Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-00709
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2019
Case in other court:District of Columbia, 1:19-cv-00273
Last checked: Monday Oct 14, 2019 4:59 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Represented By
KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
ROBERT B ELLIS
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Chicago Il
contact info
Plaintiff
SEAN LYNCH
Represented By
STEVEN WILLIAM TEPPLER
Steven W Teppler Esq
contact info
JESSICA HAMMAN MEEDER
Murphy & Falcon Pa - Baltimore Md
contact info
WILLIAMS HUGHES MURPHY, III
Murphy & Falcon Pa - Baltimore Md
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
25 25 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 04/26 2:28 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SEAN LYNCH (YANCHUNIS, JOHN)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Tue 04/26 3:34 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: : See 3:19-md-02885-MCR-GRJ ECF No. 763 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17. re: Voluntary Dismissals. "Any Plaintiff who wishes to voluntarily dismiss any case filed in or transferred to this MDL must comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii)." Re25 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by SEAN LYNCH (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/08 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN WILLIAM TEPPLER on behalf of SEAN LYNCH (TEPPLER, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2019
23 23 misc Docket Annotation Fri 11/22 10:52 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Counsel, John A. Yanchunis if you wish to receive NEF's in the master case please enter an appearance (by NOTICE ONLY party) in the Lead Case 3:19md2885. Re21 Master Short Form Complaint filed by SEAN LYNCH (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2019
22 22 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Thu 11/21 12:59 PM
ORDER granting 20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jessica H. Meeder. Attorney JESSICA HAMMAN MEEDER terminated. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/21/2019. (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2019
21 21 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 11/05 4:47 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY filed by SEAN LYNCH. (sps)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2019
20 20 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 11/04 2:21 PM
First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jessica H. Meeder by SEAN LYNCH. (MEEDER, JESSICA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Withdrawal as Counsel
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 11/04 2:42 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:20 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jessica H. Meeder (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2019
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/03 12:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAMS HUGHES MURPHY, III on behalf of SEAN LYNCH (MURPHY, WILLIAMS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2019
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/02 7:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN WILLIAM TEPPLER on behalf of SEAN LYNCH (TEPPLER, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2019
17 17 misc Docket Annotation Mon 04/29 3:59 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Filer. PHV Motion must be filed in the Lead Case 3:19md2885 Re16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William H. Murphy III. (djb)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/29 2:06 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William H. Murphy III.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4473901.) by SEAN LYNCH. (MURPHY, WILLIAMS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/29 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA HAMMAN MEEDER on behalf of SEAN LYNCH (MEEDER, JESSICA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
14 14 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Wed 04/17 1:34 PM
Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-00273. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2019
13 13 transfer Case Transferred Out - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Wed 04/17 9:02 AM
EMAIL dated 4/15/19 from the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida requesting the transfer of the original file to be sent using the extract civil case feature of CM/ECF. (ztnr) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/17/2019.]
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 04/17 9:01 AM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO- 1) dated 4/15/19 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge M. Casey Rodgers for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2885) (ztnr) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/17/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2019
11 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Class Action Complaint against 3M COMPANY with Jury Demand filed by SEAN LYNCH.(Teppler, Steven) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/17/2019.]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Hamman Meeder on behalf of SEAN LYNCH (Meeder, Jessica) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/17/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/8/2019. (tj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/17/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 25, 2019
MINUTE ORDER granting9 Motion to Stay: it is hereby ORDERED that this case is STAYED pending a final determination by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") regarding consolidation of this action with other related cases. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may amend his Complaint by March 8, 2019. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report within 14 days of the JPML ruling on the petition to transfer and consolidate the related cases. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/25/19. (lcrc1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/17/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 22, 2019
9 9 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litgation by 3M COMPANY(Branscome, Kimberly) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/17/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C
8 8 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by 3M COMPANY (Branscome, Kimberly) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/17/2019.]
Related: [-]
7 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert B. Ellis, :Firm- Kirkland & Ellis LLP, :Address- 300 North LaSalle, Chicago, Illinois 60654. Phone No. - 312-862-2000. Fax No. - 312-862-2200 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5961754. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by 3M COMPANY(Branscome, Kimberly) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/17/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
6 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly O. Branscome on behalf of 3M COMPANY (Branscome, Kimberly) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/17/2019.]
Related: [-]
MINUTE ORDER granting7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice : Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that Robert B. Ellis is admitted to represent Defendant pro hac vice in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/22/19. (lcrc1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/17/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 11, 2019
5 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. 3M COMPANY served on 2/5/2019, answer due 2/26/2019 (Teppler, Steven) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/17/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 01, 2019
4 4 ERRATA to Caption by SEAN LYNCH1 Complaint, filed by SEAN LYNCH. (Teppler, Steven) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/17/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to 3M COMPANY.(zef, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/17/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
2 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by SEAN LYNCH. Case related to: W.D. Okl. 5:19-cv-58 et al (zef, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/17/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5921115) filed by SEAN LYNCH.(Teppler, Steven) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/1/2019) (zef, ). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/17/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Related Case Form and Addendum,
Att: 3 Summons Summons
Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/17/2019.]
Related: [-]