County of Hardin v. Endo Health Solutions, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45241 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Texas Southern, 4:19-cv-00114 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:29 PM EST |
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo International plc
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceuticals, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
County of Hardin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/24/2019 5:04 PM EDT |
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 152nd Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2019-00865 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21633888) filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc..(Sibiski, Hannah) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. identifying Endo International plc as Corporate Parent, filed.(Sibiski, Hannah) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to the Complaint by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/5/2019.(Sibiski, Hannah) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 MOTION to Remand by County of Hardin, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/8/2019.(Carter, Amy) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Continuation Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - County of Hardin Service, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - County of Newton Service, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Remand Orders, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Homestead exemption, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Warranty Deed, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Yarger homestead exemption, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G - Grayson county petition, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H - Nueces county petition, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I - El Paso county petition, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit J - Bellwether Orders, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit K - Order Regarding Remands, | ||
Att: 13 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 01, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 3/13/2019 at 08:45 AM before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
6 | 6 RESPONSE in Opposition to4 MOTION to Remand, filed by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Sibiski, Hannah) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 | ||
7 | 7 ORDER granting3 Defendants Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint. The deadline for the defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's Complaint is extend until: 60 days after this case is transferred to the Federal MDL or, if the case is remanded, (2) 5 business days after a remand order issues.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Tuesday, February 12, 2019 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER - Having considered plaintiff County of Hardins4 motion to remand and all responses, replies, exhibits, and arguments of counsel thereto, the Court hereby DENIES the plaintiffs motion and STAYS the case pending transfer to the Opiate Litigation MDL No. 2804, Doc. 3475....*** STAYED flag set. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
9 | 9 REPLY in Support of4 MOTION to Remand, filed by County of Hardin. (Greenstone, David) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
10 | 10 MOTION for Reconsideration of8 Order,, Set/Clear Flags, by County of Hardin, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/25/2019. (Greenstone, David) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
11 | 11 PROPOSED ORDER re:10 MOTION for Reconsideration of8 Order,, Set/Clear Flags,, filed.(Greenstone, David) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Thursday, March 07, 2019 | ||
12 | 12 ORDER for Expedited Response re:10 MOTION for Reconsideration of8 Order. Response to Motion due by 3/18/2019.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Monday, March 18, 2019 | ||
13 | 13 RESPONSE in Opposition to10 MOTION for Reconsideration of8 Order,, Set/Clear Flags,, filed by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Sibiski, Hannah) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 02, 2019 | ||
14 | 14 ORDER denying10 Motion for Reconsideration of Order DenyingRemand.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Wednesday, April 03, 2019 | ||
Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | ||
15 | 15 JPML TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to Northern District of Ohio to be included in MDL Docket No. 2804. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.] | |
Monday, April 15, 2019 | ||
16 | 16 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Southern. Case number 4:19-cv-00114. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |