Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-00625
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2019
Case in other court:North Carolina Eastern, 5:19-cv-00096
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2019 4:53 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Represented By
TIMOTHY P LENDINO
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
MATTHEW S. DEANTONIO
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR.
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
JUNE A JACKSON WYATT
a natural Person c/o Law Offices of James Scott Farrin 280 S. Mangum Street Suite 400
Durham, NC 27701
Represented By
HOYT G. TESSENER
Law Offices Of James Scott Farrin
contact info
GARY W JACKSON
Law Offices Of James Scott Farrin - Durham Nc
contact info
CHRISTOPHER R BAGLEY
Law Offices Of James Scott Farrin - Durham Nc
contact info

GPO Mar 19 2019
ORDER granting 9 Motion to Stay. This matter shall be stayed until a final determination by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation regarding whether this action, and numerous other related actions, should be consolidated pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 3/19/2019. (Sellers, N.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/15/2019.]

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, October 28, 2019
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 10/28 8:47 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JUNE A JACKSON WYATT (BAGLEY, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2019
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/10 12:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR on behalf of 3M COMPANY (BEALL, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2019
16 16 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Mon 04/15 4:02 PM
Case electronically transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 5:19-cv-00096. Original file with documents numbered 1-15 received. Modified on 4/15/2019 (djb).
Related: [-]
15 15 6 pgs order Order Mon 04/15 12:51 PM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - This case is transferred under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 to the Northern District of Florida for the reasons stated in the order of April 3, 2019 and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable M. Casey Rodgers. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Stay lifted on 4/15/2019.) (Sellers, N.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2019
14 14 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by June A Jackson Wyatt served on 3M Company on March 25, 2019. (Bagley, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Delivery Notification
Tuesday, March 19, 2019
13 13 ORDER granting9 Motion to Stay. This matter shall be stayed until a final determination by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation regarding whether this action, and numerous other related actions, should be consolidated pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 3/19/2019. (Sellers, N.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2019
12 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher R. Bagley on behalf of June A Jackson Wyatt. (Bagley, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding9 Consent MOTION to Stay. (Sellers, N.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2019
11 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew S. DeAntonio on behalf of 3M Company. (DeAntonio, Matthew) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
10 10 9 pgs Memorandum in Support regarding9 Consent MOTION to Stay filed by 3M Company. (Lendino, Timothy) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Schedule of Related Actions
9 9 Consent MOTION to Stay filed by 3M Company. (Lendino, Timothy) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
8 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by 3M Company (Lendino, Timothy) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
7 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Timothy Patrick Lendino on behalf of 3M Company. (Lendino, Timothy) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
6 6 Summons Issued as to 3M Company. Counsel is reminded to print summons and effect service. (Sellers, N.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
NOTICE TO COUNSEL regarding:1 Complaint - All counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Sellers, N.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2019
5 5 Notice of Related Filing filed by June A Jackson Wyatt (Bagley, Christopher) Modified on 3/12/2019 - changed docket text to correctly identify document attached. (Sellers, N.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Interested Party Response in MDL No. 2885,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B - Motion to Transfer in MDL No. 2885
4 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Hoyt G. Tessener on behalf of June A Jackson Wyatt. (Tessener, Hoyt) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Gary W. Jackson on behalf of June A Jackson Wyatt. (Jackson, Gary) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
2 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by June A Jackson Wyatt (Bagley, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4863529.), filed by June A Jackson Wyatt. (Bagley, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/15/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons