O'Rourke v. Fada Restaurant Corp. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Dora Lizette Irizarry |
Referred: | Robert M Levy |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-02216 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:1201 Civil Rights (Disability) |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2019 |
Terminated: | Aug 16, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 13, 2019 5:45 AM EDT |
Defendant
Fada Restaurant Corp.
530 Driggs Avenue
Brooklyn, NY 11211 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
North Side Studios, LLC
543 Bedfors Avenue, PMD 299
Brooklyn, NY 11211 |
|
Plaintiff
Christopher O'Rourke
357 East 57th Street
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/19/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 16, 2019 | ||
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 08/16 11:34 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER OF DISMISSAL, endorsing9 . This case is now closed. So Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 8/16/2019. (Layne, Monique) |
||
Wednesday, August 14, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 08/14 2:37 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case with Prejudice by Christopher O'Rourke (Sverd, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2019 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Tue 08/06 12:57 PM
ORDER: A stipulation of dismissal shall be filed in 30 days. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 8/6/2019. (Marino, Janine) |
||
Friday, August 02, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Letter
Fri 08/02 4:14 PM
Letter Notifying Court of Settlement by Fada Restaurant Corp. (Lundy, Kathryn) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 07/10 4:14 PM
ORDER granting7 Fada Restaurant's Motion for Extension of Time to 8/1/19 to, Answer, as these parties are engaged in settlement discussions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 7/10/2019. (Levy, Robert) |
||
Monday, July 08, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 07/08 7:15 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Complaint by Fada Restaurant Corp.. (Lundy, Kathryn) |
|
Friday, June 14, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 06/14 2:47 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fada Restaurant Corp. answer due 7/11/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 6/14/2019. (Marino, Janine) |
||
Thursday, June 13, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 06/13 5:03 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Complaint by Fada Restaurant Corp.. (Lundy, Kathryn) |
|
Wednesday, June 12, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/12 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Lundy on behalf of Fada Restaurant Corp. (aty to be noticed) (Lundy, Kathryn) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/16 3:29 PM
Summons Issued as to Fada Restaurant Corp., North Side Studios, LLC. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 04/16 3:27 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 04/16 3:27 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 10:18 AM
COMPLAINT against Fada Restaurant Corp., North Side Studios, LLC Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Christopher O'Rourke. (Bowens, Priscilla) Modified on 4/16/2019 (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 04/16 10:21 AM
FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11388637 (Bowens, Priscilla) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/16 3:26 PM
Case Assigned to Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |