Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-00743
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2019
Case in other court:Missouri Western, 2:19-cv-04040
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 15, 2019 5:10 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Represented By
CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR.
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL J SCHONFELD
Represented By
W MARK LANIER
Lanier Law Firm - Houston Tx
contact info
CRISTINA DELISE
Lanier Law Firm - New York Ny
contact info
KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Lanier Law Firm - Houston Tx
contact info
MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Lanier Law Firm - Woodland Hills Ca
contact info
D. Todd Mathews
Gori Julian & Associates PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, November 01, 2019
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 11/01 1:59 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, filed by MICHAEL J SCHONFELD. (AKSELRUD, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2019
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 10/25 11:25 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, filed by MICHAEL J SCHONFELD. (AKSELRUD, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2019
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/10 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LANIER, KATHRYN)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/10 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by W MARK LANIER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LANIER, W)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/10 10:32 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by CRISTINA DELISE on behalf of All Plaintiffs (DELISE, CRISTINA)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/10 10:30 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL A AKSELRUD on behalf of All Plaintiffs (AKSELRUD, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2019
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/03 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR on behalf of 3M COMPANY (BEALL, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2019
6 6 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Thu 04/18 2:57 PM
Case transferred in from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 2:19-cv-04040. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
5 5 4 pgs order Order Thu 04/18 9:46 AM
MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER, CTO-2, from Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel, transferring case to Florida Northern to be included in MDL No. 2885. Signed on 4/16/19. Case electronically transferred. (James, Carrie) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2019
4 4 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Michael J Schonfeld. Waiver sent to 3M Company on 2/27/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Mathews, D.) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
3 3 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 2/27/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Geiser, Angel) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
1 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company filed by D. Todd Mathews on behalf of Michael Schonfeld. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6193222. Service due by 5/28/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Mathews, D.) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet