Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Kathryn Kimball Mizelle
Referred: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Case #: 8:19-cv-00906
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2019
Terminated:Aug 23, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Oct 13, 2019 5:42 AM EDT
Defendant
Ernie Fontan
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Clint Miller
Pasco County Sheriff's Office 8700 Citizens Drive
NEw Port Richey, FL 33755
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Ed Beckman
Pasco County Sheriff's Office 8700 Citizens Drive
New Port Richey, FL 34654
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Benjamin Birge
Pasco County Sheriff's Office 8700 Citizens Drive
New Port Richey, FL 34654
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Dustin Brooks
Pasco County Sheriff's Office 8700 Citizens Drive
New Port Richey, FL 34654
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Robert Medina
Pasco County Sheriff's Office 8700 Citizens Drive
New Port Richey, FL 34654
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Clinton Cabbage
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
John Collier
Pasco County Sheriff's Office 8700 Citizens Drive
New Port Richey, FL 34654
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
William Davis
Pasco County Sheriff's Office 8700 Citizens Drive
New Port Richey, FL 34654
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Melbourne Eakley
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Michael Farrantelli
Pasco County Sheriff's Office 8700 Citizens Drive
New Port Richey, FL 34654
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Will Ferguson
Pasco County Sheriff's Office 8700 Citizens Drive
New Port Richey, FL 34654
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Steven Frick
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Jay Galassi
Pasco County Sheriff's Office 8700 Citizens Drive
New Port Richey, FL 34654
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
George McDonald
Pasco County Sheriff's Office 8700 Citizens Drive
New Port Richey, FL 34654
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Keith McCarthy
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Irizarry
Captain Pasco County Sheriff's Office 8700 Citizens Drive
New Port Richey, FL 34654
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Stacey Jenkins
Pasco County Sheriff's Office 8700 Citizens Drive
New Port Richey, FL 34654
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Warren Jones
Pasco County Sheriff's Office 8700 Citizens Drive
New Port Richey, FL 34654
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Christopher Joyal
Pasco County Sheriff's Office 8700 Citizens Drive
New Port Richey, FL 34654
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
James Mallo
Pasco County Sheriff's Office 8700 Citizens Drive
New Port Richey, FL 34654
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Kevin Macumber
Pasco County Sheriff's Office 8700 Citizens Drive
New Port Richey, FL 34654
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Robert Lowry
Pasco County Sheriff's Office 8700 Citizens Drive
New Port Richey, FL 34654
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Robert Tedeschi
Pasco County Sheriff's Office 8700 Citizens Drive
New Port Richey, FL 34654
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Michael Shoup
Pasco County Sheriff's Office 8700 Citizens Drive
New Port Richey, FL 34654
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Christopher Bennett
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
James Browning
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Jennifer Christensen
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Marc Erickson
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Sharon Foshey
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Kenneth Gregory
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Jeffery Harrington
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Melissa Hite
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Jennie Jones
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Richard Jones
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Larry Krause
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Christopher Nocco
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Jeffrey Peake
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Taffini Reed
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Timothy Roy
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Tait Sanborn
Pasco County Sheriff's Office 8700 Citizens Drive
New Port Richey, FL 34654
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Gary Raulerson
Pasco County Sheriff's Office 8700 Citizens Drive
New Port Richey, FL 34654
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
John Horning
McGuire Law Offices 1173 NE Cleveland Street
Clearwater, FL 33755
Represented By
John Francis McGuire
Mcguire Law Offices, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Edward Lape
McGuire Law Offices 1173 NE Cleveland Street
Clearwater, FL 33755
Represented By
John Francis McGuire
Mcguire Law Offices, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Anthony Pearn
McGuire Law Offices 1173 NE Cleveland Street
Clearwater, FL 33755
Represented By
John Francis McGuire
Mcguire Law Offices, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Aaron Ziegler
McGuire Law Offices 1173 NE Cleveland Street
Clearwater, FL 33755
Represented By
John Francis McGuire
Mcguire Law Offices, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
James Steffens
Represented By
John Francis McGuire
Mcguire Law Offices, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher Starnes
Represented By
John Francis McGuire
Mcguire Law Offices, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Bryan Sikes
McGuire Law Offices 1173 NE Cleveland Street
Clearwater, FL 33755
Represented By
John Francis McGuire
Mcguire Law Offices, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicholas Scrima
McGuire Law Offices 1173 NE Cleveland Street
Clearwater, FL 33755
Represented By
John Francis McGuire
Mcguire Law Offices, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher J. Squitieri
Represented By
John Francis McGuire
Mcguire Law Offices, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Royce Rodgers
McGuire Law Offices 1173 NE Cleveland Street
Clearwater, FL 33755
Represented By
John Francis McGuire
Mcguire Law Offices, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Cliff Baltzer
McGuire Law Offices 1173 NE Cleveland Street
Clearwater, FL 33755
Represented By
John Francis McGuire
Mcguire Law Offices, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Shane Metzler
McGuire Law Offices 1173 NE Cleveland Street
Clearwater, FL 33755
Represented By
John Francis McGuire
Mcguire Law Offices, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Bynum
McGuire Law Offices 1173 NE Cleveland Street
Clearwater, FL 33755
Represented By
John Francis McGuire
Mcguire Law Offices, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Sean Gibson
McGuire Law Offices 1173 NE Cleveland Street
Clearwater, FL 33755
Represented By
John Francis McGuire
Mcguire Law Offices, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Cheryl Hazelton
Represented By
John Francis McGuire
Mcguire Law Offices, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Dean Mariani
McGuire Law Offices 1173 NE Cleveland Street
Clearwater, FL 33755
Represented By
John Francis McGuire
Mcguire Law Offices, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Brandon Marchione
McGuire Law Offices 1173 NE Cleveland Street
Clearwater, FL 33755
Represented By
John Francis McGuire
Mcguire Law Offices, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles Keppel, Jr
McGuire Law Offices 1173 NE Cleveland Street
Clearwater, FL 33755
Represented By
John Francis McGuire
Mcguire Law Offices, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian Kozera
McGuire Law Offices 1173 NE Cleveland Street
Clearwater, FL 33755
Represented By
John Francis McGuire
Mcguire Law Offices, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Nikolaus Kriz
McGuire Law Offices 1173 NE Cleveland Street
Clearwater, FL 33755
Represented By
John Francis McGuire
Mcguire Law Offices, PA
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Richard Bain
Terminated: 07/30/2019
Pasco County Sheriff's Office 8700 Citizens Drive
New Port Richey, FL 34654
Defendant
Jack Armstrong
Terminated: 08/07/2019
Pasco County Sheriff's Office 8700 Citizens Drive
New Port Richey, FL 34654
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Defendant
Ray Revell
Terminated: 08/07/2019
Pasco County Sheriff's Office 6700 Citizens Drive
New Port Richey, FL 34654
Represented By
Lindsay Faroni Moore
Pasco County Sheriff'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
David J. Stefany
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
240 240 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Report and Recommendations Tue 12/06 5:02 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 227 Rule 7.01(c) Motion; adopting 237 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 12/6/2022. (MEV)
Related: [-]