Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:18-bk-11002

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Catherine Peek Mcewen
Case #: 8:19-ap-00192
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2019
Terminated:Oct 09, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
COLONIAL FUNDING NETWORK, INC. as Servicing Provider for LYSOFT MEDIA
Carlton Fields P.O. Box 3239
Tampa, FL 33601
Represented By
COLONIAL FUNDING NETWORK, INC. as Servicing Provider for LYSOFT MEDIA
contact info
Defendant
CAN Capital Asset Servicing, Inc. f/k/a New Logic Business Loans, Inc.
Mateer & Harbert, P.A. 225 E. Robinson Street, Suite 600 Post Office Box 2854 (32802)
Orlando, FL 32801
Represented By
CAN Capital Asset Servicing, Inc. f/k/a New Logic Business Loans, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrew Meyer
1501 Belcher Road S, Unit 6B
Largo, FL 33771
Represented By
Jake C Blanchard
Blanchard Law, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 09, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Wed 10/09 3:31 PM
Adversary Case 8:19-ap-192 Closed. (Laura G.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2019
23 23 misc Certificate of Service Fri 09/06 10:04 AM
Certificate of Service Re: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice Filed by Jake C Blanchard on behalf of Attorney Jake C. Blanchard Blanchard Law, P.A., Plaintiff Andrew Meyer Related [+]. (Blanchard, Jake)
Related: [-] 22
22 22 notice Notice Of Dismissal (voluntary) Fri 09/06 9:45 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice Filed by Jake C Blanchard on behalf of Plaintiff Andrew Meyer. (Blanchard, Jake)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2019
21 21 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Thu 08/22 7:37 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: JAMES ELLIOTT; JAKE BLANCHARD; RYAN YANT.. RULING: STATUS CONFERENCE.. NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL TO BE FILED.. Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2019
20 20 notice Notice (DO NOT USE for appearances or hearings) Tue 08/13 3:38 PM
Notice of Unavailability Filed by Jake C Blanchard on behalf of Attorney Jake C. Blanchard Blanchard Law, P.A.. (Blanchard, Jake)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2019
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice Fri 08/02 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 08/01/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #18 )
Tuesday, July 30, 2019
18 18 court Notice Of Hearing / Status Conference Tue 07/30 3:15 PM
Notice of Status Conference . Hearing scheduled for 8/21/2019 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Christiane)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2019
court COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only) Fri 06/28 8:51 AM
Change of Address submitted to the Court on June 27, 2019 by Attorney Jake C. Blanchard of Blanchard Law, P.A. - 1501 South Belcher Road. Unit 6B - Largo, FL 33771. (Sara M.)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2019
court Corrective Entry - Corrective Action Required (SB) Fri 05/31 12:44 PM
ERROR NOTIFICATION to Jake Blanchard. The event you selected does not match the Pdf image you filed. NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN BY THE COURT ON THIS FILING, Related [+]. (Lidia)
Related: [-] 17
Wednesday, May 29, 2019
17 17 motion Motion to Stay Wed 05/29 10:53 AM
Renewed Motion to Stay State Court Proceeding (continue injunction relief) Filed by Jake C Blanchard on behalf of Plaintiff Andrew Meyer. (Blanchard, Jake)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2019
misc Electronic Service Text Entry (TEXT ONLY) Mon 05/13 10:32 AM
Service completed via CM/ECF electronic notification. Filed by Jake C Blanchard on behalf of Plaintiff Andrew Meyer Related [+]. (Blanchard, Jake)
Related: [-] 16
Friday, May 10, 2019
16 16 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Party - Adversary Fri 05/10 4:43 PM
Order Dismissing Party: CAN Capital Asset Servicing, Inc. f/k/a New Logic Business Loans, Inc. without Prejudice . Service Instructions: Jake Blanchard is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Susan M.)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2019
15 15 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Mon 05/06 5:19 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by John R Yant on behalf of Defendant Kapitus Servicing, Inc., formerly known as Colonial Funding Network, Inc. as service provider for Tigerlyfe Capital Solutions, LLC. (Yant, John)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Certificate Of Service Mon 05/06 11:45 AM
Certificate of Service Re: Order Granting Emergency Motion for INjunctive Relief (Doc. 11). Filed by Jake C Blanchard on behalf of Plaintiff Andrew Meyer Related [+]. (Blanchard, Jake)
Related: [-] 11
Saturday, May 04, 2019
