Seminole County Board of County Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma, LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45260 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Oklahoma Eastern, 6:18-cv-00372 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:30 PM EST |
Defendant
Joseph Knight
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tamerlane Rozsa
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Christopher Moses
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joshua Livingston
|
|
Defendant
Roger Kinney
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Seminole County Board of County Commissioners
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/04/2019 4:16 PM EST |
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
PETITION filed in State Court against Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan Finance, LLC, Allergan, PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutic, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Roger Kinney, Joseph Knight, Joshua Livingston, Mallinckrodt, LLC, McKesson Corporation, Christopher Moses, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP, Tamerlane Rozsa, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Seminole County Board of County Commissioners (pjw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | ||
Wednesday, November 14, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (pjw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
2 | 2 NOTICE of Removal from Seminole County District Court, case number 18-CJ-114 by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (pjw, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
Att: 45 (11/16/2018) Exhibit 24 - Summons - Roger Kinney | ||
Thursday, November 15, 2018 | ||
FILING FEES Paid in Full on 11/15/2018 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1222122 by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | ||
3 | 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond) Modified on 11/16/2018: added corporate parent (nm, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
4 | 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Raymond E. Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
5 | 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendants are directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 11/26/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
Friday, November 16, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A. Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
7 | 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
8 | 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D. Michael McBride, III on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (McBride, D.) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
9 | 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Susan E. Huntsman on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
10 | 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John H. Sparks on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Sparks, John) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
11 | 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation) by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
12 | 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Sparks, John) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
13 | 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Responses due by 12/4/2018(Sparks, John) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
14 | 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Larry D. Ottaway on behalf of Walmart, Inc. (Ottaway, Larry) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
15 | 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition by Walmart, Inc., CVS Health Corporation and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.; Responses due by 12/4/2018(Ottaway, Larry) Modified on 11/26/2018 to add filers (dma, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
16 | 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jordyn Cartmell on behalf of Walmart, Inc. (Cartmell, Jordyn) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
17 | 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Amy Sherry Fischer on behalf of Walmart, Inc. (Fischer, Amy) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
18 | 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder: granting15 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition as to CVS Health Corporation, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. and Walmart, Inc. (cjt, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
19 | 19 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder: granting13 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings as to Actavis Pharma, Inc.; Actavis, LLC; Allergan Finance, LLC; Allergan, PLC; Cephalon, Inc.; Endo Health Solutions, Inc.; Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Insys Therapeutic, Inc.; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Johnson & Johnson; Mallinckrodt, LLC; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.; Purdue Pharma, Inc.; Purdue Pharma, LP; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Watson Laboratories, Inc. (cjt, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
20 | 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stuart D. Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
21 | 21 Supplemental NOTICE of Removal by McKesson Corporation (With attachments)(Campbell, Stuart) Modified on 11/28/2018 to edit event and add link (dma, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
22 | 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
Friday, November 30, 2018 | ||
23 | 23 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael W. Ridgeway on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Ridgeway, Michael) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
24 | 24 Unopposed Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation Responses due by 12/14/2018(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
25 | 25 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to District Judge Ronald A. White. Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-18-372-RAW. (ndd, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
26 | 26 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to the recusal of Judge Ronald A. White and at the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to Judge James H. Payne. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-18-372-JHP. (cjt, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
27 | 27 ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne: granting24 Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition as to Defendants AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc. and McKesson Corporation (cjt, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
Monday, December 17, 2018 | ||
28 | 28 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Seminole County Board of County Commissioners Responses due by 1/2/2019(Gibbs, George) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
29 | 29 BRIEF in Support of Motion by Seminole County Board of County Commissioners ;(Gibbs, George) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
Wednesday, January 02, 2019 | ||
30 | 30 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ; (With attachments)(Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
31 | 31 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion by McKesson Corporation ; (With attachments)(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
32 | 32 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation (With attachments) Responses due by 1/16/2019(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
33 | 33 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion by Seminole County Board of County Commissioners ;(Gibbs, George) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
34 | 34 REPLY to Response to Motion by Seminole County Board of County Commissioners ;(Gibbs, George) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
35 | 35 Joint REPLY to Response to Motion by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation (Campbell, Stuart) Modified on 1/31/2019 to edit event and text (dma, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
Wednesday, February 13, 2019 | ||
36 | 36 NOTICE OF HEARING SESSION by United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation set on 3/28/2019 (cjt, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
37 | 37 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sanford C. Coats on behalf of Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP (Coats, Sanford) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
38 | 38 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jennifer N. Lamirand on behalf of Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP (Lamirand, Jennifer) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
39 | 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliates Purdue Pharma Inc. and Pharmaceutical Research Associates L.P. by Purdue Pharma, LP (Lamirand, Jennifer) Modified on 2/25/2019: added Other Affiliates (nm, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
40 | 40 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Purdue Pharma, Inc. (Lamirand, Jennifer) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
41 | 41 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Pharmaceutical Research Associates, Inc. for Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The) by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The (Lamirand, Jennifer) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
Wednesday, February 27, 2019 | ||
42 | 42 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne: Directing Kaspar Stoffelmayr, Rocky C. Tsai, J. Matthew Donohue and Mark S. Cheffo to file by 3/13/2019 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice per Local Civil Rule 83.2. (cjt, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
Wednesday, March 13, 2019 | ||
43 | 43 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Seth A. Day on behalf of Mallinckrodt, LLC (Day, Seth) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
44 | 44 MOTION for Attorney Jennifer Pantina, Rocky C. Tsai, Richard Gallagher, Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1250663) by Mallinckrodt, LLC (With attachments) Responses due by 3/27/2019(Day, Seth) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
Thursday, March 14, 2019 | ||
45 | 45 MAIL to Mark S. Cheffo Returned - marked Return to Sender - Attempted Not Known - Unable to Forward. (jcb, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
46 | 46 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne: granting44 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorneys Jennifer Pantina, Rocky C. Tsai and Richard Jr. Gallagher for Mallinckrodt, LLC, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicants within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (cjt, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
Tuesday, March 26, 2019 | ||
47 | 47 MOTION for Attorney Mark S. Cheffo to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1254021) by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP (With attachments) Responses due by 4/9/2019(Lamirand, Jennifer) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
Friday, March 29, 2019 | ||
48 | 48 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge John W. Lungstrum of the District of Kansas, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 292(b). All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-18-372-JWL. (cjt, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
Wednesday, April 03, 2019 | ||
49 | 49 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge John W Lungstrum granting47 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for attorney Mark S. Cheffo, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (Lungstrum, John) Modified on 4/3/2019 to edit text; NEF regenerated (tls, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
50 | 50 6 pgs MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by District Judge John W Lungstrum - granting32 Motion by certain defendants for a stay of proceedings pending a decision concerning the transfer of this case to the MDL and this case is hereby STAYED. (Lungstrum, John) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
51 | 51 TRANSFER ORDER (MDL No. 2804) from United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (tls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
Thursday, April 04, 2019 | ||
52 | 52 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER (MDL NO. 2804) transferring case to Northern District of Ohio (case terminated) (tls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 4/16/2019.] | |
Tuesday, April 16, 2019 | ||
53 | 53 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Oklahoma Eastern. Case number 6:18-cv-00372. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |