Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-00727
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2019
Case in other court:California Central, 8:19-cv-00267
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 15, 2019 4:51 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Represented By
KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR.
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola Fl
contact info
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By
CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR.
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTIAN WERTHMULLER
Represented By
Mark P Robinson, Jr
Robinson Calcagnie Inc
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, October 30, 2019
27 27 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 10/30 5:34 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CHRISTIAN WERTHMULLER (LUKEI, SHANNON)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2019
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/08 11:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR on behalf of 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (BEALL, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2019
25 25 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 04/18 10:52 AM
NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY OF RECORD. (djb)
Related: [-]
24 24 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Thu 04/18 9:56 AM
Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 8:19-cv-00267. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
23 23 Conditional Transfer Order - 1 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2885, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Florida and assigned to Honorable Honorable M. Casey Rodgers. Case transferred electronically. (es) [Transferred from California Central on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2019
22 22 ORDER GRANTING PARTIES' JOINT MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING RULINGS BY THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION20 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (es) [Transferred from California Central on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2019
21 21 SUPPLEMENT to Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Rulings By The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation 20 re [PROPOSED] ORDER ON PARTIES JOINT MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Branscome, Kimberly) [Transferred from California Central on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2019
20 20 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Rulings By The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendant 3M Company. Motion set for hearing on 4/15/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Branscome, Kimberly) [Transferred from California Central on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
19 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant 3M Company identifying 3M Company as Corporate Parent. (Branscome, Kimberly) [Transferred from California Central on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
18 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kimberly O Branscome counsel for Defendant 3M Company. Adding Kimberly Branscome as counsel of record for 3M Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Attorney Kimberly O Branscome added to party 3M Company(pty:dft))(Branscome, Kimberly) [Transferred from California Central on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2019
17 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christian Werthmuller, upon Defendant 3M Company served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mai Yang, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Robinson, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
16 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christian Werthmuller, upon Defendant AEARO Technologies, LLC served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mai Yang, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Robinson, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 22, 2019
15 15 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Clinton Casperson on behalf of Plaintiff Christian Werthmuller. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
14 14 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Rebecca King on behalf of Plaintiff Christian Werthmuller. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
13 13 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Shawn P. Fox on behalf of Plaintiff Christian Werthmuller. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
12 12 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Sean Patrick Tracey on behalf of Plaintiff Christian Werthmuller. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 12, 2019
11 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Clinton Casperson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Rebecca King. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Shawn P. Fox. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Sean Patrick Tracey. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
7 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants 3M Company, AEARO Technologies, LLC. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 11, 2019
4 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Christian Werthmuller, identifying 3M Company, Aearo Technologies, LLC, Robinson Calcagnie, Inc., Tracey & Fox. (Robinson, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Christian Werthmuller. (Robinson, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Christian Werthmuller. (Robinson, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23195292 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Christian Werthmuller. (Attorney Mark P Robinson, Jr added to party Christian Werthmuller(pty:pla))(Robinson, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G