COPPA-KNUDSON v. COLEMAN
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-50472
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-50472
Nevada Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Bruce T Beesley |
Case #: | 3:19-ap-05005 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 24, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
BRETT COLEMAN, TRUSTEE OF THE BRETT COLEMAN FAMILY TRUST
539 RIVERSIDE DR
RENO, NV 89503 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JERI COPPA-KNUDSON
3495 LAKESIDE DR PMB #62
RENO, NV 89509 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:06 PM PDT |
Friday, July 24, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 07/24 9:10 AM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case (cly) |
|
Thursday, July 23, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Dismissal (case)
Thu 07/23 3:45 PM
Notice of Dismissal with Certificate of Service Filed by JEFFREY L HARTMAN on behalf of JERI COPPA-KNUDSON (HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |
|
Friday, October 18, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
order
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019
Fri 10/18 4:06 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 (lms) |
|
Tuesday, September 17, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
adv_misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 09/17 2:52 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by JEFFREY L HARTMAN on behalf of JERI COPPA-KNUDSON (HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Adv)
Thu 09/12 10:10 AM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Hearing scheduled 10/16/2019 at 10:00 AM at BTB RN-Courtroom 2, Young Bldg.. (cly) |
|
Wednesday, September 11, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Hearing (Adv)
Wed 09/11 3:00 PM
Notice of Hearing Hearing Date: 10/16/2019 Hearing Time: 10:00 a.m. Filed by JEFFREY L HARTMAN on behalf of JERI COPPA-KNUDSON (HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019
Wed 09/11 2:58 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 and Settlement Agreement Filed by JEFFREY L HARTMAN on behalf of JERI COPPA-KNUDSON (HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference)
Wed 04/17 9:31 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 7/9/2019 at 09:00 AM at BTB RN-Courtroom 2, Young Bldg.. (cly) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-docket of online payment
Tue 04/16 4:11 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint 19-05005 btb) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 18818684, fee amount $ 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 4:06 PM
Adversary case 19-05005 Complaint to Avoid Transfers Filed by JERI COPPA-KNUDSON vs. BRETT COLEMAN Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)(HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |