Quest Nettech Corporation v. Apple, Inc.
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney Gilstrap |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-00118 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 15:1126 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 08, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 09, 2019 3:26 AM CDT |
Defendant
Apple, Inc.
2601 Preston Road
Frisco, TX 75034 |
Represented By
|
Mediator
Jay Gandhi
|
|
Plaintiff
Quest Nettech Corporation
100 West Houston Street
Marshall, TX 75670 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, May 08, 2020 | ||
91 | 91
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Fri 05/08 8:57 AM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nkl, ) |
|
90 | 90
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 05/08 8:56 AM
ORDER granting89 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/7/2020. (nkl, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 06, 2020 | ||
89 | 89
4
pgs
motion
Dismiss
Wed 05/06 9:13 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Plaintiff's Complaint by Quest Nettech Corporation.(Fabricant, Alfred) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 01, 2020 | ||
88 | 88
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 05/01 4:07 PM
ORDER granting87 Motion to Further Extend Stay of All Deadlines. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/1/2020. (nkl, ) |