Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-00759
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2019
Case in other court:Indiana Southern, 1:19-cv-01054
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 15, 2019 4:52 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Represented By
Scott B. Cockrum
Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Renee J. Mortimer
Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR.
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola Fl
contact info
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By
Alexandria Hanauer Pittman
Ice Miller Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Adam Arceneaux
Ice Miller Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR.
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
LEVI GUMNS
Represented By
Stephen M. Wagner
Wagner Reese, LLP
contact info
SHAWN FOX
Tracey & Fox Law Firm - Houston Tx
contact info
Jason Ruskin Reese
Wagner Reese, LLP
contact info
SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Tracey & Fox Law Firm - Houston Tx
contact info
Timothy Loren Karns
Wagner Reese, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 30, 2019
23 23 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 10/30 5:10 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by LEVI GUMNS (FOX, SHAWN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2019
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/28 4:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR on behalf of 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (BEALL, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2019
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/15 1:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SEAN PATRICK TRACEY on behalf of LEVI GUMNS (TRACEY, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2019
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/30 1:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SHAWN FOX on behalf of LEVI GUMNS (FOX, SHAWN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2019
19 19 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Thu 04/18 3:39 PM
Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-01054. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Letter Thu 04/18 12:25 PM
Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Florida. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Florida, IN RE: MDL 2885 on April 17, 2019. (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
17 17 4 pgs order Order Thu 04/18 12:24 PM
CLOSED TRANSFER to the Northern District of Florida IN RE: 3M COMBAT ARMS EARPLUG PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL. 2885 per CTO 2. (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
16 16 ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to 6/18/2019 for the Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 4/17/2019. (CBU) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to 6/18/2019 for the defendant 3M Company to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 4/17/2019. (CBU) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2019
14 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to 6/18/19 to Respond to Complaint Pending Further Order of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation , filed by Defendant AEARO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC.(Pittman, Alexandria) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Orders,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, April 12, 2019
13 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to June 18, 2019 to Respond to Complaint Pending Further Order of the United States Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation , filed by Defendant 3M COMPANY.(Mortimer, Renee) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Transfer Order and Conditional Transfer Order,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, March 25, 2019
12 12 Submission of Additional State Court Records received from the Clerk of Marion County.. (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, March 22, 2019
11 11 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant AEARO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Arceneaux, Adam) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2019
10 10 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant 3M COMPANY. (Mortimer, Renee) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2019
9 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2019
8 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandria Hanauer Pittman on behalf of Defendant AEARO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Pittman, Alexandria) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
7 7 CONSENT to Removal by AEARO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Arceneaux, Adam) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
6 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AEARO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC identifying Corporate Parent 3M COMPANY for AEARO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC.. (Arceneaux, Adam) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Arceneaux on behalf of Defendant AEARO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Arceneaux, Adam) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott B. Cockrum on behalf of Defendant 3M COMPANY. (Cockrum, Scott) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3M COMPANY. (Mortimer, Renee) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Renee J. Mortimer on behalf of Defendant 3M COMPANY. (Mortimer, Renee) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Superior Court, Civil Division 13, case number 49D13-1902-CT-005794, filed by 3M COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5336809)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record (Docket Sheet, Appearance, Complaint, Summons as to 3M, Summons as to Aearo, Notice of Consolidation, Service Returned as to 3M, Service Returned as to Aearo, Appearance, Appearance, Motion for Enlargement, Motion to Deem, Order on Consolidated Cases, Appearance, Motion for Enlargement, Motion to Deem, Appearance, Order Granting Motion to Deem, Order Granting Motion for Enlargement,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Operative Complaint,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mortimer, Renee) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 03/15/2019