Lee County, Virginia v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45251 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Virginia Western, 2:18-cv-00049 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:30 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
8741 Landmark Road
Richmond, VA 23228 |
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Optum, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OptumRX, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
50 West Broad St., Suite 1330
Columbus, OH 43215 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance, LLC
|
|
Defendant
CaremarkPCS, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories
|
|
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Barr Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Caremark, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Does 1-100
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Holding Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Henry Schein Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Impax Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insource, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Lee County, Virginia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2019 10:41 AM EDT |
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lee County Circuit Court, case number CL18-100216-00. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt number 0423-3032787), filed by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc.(ab) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - MDL Transfer Order | ||
2 | 2 Order Requesting Transmittal of Original Case File from Lee County Circuit Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 12/13/2018. (ab) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
3 | 3 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (ab) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
4 | 4 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
5 | 5 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumRx, Inc. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
6 | 6 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
7 | 7 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Express Scripts Holding Company for Express Scripts, Inc.. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
8 | 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Lee County, Virginia. (Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
9 | 9 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Holding Company (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Tuesday, December 18, 2018 | ||
11 | 11 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand by Lee County, Virginia. (Conrod, Richard) Modified on 1/9/2019 - removed referral text (ejs). [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Thursday, December 20, 2018 | ||
12 | 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to8 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
13 | 13 Brief / Memorandum in Support re12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to8 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
14 | 14 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re11 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand . filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
15 | 15 BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 12/20/2018. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
16 | 16 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion11 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand ,8 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law : (CR) Motion Hearing set for 1/2/2019 02:00 PM in Roanoke before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. Parties may appear telephonically if coordinated with chambers beforehand. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
17 | 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Myer Talotta on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Talotta, Jon) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
18 | 18 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mylan, N.V., Corporate Parent Mylan, Inc. for Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Talotta, Jon) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
19 | 19 RESPONSE in Support re8 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Talotta, Jon) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
20 | 20 ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Amending Briefing Order. The previously scheduled hearing in Roanoke at 2:00 p.m. on January 2, 2019, is cancelled. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 12/21/2018. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
21 | 21 Notice of Cancellation of 1/2/2019 Motion Hearing (Cancel Court Reporter) (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
22 | 22 State Court Records received from Lee County Circuit Court, CL18-100216(ab) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Part 2, | ||
Att: 2 Part 3, | ||
Att: 3 Part 4, | ||
Att: 4 Part 5 | ||
Monday, December 31, 2018 | ||
23 | 23 MOTION to Stay by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.(Broughton, Turner) Modified on 1/2/2019 to remove referral at direction of chambers (ck). [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
24 | 24 Brief / Memorandum in Support re23 MOTION to Stay . filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 | ||
Tuesday, January 01, 2019 | ||
25 | 25 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re23 MOTION to Stay . filed by Lee County, Virginia.(Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Thursday, January 03, 2019 | ||
26 | 26 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion11 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand ,8 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law ,23 MOTION to Stay : (CR) Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2019 10:00 AM in Roanoke before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: This hearing has been set for two hours. If you think the hearing will take longer than two hours, please contact the Courtroom Deputy as soon as possible. Parties may appear telephonically if coordinated with chambers beforehand. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
27 | 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re23 MOTION to Stay . filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Talotta, Jon) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
28 | 28 MOTION for Julian W. Park to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3044957. by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc..(Hedblom, Jacqueline) Modified on 1/9/2019 - removed referral text (ejs). [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
29 | 29 MOTION for Adriana Riviere-Badell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3044958. by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.(Hedblom, Jacqueline) Modified on 1/9/2019 - removed referral text (ejs). [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
30 | 30 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re8 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Tuesday, January 08, 2019 | ||
31 | 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Cheryl Mandel on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Mandel, Rebecca) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
32 | 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re23 MOTION to Stay . filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
33 | 33 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Lollar, Tirzah) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
34 | 34 NOTICE by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Supplemental Notice in Support of Removal (Lollar, Tirzah) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
35 | 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar on behalf of Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Lollar, Tirzah) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Wednesday, January 09, 2019 | ||
