Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Leonie M Brinkema
Referred: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Case #: 1:19-cv-00432
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2019
Terminated:Nov 06, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 08, 2019 5:04 AM EDT
Defendant
Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By
Blaire Hawkins O'Brien
Office Of The Attorney General (richmond)
contact info
Marshall Howard Ross
Office Of The Attorney General (richmond)
contact info
Plaintiff
Wesley Moyer
Represented By
Jonathon Alden Moseley
Jonathon Moseley Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeremiah J. May
Represented By
Jonathon Alden Moseley
Jonathon Moseley Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Russell Manning
Represented By
Jonathon Alden Moseley
Jonathon Moseley Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Jim Irre
Represented By
Jonathon Alden Moseley
Jonathon Moseley Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Patrick J. Hughes
Represented By
Jonathon Alden Moseley
Jonathon Moseley Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Pat Hughes
Represented By
Jonathon Alden Moseley
Jonathon Moseley Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Brandon Howard
Represented By
Jonathon Alden Moseley
Jonathon Moseley Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Jason Glass
Represented By
Jonathon Alden Moseley
Jonathon Moseley Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Mike Emshwiller
Represented By
Jonathon Alden Moseley
Jonathon Moseley Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Gwen Anne D'Amico
Represented By
Jonathon Alden Moseley
Jonathon Moseley Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
John Crump
Represented By
Jonathon Alden Moseley
Jonathon Moseley Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Jim Corrin
Represented By
Jonathon Alden Moseley
Jonathon Moseley Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Derek Campbell
Represented By
Jonathon Alden Moseley
Jonathon Moseley Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
William K. Brown
Represented By
Jonathon Alden Moseley
Jonathon Moseley Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrew James Austin
Represented By
Jonathon Alden Moseley
Jonathon Moseley Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Mr. Jon E Wolff
Represented By
Jonathon Alden Moseley
Jonathon Moseley Attorney At Law
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Fredericksburg City Police Department
Terminated: 04/29/2019
Defendant
Commonwealth Atty of Fredericksburg
Terminated: 04/29/2019


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, November 06, 2019
40 40 order Judgment - Clerk Wed 11/06 11:27 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: Judgment in favor of defendant Commonwealth of Virginia. (yguy)
Related: [-]
39 39 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Wed 11/06 11:13 AM
ORDER: For the reasons stated in open court, defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [Dkt. No. 29] is GRANTED, and it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs' Amended Complaint [Dkt. No. 6] be and is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE because the Court does not have jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/6/19. (yguy)
Related: [-]
38 38 minutes Motion Hearing Wed 11/06 11:11 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema:Motion Hearing held on 11/6/2019. Appearances of counsel. Deft's29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is argued and GRANTED. (order to follow) (Court Reporter A. Thomson.)(yguy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2019
37 37 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Order on Motion to Continue Tue 11/05 3:52 PM
Ordered Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time in Which to File the Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. No. 34] is GRANTED and Plaintiff's Motion to Reschedule Hearing Upon Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Under rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) [Dkt. No. 35] is DENIED as moot; that the hearing will go forward as scheduled on November 6, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/05/2019. (choy, ) Modified on 11/5/2019 (choy, )
Related: [-]
36 36 respm Response in Support of Motion Tue 11/05 11:13 AM
RESPONSE in Support re29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Commonwealth of Virginia. (O'Brien, Blaire)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2019
35 35 motion Continue Mon 11/04 8:14 PM
MOTION to Continue hearing from November 6 on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss requested by Andrew James Austin, William K. Brown, Derek Campbell, Jim Corrin, John Crump, Gwen Anne D'Amico, Mike Emshwiller, Jason Glass, Brandon Howard, Pat Hughes, Patrick J. Hughes, Jim Irre, Russell Manning, Jeremiah J. May, Wesley Moyer, Jon E Wolff. (Moseley, Jonathon)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 11/04 8:12 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,30 Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss requested by Andrew James Austin, William K. Brown, Derek Campbell, Jim Corrin, John Crump, Gwen Anne D'Amico, Mike Emshwiller, Jason Glass, Brandon Howard, Pat Hughes, Patrick J. Hughes, Jim Irre, Russell Manning, Jeremiah J. May, Wesley Moyer, Jon E Wolff. (Moseley, Jonathon)
Related: [-]
33 33 20 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition Mon 11/04 12:01 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Andrew James Austin, William K. Brown, Derek Campbell, Jim Corrin, John Crump, Gwen Anne D'Amico, Mike Emshwiller, Jason Glass, Brandon Howard, Pat Hughes, Patrick J. Hughes, Jim Irre, Russell Manning, Jeremiah J. May, Wesley Moyer, Jon E Wolff.(Moseley, Jonathon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Fourth Circuit Case Jemsek v. Rhyne
32 32 respoth Opposition Mon 11/04 9:19 AM
Opposition to29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ,30 Memorandum in Support filed by Andrew James Austin, William K. Brown, Derek Campbell, Jim Corrin, John Crump, Gwen Anne D'Amico, Mike Emshwiller, Jason Glass, Brandon Howard, Pat Hughes, Patrick J. Hughes, Jim Irre, Russell Manning, Jeremiah J. May, Wesley Moyer, Jon E Wolff. (Moseley, Jonathon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2019
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 10/17 8:32 AM
Set Deadlines as to29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2019
31 31 misc Notice of Hearing Date Wed 10/16 4:48 PM
Notice of Hearing Date re29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (O'Brien, Blaire)
Related: [-]
30 30 7 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Wed 10/16 4:17 PM
Memorandum in Support re29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Commonwealth of Virginia. (O'Brien, Blaire)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Wed 10/16 4:16 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Commonwealth of Virginia.(O'Brien, Blaire)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 15, 2019
28 28 2 pgs order Order Tue 10/15 1:31 PM
ORDERED that the default entered on October 7, 2019 [Dkt. No. 23] be and is VACATED; that the hearing on defendant's motions scheduled for October 18, 2019 is CANCELLED; that defendant promptly file its Motion to Dismiss and notice it for Hearing on Wednesday, November 6, 2019 at 10:00 a.m.. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/15/2019. (choy, )
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 10/15 9:23 AM
Set Deadlines as to25 MOTION to Set Aside Default . Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (clar, )
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Tue 10/15 9:24 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Buchanan.25 MOTION to Set Aside Default (clar, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2019
27 27 misc Notice of Hearing Date Fri 10/11 3:50 PM
Notice of Hearing Date re26 Memorandum in Support,25 MOTION to Set Aside Default (O'Brien, Blaire)
Related: [-]
26 26 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Fri 10/11 3:49 PM
Memorandum in Support re25 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Commonwealth of Virginia. (O'Brien, Blaire)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Set Aside Default Fri 10/11 3:49 PM
MOTION to Set Aside Default by Commonwealth of Virginia.(O'Brien, Blaire)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, October 07, 2019
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/07 5:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Blaire Hawkins O'Brien on behalf of Commonwealth of Virginia (O'Brien, Blaire)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Clerks Entry of Default Mon 10/07 4:27 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Commonwealth of Virginia (choy, )
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 10/07 9:00 AM
Set Deadlines as to20 MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleading Out of Time . Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2019
22 22 misc Notice of Hearing Date Fri 10/04 6:06 PM
Notice of Hearing Date re20 MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleading Out of Time ,21 Memorandum in Support (Ross, Marshall)
Related: [-]
21 21 5 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Fri 10/04 6:04 PM
Memorandum in Support re20 MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleading Out of Time filed by Commonwealth of Virginia. (Ross, Marshall)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Leave to File Document Fri 10/04 6:02 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleading Out of Time by Commonwealth of Virginia.(Ross, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Exhibit Memorandum in Support Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting Leave to File
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/04 4:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marshall Howard Ross on behalf of Commonwealth of Virginia (Ross, Marshall)
Related: [-]
18 18 respoth Response Other Fri 10/04 4:25 PM
Response to15 Order, to Show Cause as to inactivity filed by Andrew James Austin, William K. Brown, Derek Campbell, Jim Corrin, John Crump, Gwen Anne D'Amico, Mike Emshwiller, Jason Glass, Brandon Howard, Pat Hughes, Patrick J. Hughes, Jim Irre, Russell Manning, Jeremiah J. May, Wesley Moyer, Jon E Wolff. (Moseley, Jonathon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2019
17 17 motion Entry of Default Thu 10/03 8:01 PM
Request for Entry of Default as to Defendant Commonwealth of Virginia by Andrew James Austin, William K. Brown, Derek Campbell, Jim Corrin, John Crump, Gwen Anne D'Amico, Mike Emshwiller, Jason Glass, Brandon Howard, Pat Hughes, Patrick J. Hughes, Jim Irre, Russell Manning, Jeremiah J. May, Wesley Moyer, Jon E Wolff.(Moseley, Jonathon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Attorney,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
16 16 service Affidavit of Service Thu 10/03 5:22 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Amended Complaint -- additional service by process server -- served on Attorney General Mark Herring on August 20, 2019, filed by Andrew James Austin, William K. Brown, Derek Campbell, Jim Corrin, John Crump, Gwen Anne D'Amico, Mike Emshwiller, Jason Glass, Brandon Howard, Pat Hughes, Patrick J. Hughes, Jim Irre, Russell Manning, Jeremiah J. May, Wesley Moyer, Jon E Wolff.(Moseley, Jonathon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Private Process Server
Friday, September 27, 2019
15 15 1 pgs order Order Fri 09/27 12:05 PM
ORDERED that plaintiffs show cause within seven (7) days why the Commonwealth of Virginia should not be dismissed from this civil action, as it appears plaintiffs are no longer interested in prosecuting their claims against the Commonwealth of Virginia. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 09/27/2019. (choy, )(Copies mailed to Virginia General on 09/27/2019)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2019
14 14 2 pgs order Order Thu 08/29 11:08 AM
ORDERED that plaintiffs immediately obtain an entry of default from the Clerk pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a), and it is further ORDERED that promptly after obtaining the entry of default, plaintiffs file a motion fordefault judgment (See Order for Details). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/28/2019. (lcre, )(c/s per ORDER)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2019
13 13 service Affidavit of Service Tue 07/30 11:51 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Amended Complaint to Commonwealth of Virginia served on Attorney General Mark Herring on June 24, 2019, filed by Andrew James Austin, William K. Brown, Derek Campbell, Jim Corrin, John Crump, Gwen Anne D'Amico, Mike Emshwiller, Jason Glass, Brandon Howard, Pat Hughes, Patrick J. Hughes, Jim Irre, Russell Manning, Jeremiah J. May, Wesley Moyer, Jon E Wolff. (Moseley, Jonathon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2019
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 06/20 3:00 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT -- SUPPLEMENT REQUESTING ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS against All Defendants, filed by Wesley Moyer, Jason Glass, Derek Campbell, Jon E Wolff, Andrew James Austin, Jeremiah J. May, Brandon Howard, John Crump, Jim Irre, Gwen Anne D'Amico, Pat Hughes, William K. Brown, Patrick J. Hughes, Mike Emshwiller, Jim Corrin, Russell Manning.(Moseley, Jonathon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Requests for Summons for Service of Defendant,
Att: 2 Supplement Requests for Summons for Service of Defendant
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/20 2:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathon Alden Moseley on behalf of Andrew James Austin, William K. Brown, Derek Campbell, Jim Corrin, John Crump, Gwen Anne D'Amico, Mike Emshwiller, Jason Glass, Brandon Howard, Pat Hughes, Patrick J. Hughes, Jim Irre, Russell Manning, Jeremiah J. May, Wesley Moyer, Jon E Wolff(Moseley, Jonathon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Certificate of Service
Wednesday, June 19, 2019
10 10 service Summons Issued Wed 06/19 9:26 AM
Summons Issued as to Commonwealth of Virginia. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint.(choy, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice to Attorney
Tuesday, June 18, 2019
misc Notice of Correction Tue 06/18 11:03 AM
Notice of Correction re8 Amended Complaint; Certificate of Service Not Included. (choy, )
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Correction Tue 06/18 11:06 AM
Notice of Correction re9 Financial Disclosure Statement; Certificate of Service Not Included. (choy, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2019
9 9 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Mon 06/17 2:43 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Andrew James Austin, William K. Brown, Derek Campbell, Jim Corrin, John Crump, Gwen Anne D'Amico, Mike Emshwiller, Jason Glass, Brandon Howard, Pat Hughes, Patrick J. Hughes, Jim Irre, Russell Manning, Jeremiah J. May, Wesley Moyer, Jon E Wolff. (Moseley, Jonathon)
Related: [-]
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 06/17 2:28 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT SUPPLEMENT -- REQUESTING ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS -- against All Defendants, filed by Wesley Moyer, Jason Glass, Derek Campbell, Jon E Wolff, Andrew James Austin, Jeremiah J. May, Brandon Howard, John Crump, Jim Irre, Gwen Anne D'Amico, Pat Hughes, William K. Brown, Patrick J. Hughes, Mike Emshwiller, Jim Corrin, Russell Manning.(Moseley, Jonathon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Requests for Summons for Service of Defendant,
Att: 2 Supplement Requests for Summons for Service of Defendant
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/17 2:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathon Alden Moseley on behalf of Andrew James Austin, William K. Brown, Derek Campbell, Jim Corrin, John Crump, Gwen Anne D'Amico, Mike Emshwiller, Jason Glass, Brandon Howard, Pat Hughes, Patrick J. Hughes, Jim Irre, Russell Manning, Jeremiah J. May, Wesley Moyer, Jon E Wolff (Moseley, Jonathon)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2019
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 05/13 10:47 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT joining additional plaintiffs only against Commonwealth, filed by Jon E Wolff.(Moseley, Jonathon)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2019
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Mon 04/29 10:52 AM
ORDER granting3 Motion to Amend/Correct. It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff file an Amended Complaint by Monday, May 13, 2019. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 4/29/2019. (dest, )
Related: [-]
4 4 order So Ordered Mon 04/29 10:49 AM
So Ordered re2 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of ONLY 2 of 3 Defendants . filed by Jon E Wolff. ORDERED that the Complaint be and is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to defendants Fredericksburg City Police Department and the Commonwealth Attorney of Fredericksburg. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 4/29/2019. (dest, )
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Amend/Correct Mon 04/29 12:16 AM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint, prior to service of the Complaint upon any Defendant, to Add Additional Plaintiffs by Jon E Wolff. (Moseley, Jonathon)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 04/29 12:10 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of ONLY 2 of 3 Defendants, the Cause Continuing Against the Commonwealth of Virginia by Jon E Wolff (Moseley, Jonathon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/11 4:22 PM
Complaint for Declaratory Judgment as to consitutionality of Va. Code 18.2-282 and 18.2-57 when applied to firearms ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6587563.), filed by Jon E Wolff.(Moseley, Jonathon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Fri 04/12 9:26 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (dest, )
Related: [-]