County of Galveston v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45239 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Texas Southern, 4:18-cv-04708 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:29 PM EST |
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pharmaceutical Research Associates, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Knoll Pharmaceutical Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Insys Manufacturing LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Abbot Laboratories, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AbbVie Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
County Of Galveston
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/24/2019 5:00 PM EDT |
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 152nd Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2018-87388 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21468080) filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.. [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc. identifying Pharmaceutical Research Associates, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Monday, December 17, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Sim Lake recused. Case reassigned to Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr for all further proceedings. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
4 | 4 NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. Parties notified, filed. (aboyd, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Tuesday, December 18, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 MOTION to Remand by County of Galveston, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/8/2019.(Fibich, Kenneth) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 14 Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/8/2019. [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, December 19, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr recused. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal for all further proceedings(Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(olindor, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Thursday, December 20, 2018 | ||
8 | 8 NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. Parties notified, filed. (olindor, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
9 | 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Shelly A Sanford on behalf of County of Galveston, filed. (Sanford, Shelly) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
10 | 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., filed.(Sibiski, Hannah) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
11 | 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Insys Manufacturing LLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., filed.(Sarokhanian, Nicholas) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Monday, December 31, 2018 | ||
12 | 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., filed [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Wednesday, January 02, 2019 | ||
13 | 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., filed.(Ellis, John) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
14 | 14 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 1/28/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Judge's Procedures | ||
Tuesday, January 08, 2019 | ||
15 | 15 RESPONSE in Opposition to5 MOTION to Remand, filed by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.. [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 of Decl., | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 of Decl., | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 of Decl., | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 of Decl., | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 7 | ||
Thursday, January 10, 2019 | ||
16 | 16 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 3/25/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. (leddins, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Tuesday, January 22, 2019 | ||
17 | 17 ORDER entered: The court grants the motion to extend time. The deadline for these defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to: (1) 60 days after this case is transferred to the Federal MDL or, if the case is remanded, (2) 5 business days after a remand order is received by the state court. The case is stayed and administratively closed pending the MDL Panel decision. The plaintiff may move to reinstate to the active docket within 14 days after the MDL Panel rules.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
18 | 18 NOTICE of Decision by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., filed. [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Friday, March 22, 2019 | ||
19 | 19 NOTICE of Decision by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., filed. [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, April 03, 2019 | ||
Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | ||
20 | 20 JPML TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to Northern District of Ohio to be included in MDL Docket No. 2804. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Monday, April 15, 2019 | ||
21 | 21 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Southern. Case number 4:18-cv-04708. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. | |
22 | 22 Notice of Incomplete Diversity filed by County Of Galveston.(Sanford, Shelly) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit |