Wisconsin Western District Court
Judge:William M Conley
Referred: Stephen L Crocker
Case #: 3:19-cv-00305
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2019
Terminated:Aug 15, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 15, 2019 4:02 AM CDT
Defendant
Biosense Webster, Inc.
Represented By
Sarah Elizabeth Johnston
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Christopher John Knapp
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Represented By
Sarah Elizabeth Johnston
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Christopher John Knapp
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Deborah Lynn Johnson
Represented By
Joshua Lawrence Weisberg
Rapoport Weisberg & Sims, P.C.
contact info
Melanie VanOverloop
Rapoport Law Offices, P.C.
contact info
Matthew S Sims
Rapoport Law Offices, P.C.
contact info
David E Rapoport
Rapoport Law Offices, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, August 15, 2022
order Dismissal Order Mon 08/15 1:35 PM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The court having received the parties' joint status report, this case is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Any party may move to dismiss with prejudice or to reopen for good cause shown. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/15/2022. (rks)
Related: [-]