Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Algenon L Marbley
Referred: Kimberly A Jolson
Case #: 2:19-cv-01458
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2019
Terminated:Aug 18, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Oct 13, 2019 5:14 AM EDT
Defendant
Clair Betzko
Represented By
Paul-Michael La Fayette
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder Co., L.P.A.
contact info
Stacy Virginia Pollock
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder Co., L.P.A.
contact info
Defendant
William Jason Lawless
13832 State Route 104
Ashville, OH 43103
Represented By
Paul-Michael La Fayette
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder Co., L.P.A.
contact info
Stacy Virginia Pollock
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder Co., L.P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Christopher Mosley
Represented By
Paul-Michael La Fayette
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder Co., L.P.A.
contact info
Stacy Virginia Pollock
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder Co., L.P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Village of New Holland
Represented By
Paul-Michael La Fayette
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder Co., L.P.A.
contact info
Stacy Virginia Pollock
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder Co., L.P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Derek Myers
Represented By
Chanda L. Brown
Walton Brown, LLP
contact info
Sean L Walton, Jr.
Walton + Brown, Llp.
contact info

GPO Dec 30 2021
OPINION AND ORDER granting 22 Motion to Amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/30/2020. (ew)
GPO Apr 25 2022
OPINION AND ORDER superseding 77 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 54. GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 54 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Christopher Mosley, Village of New Holland, Clair Betzko, William Jason Lawless. Defendant Betzko and the Village are DISMISSED, as there are no remaining claims against them. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 4/25/2022. (cw)

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, October 03, 2022
84 84 2 pgs order Order Mon 10/03 4:47 PM
STIPULATION AND JUDGMENT ENTRY OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/3/2022. (cw)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
83 83 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 09/30 1:48 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Derek Myers. (Barwell, Jessica)
Related: [-]