Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-00756
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2019
Terminated:Jul 19, 2019
Case in other court:Indiana Southern, 1:19-cv-00742
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 15, 2019 4:58 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Represented By
Renee J. Mortimer
Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Scott B. Cockrum
Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By
Adam Arceneaux
Ice Miller Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Alexandria Hanauer Pittman
Ice Miller Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Plaintiff
MATTHEW ZIMMERMAN
Represented By
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
Timothy Loren Karns
Wagner Reese, LLP
contact info
Jason Ruskin Reese
Wagner Reese, LLP
contact info
Stephen M. Wagner
Wagner Reese, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, July 19, 2019
26 26 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 07/19 3:22 PM
CLERK'S DISMISSAL re25 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice (djb)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 07/19 10:22 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MATTHEW ZIMMERMAN (WATTS, MIKAL)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2019
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/03 12:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN J ROGIERS on behalf of MATTHEW ZIMMERMAN (ROGIERS, ERIN)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2019
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/29 4:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MIKAL WATTS on behalf of MATTHEW ZIMMERMAN (WATTS, MIKAL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2019
22 22 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Thu 04/18 3:30 PM
Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00742. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Letter Thu 04/18 12:16 PM
Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Florida. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Florida, IN RE: MDL 2885 on April 17, 2019. (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
20 20 4 pgs order Order Thu 04/18 12:15 PM
CLOSED TRANSFER to the Northern District of Florida IN RE: 3M COMBAT ARMS EARPLUG PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL. 2885 per CTO 2. (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2019
19 19 ORDER granting Aearo Technologies LLC's18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint to 6/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/12/2019. (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2019
18 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to 6/14/19 in which to1 Complaint Pending Further Order of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation , filed by Defendant AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC.(Pittman, Alexandria) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Conditional Transfer Order,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 09, 2019
17 17 ORDER granting Defendant 3M Company's16 Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint and to Cancel Initial Pretrial Conference Pending Further Order of the United States Judicial Panel on Multi District Litigation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED ADJUDGED and DECREED: that Defendant, 3M COMPANY, has to and including June 11, 2019, in which to respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages. It is hereby FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the April 17, 2019 hearing date is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/9/2019.(SWM) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2019
16 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to June 11, 2019 to Respond to Complaint and to Cancel Initial Pre-Trial Conference Pending Further Order of the United States Judicial Panel on Multi District Litigation , filed by Defendant 3M COMPANY.(Mortimer, Renee) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Transfer Order and Conditional Transfer Order,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, March 15, 2019
15 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/17/2019 02:30 PM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 3/15/2019.(SWM) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2019
14 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandria Hanauer Pittman on behalf of Defendant AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Pittman, Alexandria) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
13 13 Notice of Parties First Extension of Time re1 Complaint Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint , filed by Defendant AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Arceneaux, Adam) Modified on 3/15/2019 (DWH). [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
12 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC identifying Corporate Parent 3M COMPANY for AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC.. (Arceneaux, Adam) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Arceneaux on behalf of Defendant AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Arceneaux, Adam) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
10 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott B. Cockrum on behalf of Defendant 3M COMPANY. (Cockrum, Scott) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
9 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3M COMPANY. (Mortimer, Renee) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant 3M COMPANY. (Mortimer, Renee) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Renee J. Mortimer on behalf of Defendant 3M COMPANY. (Mortimer, Renee) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 20, 2019
6 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
5 5 Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (REO) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 19, 2019
4 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Loren Karns on behalf of Plaintiff MATTHEW ZIMMERMAN. (Karns, Timothy) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Wagner on behalf of Plaintiff MATTHEW ZIMMERMAN. (Wagner, Stephen) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Ruskin Reese on behalf of Plaintiff MATTHEW ZIMMERMAN. Related [+] [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-] ese, Jason
1 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by MATTHEW ZIMMERMAN. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5292256) Related [+] [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-] ese, Jason
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons 3M Company,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Aearo Technologies LLC