Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-00578
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2019
Terminated:Oct 10, 2019
Case in other court:South Carolina, 3:19-cv-00699
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2019 5:56 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Represented By
CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR.
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
GORDON D JORDAN, III
Represented By
MARIO A PACELLA
Strom Law Firm - Columbia Sc
contact info
JOSEPH PRESTON STROM, JR
Strom Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, October 10, 2019
12 12 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 10/10 3:44 PM
CLERK'S DISMISSAL re10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice (djb)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/10 11:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR on behalf of 3M COMPANY (BEALL, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2019
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 10/09 1:35 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GORDON D JORDAN, III (PACELLA, MARIO)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2019
9 9 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Mon 04/15 9:22 AM
Case transferred in from District of South Carolina; Case Number 3:19-cv-00699. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
8 8 transfer Case Transferred Out - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Mon 04/15 9:55 AM
Case transferred to Northern District of Florida per certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order Number 1. The Transferring Clerk's Office hereby attests the record and the docket sheet available through CM/ECF to be the certified list. (asni, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2019
5 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gordon D Jordan, III. 3M Company served on 3/12/2019, answer due 4/2/2019.(Strom, Joseph) [Transferred from South Carolina on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Receipt for Certified Mail
Friday, March 08, 2019
3 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Gordon D Jordan, III.(asni, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
2 2 Summons Issued as to 3M Company. (asni, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8312864.), filed by Gordon D Jordan, III. Service due by 6/6/2019(asni, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]