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Sun 05/05 12:31 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Related [+]. Notice Date 05/04/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #12 )
Thursday, May 02, 2019
12 12 court Notice Of Deficient Filing Thu 05/02 9:05 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing. Statement of Corporate Ownership not filed Related [+]. (Deanna)
Related: [-] 10 ,9
Wednesday, May 01, 2019
11 11 order Preliminary Injunction Wed 05/01 12:07 PM
Order Granting Motion For Preliminary Injunction Related [+]. Service Instructions: Jake Blanchard is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Christiane)
Related: [-] 2
10 10 notice Notice Of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/01 10:03 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by John R Yant on behalf of Defendant Kapitus Servicing, Inc., formerly known as Colonial Funding Network, Inc. as service provider for Tigerlyfe Capital Solutions, LLC. (Yant, John)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice Of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/01 10:01 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Donald R Kirk on behalf of Defendant Kapitus Servicing, Inc., formerly known as Colonial Funding Network, Inc. as service provider for Tigerlyfe Capital Solutions, LLC. (Kirk, Donald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2019
8 8 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Thu 04/25 8:14 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: JAMES ELLIOTT; JAKE BLANCHARD; MICHAEL PAASCH; RYAN YANT; STEPHANIE LIEB; NATHAN WHEATLEY.. RULING: Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction Filed by Jake C Blanchard on behalf of Plaintiff Andrew Meyer. (Blanchard, Jake) Doc #2.. INJUNCTION IMPOSED AS TO 75% TO DEBTOR AND 25% TO CAPITUS AND FOR 1 MONTH FOR WAGES TO ANY BANK ACCOUNT; CAN CAPITAL TO BE DISMISSED FROM THE ADVERSARY...ORDER BY BLANCHARD... . Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2019
7 7 7 pgs misc Memorandum Wed 04/24 4:59 PM
Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Andrew Meyer's Emergency Motion for Injunctive Relief Filed by Michael A Paasch on behalf of Defendant CAN Capital Asset Servicing, Inc. f/k/a New Logic Business Loans, Inc. Related [+]. (Paasch, Michael)
Related: [-] 2
Monday, April 22, 2019
6 6 notice Notice Of Hearing Mon 04/22 12:38 PM
Notice of Preliminary Hearing Filed by Jake C Blanchard on behalf of Plaintiff Andrew Meyer Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 4/25/2019 at 09:45 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Blanchard, Jake)
Related: [-] 2
court Prepare Hearing Notice - Courtroom Deputy Use - Attorney to Notice Mon 04/22 11:41 AM
Amended Preliminary Hearing Scheduled Related [+] This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions: Jake Blanchard is directed to prepare, file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. Failure to comply with the noticing instructions will result in cancellation of the hearing that addresses this specific matter. AMENDED TO CHANGE HEARING DATE FROM 4/22/19 AT 2:30 PM TO 4/25/19 AT 9:45 AM. Hearing scheduled for 4/25/2019 at 09:45 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Denise G.)
Related: [-] Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only ,2
Thursday, April 18, 2019
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Thu 04/18 1:11 PM
Amended Certificate of Service Re: Complaint for Injunctive Relief Filed by Jake C Blanchard on behalf of Plaintiff Andrew Meyer. (Blanchard, Jake)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 04/18 12:00 PM
Summons issued along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 05/20/2019. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Thu 04/18 11:15 AM
Certificate of Service Re: Complaint for Injunctive Relief Filed by Jake C Blanchard on behalf of Plaintiff Andrew Meyer. (Blanchard, Jake)
Related: [-]
court Thu 04/18 1:51 PM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 4/22/2019 2:30 pm Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Re: Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction Doc2 . This entry will serve as the official notification of hearing from the court. Related [+]. (Dkt)
Related: [-] 2
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
2 2 motion Motion for Preliminary Injunction Wed 04/17 5:37 PM
Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction Filed by Jake C Blanchard on behalf of Plaintiff Andrew Meyer. (Blanchard, Jake)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - Original Wed 04/17 5:26 PM
Complaint by Andrew Meyer against COLONIAL FUNDING NETWORK, INC. as Servicing Provider for LYSOFT MEDIA, CAN Capital Asset Servicing, Inc. f/k/a New Logic Business Loans, Inc.. (Fee Paid.) Nature of Suit: [72 (Injunctive relief - other)]. (Blanchard, Jake)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B