Nevada District Court
Judge:Richard F Boulware, II
Referred: Maximiliano D Couvillier
Case #: 2:19-cv-00638
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 09, 2019 2:08 AM PDT
Defendant
CCAC
Represented By
Nicholas Crosby
Marquis & Aurbach
contact info
Jacqueline Victoria Nichols
Marquis Aurbach & Coffing
contact info
Defendant
LVMPD
Represented By
Nicholas Crosby
Marquis & Aurbach
contact info
Jacqueline Victoria Nichols
Marquis Aurbach & Coffing
contact info
Defendant
MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc.
Represented By
Robert A. Ryan
Pisanelli Bice, PLLC
contact info
Todd L. Bice
Pisanelli Bice PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Showcase Mall Vegas Management, LLC
Represented By
James P Silvestri
Pyatt Silvestri
contact info
Plaintiff
Gerald R Lechner
1355 Clagett Lane
Las Vegas, NV 89110


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
255 255 minutes Jury Trial Tue 05/06 4:08 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Jury Trial Day 2 held on 5/6/2025 before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Crtrm Administrator: Darci Smith ; Pla Counsel: Gerald Lechner, pro se, joined by assistants Alan Gutierrez and Nina Gutierrez ; Def Counsel: Nicholas Crosby, Tabetha Steinberg and Jamie Frost, joined by defendants, Jonathan Riddle, Clint Owensby, Christopher OConnell, Andre McFarland, Dillon Wedewer and Christopher Kopf. ; Court Reporter: Patricia Ganci and Amber McClane ; Time of Hearing: 8:22 - 3:50 ; Courtroom: 7C Jury trial continues with above counsel and parties in attendance; Witnesses Gerald Lechner and Officer Christopher O'Connell; Evidence entered. See minutes for additional detail, deadlines and instructions from the Court. Jury Trial shall continue on 5/7/2025 at 07:50 AM for counsel and 8:15 a.m. for the Jurors in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware II. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
253 253 minutes Jury Trial Mon 05/05 4:48 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Jury Trial Day 1 held on 5/5/2025 before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Crtrm Administrator: Darci Smith ; Pla Counsel: Gerald Lechner, pro se ; Def Counsel: Nicholas Crosby and Tabetha Steinberg, joined by Defendants, Jonathan Riddle, Clint Owensby, Christopher OConnell, Andre McFarland, Dillon Wedewer and Christopher Kopf ; Court Reporter: Patricia Ganci ; Time of Hearing: 8:47 - 4:17 ; Courtroom: 7C Counsel and parties present as listed above. Jury selection commenced to a jury panel of 9. Witness: Gerald Lechner. Evidence entered. Jury Trial set to continue on 5/6/2025 at 07:50 AM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware II. Jury to return at 8:00 a.m.for an 8:15 start time. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
Related: [-]
251 251 trial Proposed Jury Instructions Mon 05/05 3:58 PM
PROPOSED Jury Instructions by Defendants Las Vegas Metro Police Department, Christopher R. O'Connell, Clint W. Owensby, Jonathan M. Riddle, Christopher J. Kopf, Dillon A. Wedewer, Andre A. McFarland Amended Jury Instruction Regarding Unreasonable Seizure of Property . (Crosby, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
250 250 trial Proposed Verdict Form Fri 05/02 1:54 PM
PROPOSED Verdict Form by Defendants Las Vegas Metro Police Department, Christopher R. O'Connell, Clint W. Owensby, Jonathan M. Riddle, Christopher J. Kopf, Dillon A. Wedewer, Andre A. McFarland Proposed Special Verdict Form . (Crosby, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
249 249 motion Stipulation Thu 05/01 3:16 PM
STIPULATION and proposed Order on Exhibits that are Deemed Authenticated for Purposes of Trial by Defendants Las Vegas Metro Police Department, Christopher R. O'Connell, Clint W. Owensby, Jonathan M. Riddle, Christopher J. Kopf, Dillon A. Wedewer, Andre A. McFarland. (Steinberg, Tabetha) (other) (presiding)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
248 248 trial Exhibit List Thu 05/01 8:18 AM
EXHIBIT LIST First Amended by Plaintiff Gerald R Lechner.. (AMMi)
Related: [-]