36 | 36 ORAL ORDER granting28 MOTION for Julian W. Park to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Julian W. Park for Express Scripts Holding Company and Express Scripts, Inc. added. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/9/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
37 | 37 ORAL ORDER granting29 MOTION for Adriana Riviere-Badell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Adriana Riviere-Badell for Express Scripts Holding Company and Express Scripts, Inc. added. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/9/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Thursday, January 10, 2019 | ||
38 | 38 MOTION for Kimberly Chemerinsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3046888. by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent.(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
39 | 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re8 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Lee County, Virginia.(Conrod, Richard) Modified on 1/10/2019 to removed ex parte restriction per plt's counsel request(flc). [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
40 | 40 Notice of Correction re39 Reply to Response to Motion; Plt's counsel originally filed39 as Ex Parte in error; clerk removed restriction from docket entry39 and re-generated the pleading to all counsel of record. (flc) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
41 | 41 MOTION for Steven G. Kobre to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3047265. by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc..Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent.(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
42 | 42 MOTION for Matthew I. Menchel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3047276. by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc..Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent.(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
43 | 43 MOTION for Jake R. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3047779. by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc..Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent.(Lollar, Tirzah) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
44 | 44 MOTION for Brian Boone to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3048394. by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent.(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
45 | 45 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Remand by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc..Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent.(Mandel, Rebecca) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Memorandum of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Remand, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
46 | 46 Brief/Memorandum in Opposition to Supplemental Notice of Removal Filed By Endo Defendants and in Support of Motion to Remand . filed by Lee County, Virginia. (Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Monday, January 14, 2019 | ||
47 | 47 ORAL ORDER granting38 MOTION for Kimberly Chemerinsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kimberly Chemerinsky for Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated added. Entered by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/14/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
48 | 48 ORAL ORDER granting41 MOTION for Steven G. Kobre to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Steven G. Kobre for Express Scripts Holding Company,and Express Scripts, Inc. added. Entered by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/14/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
49 | 49 ORAL ORDER granting42 MOTION for Matthew I. Menchel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Matthew I. Menchel for Express Scripts Holding Company and Express Scripts, Inc. added. Entered by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/14/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
50 | 50 ORAL ORDER granting43 MOTION for Jake R. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jake R. Miller for Endo Health Solutions, Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added. Entered by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/14/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
51 | 51 ORAL ORDER granting44 MOTION for Brian Boone to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Brian David Boone for Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated added. Entered by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/14/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
52 | 52 ORAL ORDER granting45 Motion for Leave to File. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand at45 Exhibit A is deemed filed. Entered by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/14/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
53 | 53 MOTION for William Jordan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3049354. by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent.(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
54 | 54 Brief/Memorandum in Opposition to Supplemental Notice of Removal . filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Mandel, Rebecca) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
55 | 55 REPLY to Response to Motion re23 MOTION to Stay . filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
56 | 56 Response re34 Notice (Other) . filed by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Lollar, Tirzah) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
57 | 57 ORAL ORDER granting53 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney William Herman Jordan for Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated added. Entered by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/16/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
58 | 58 NOTICE by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re56 (NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC. AND ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.S RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (Lollar, Tirzah) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Thursday, January 17, 2019 | ||
59 | 59 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon: Motion Hearing held on 1/17/2019 re11 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand filed by Lee County, Virginia,8 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Lee County, Virginia,23 MOTION to Stay filed by OptumRx, Inc., Optum, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Court Reporter: M. Butenschoen) (bwd) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
60 | 60 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated re8 ,23 of Supplemental Authorities(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
61 | 61 NOTICE by Lee County, Virginia re8 (Additional Authority)(Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
62 | 62 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated re8 ,23 of Supplemental Authority(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
63 | 63 NOTICE by Lee County, Virginia re8 (EDVA Decision)(Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
64 | 64 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated re8 ,23 of Supplemental Authorities(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
65 | 65 12 pgs Memorandum Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part11 Motion to Expedite and granting23 Motion to Stay Case. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 2/14/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Wednesday, April 03, 2019 | ||
66 | 66 Notice of MDL Transfer Order from Northern District of Ohio; MDL No. 2804 (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.] | |
Tuesday, April 16, 2019 | ||
67 | 67 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Virginia Western. Case number 2:18-cv-00049. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |