall call 1-888-684-8852; Access code: 8411435; Security code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. Before the pretrial conference counsel must comply with the MANDATORY, pre-preliminary pretrial conference between counsel, required by Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f). THE REPORT MUST BE FILED 7 DAYS PRIOR TO THE PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial procedures and forms can be found at our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov. (mr1)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2014
Minute Entry and NOTICE of Telephone Conference: This civil action came on before the Court for a status conference by telephone on 3/10/14 at 12:30 p.m. Attorneys Kathleen Farro, Timothy Burke, Bryan Pacheco, and Mark VanderLaan participated. A status conference by telephone is set for 3/27/14 at 11:45 a.m. (Counsel please note the time change) before Judge Timothy S. Black. COUNSEL SHALL CALL 1-888-684-8852; Access code: 8411435; Security code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. (mr1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2014
NOTICE of Hearing: The Status Conference by telephone set for 3/6/2014 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 3/10/2014 at 12:30 p.m. before Judge Timothy S. Black. COUNSEL SHALL CALL 1-888-684-8852; Access code: 8411435; Security code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. (mr1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2014
Minute Entry and NOTICE of Telephone Conference: This civil action came on before the Court for a status conference by telephone on 2/26/14 at 9:00 a.m. Attorneys Kathleen Farro, Timothy Burke, Bryan Pacheco, and Mark VanderLaan participated. The parties indicated they will continue to pursue settlement. A status conference by telephone is set for 3/6/14 at 1:00 p.m. before Judge Timothy S. Black. COUNSEL SHALL CALL 1-888-684-8852; Access code: 8411435; Security code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. (mr1)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2014
Minute Entry, NOTATION ORDER, and NOTICE of Telephone Conference: Pursuant to S.D. Civ. R. 65.1, this civil action came on before the Court for an informal preliminary telephone conference on 2/21/14 at 1:00 p.m. regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc.2 ). Attorneys Kathleen Farro, Timothy Burke, Bryan Pacheco, and Mark VanderLaan participated. Defendant shall file its memorandum contra Plaintiffs' motion on or before 3/14/14. Plaintiffs shall file their reply memorandum in support of their motion on or before 3/21/14. This civil action is set for oral argument on the TRO/PI on 4/2/14 at 1:00 p.m. in Cincinnati Courtroom #3, Room 836. The parties shall confer in person on 2/25/14 at 1:30 p.m. regarding the possibility of settlement. A status conference by telephone is set for 2/26/14 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Timothy S. Black. COUNSEL SHALL CALL 1-888-684-8852; Access code: 8411435; Security code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. IT IS SO ORDERED.(Court Reporter Jodie Perkins (Official).) (mr1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2014
5 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Alan VanderLaan for Defendant Blue Ash, City of (VanderLaan, Mark)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan E Pacheco for Defendant Blue Ash, City of (Pacheco, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2014
3 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Burke, Kathleen Farro for Plaintiffs Ingrid Anderson and , Housing Opportunities Made Equal, Inc. (lk) Modified to correct parties on 2/18/2014 (sct1).
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs Ingrid Anderson, Housing Opportunities Made Equal, Inc. (lk) Modified to correct parties on 2/18/2014 (sct1).
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Blue Ash, City of filed by Ingrid Anderson, Housing Opportunities Made Equal, Inc. (lk) Modified to correct parties on 2/18/2014 (sct1).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Filing Fee Receipt
Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 100CIN021288 (lk)
Related: [-]
***If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (lk)
Related: [-]
Notice of Hearing: Pursuant to S.D. Ohio Civ. R. 65.1, this civil action is set for an informal preliminary telephone conference on Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc.2 ) on 2/21/14 at 10:30 a.m. Counsel shall call: 1-888-684-8852; Access Code: 8411435; Security code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. It is the responsibility of Plaintiffs' counsel to ensure that defense counsel is aware of the time, date, and call-in information for the conference. (mr1)
Related: [-]
NOTICE: Pursuant to S.D. Ohio Civ. R. 65.1, this civil action is set for an informal preliminary telephone conference on Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc.2 ) on 2/21/14 HAS A TIME CHANGE to 1:00 p.m. Counsel shall call: 1-888-684-8852; Access Code: 8411435; Security code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. It is the responsibility of Plaintiffs' counsel to ensure that defense counsel is aware of the time, date, and call-in information for the conference. (mr1)
Related: [-]