County of Fannin v. Rite Aid of Georgia, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45269 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Georgia Northern, 2:18-cv-00220 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:32 PM EST |
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Heather Weaver
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Georgia, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Medicine Center Pharmacy
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Shelli Liston
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Just In Time Meds, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lori Fuller
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rodney Davis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Attainmed, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amarc Medical Clinic
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Inc
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
|
Plaintiff
County of Fannin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/24/2019 4:47 PM EDT |
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-8284184)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from gand on 4/18/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A with Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B part 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 COURT NOTICE of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk) [Transferred from gand on 4/18/2019.] | |
3 | 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Cardinal Health, Inc. & AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Rumfelt, Eileen Elizabeth) Modified on 11/21/2018 to correct docket text and identify party filers (sk). [Transferred from gand on 4/18/2019.] | |
4 | 4 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER re3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to Cardinal Health, Inc. and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation . (Rumfelt, Eileen Elizabeth) Modified on 11/21/2018 to correct docket text (sk). [Transferred from gand on 4/18/2019.] | |
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER granting3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the period in which the AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation and Cardinal Health, Inc. must answer, object, plead, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 45 days after any ruling by the Court on Plaintiff's motion to remand. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/26/2018. (dgr) [Transferred from gand on 4/18/2019.] | |
Tuesday, November 27, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint with Brief In Support by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Allergan PLC, Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc..(Helm, Elizabeth) [Transferred from gand on 4/18/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, November 29, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court , MOTION to Expedite the Ruling with Brief In Support by County of Fannin.(Wolfe, Larry) [Transferred from gand on 4/18/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Anderson County Remand Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - West Virginia Remand Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Greenville County Remand Order, | ||
Att: 4 Memorandum In Support of Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Remand and Motion for an Expedited Ruling | ||
8 | 8 ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the period in which the Moving Defendants must answer, object, plead, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 45 days following the earlier of either any decision on a motion for remand that Plaintiff may file or a final decision by the JPML on whether to transfer the case to In re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation, MDL No. 2804 (N.D. Ohio). Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/29/2018. (dgr) [Transferred from gand on 4/18/2019.] | |
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
9 | 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by County of Fannin.(Wolfe, Larry) [Transferred from gand on 4/18/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
10 | 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant Rite Aid of Georgia, Inc. Motion to Dismiss and to Stay Initial Filings by County of Fannin.(Wolfe, Larry) [Transferred from gand on 4/18/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
11 | 11 ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant Rite Aid of Georgia, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Fannin County, Georgia shall have until thirty (30) days after the earlier of either any ruling by this Court on Plaintiff's motion to remand or a decision by the JPML on whether to transfer this case to the MDL to file its response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Additionally, the Court will stay the preliminary initial filings under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules for the Northern District of Georgia, including the Certificate of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement, the Initial Disclosures, and the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The stay of Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and the stay of the beginning of the discovery period are hereby continued. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/4/2018. (dgr) [Transferred from gand on 4/18/2019.] | |
Friday, December 07, 2018 | ||
12 | 12 ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendants Shelli Liston, Heather Weaver, Lori Fuller, and Rodney Davis's Motion to Dismiss. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Fannin County, Georgia shall have until thirty (30) days after the earlier of either any ruling by this Court on Plaintiff's motion to remand or a decision by the JPML on whether to transfer this case to the MDL to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/07/2018. (rsg) [Transferred from gand on 4/18/2019.] | |
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
13 | 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re7 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION to Expedite the Ruling Cardinal Health's Opposition to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Remand and Motion for an Expedited Ruling filed by Cardinal Health, Inc..(Menk, Jacqueline) [Transferred from gand on 4/18/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit to Motion | ||
14 | 14 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation with Brief In Support by Cardinal Health, Inc..(Menk, Jacqueline) Modified on 12/14/2018 to remove duplicative wording (sk). [Transferred from gand on 4/18/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law ISO, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F | ||
Tuesday, December 18, 2018 | ||
15 | 15 REPLY in Support re7 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION to Expedite the Ruling filed by County of Fannin. (Wolfe, Larry) Modified on 12/19/2018 (sk). [Transferred from gand on 4/18/2019.] | |
16 | 16 MOTION for Oral Argument re7 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION to Expedite the Ruling by County of Fannin. (Wolfe, Larry) [Transferred from gand on 4/18/2019.] | |
Wednesday, December 19, 2018 | ||
Submission of7 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION to Expedite the Ruling , to District Judge Richard W. Story. (sk) [Transferred from gand on 4/18/2019.] | ||
Thursday, December 27, 2018 | ||
17 | 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re14 Proposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by County of Fannin.(Wolfe, Larry) [Transferred from gand on 4/18/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 | ||
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
Submission of16 MOTION for Oral Argument re7 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION to Expedite the Ruling , to District Judge Richard W. Story. (sk) [Transferred from gand on 4/18/2019.] | ||
Thursday, January 10, 2019 | ||
Submission of14 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation , to District Judge Richard W. Story. (sk) [Transferred from gand on 4/18/2019.] | ||
18 | 18 RESPONSE in Support re14 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Menk, Jacqueline) Modified on 1/10/2019 to correct text (sk). [Transferred from gand on 4/18/2019.] | |
Tuesday, February 05, 2019 | ||
19 | 19 MOTION for Extension of Time For Defendant McKesson Corporation to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint by McKesson Corporation.(Knapp, Halsey) [Transferred from gand on 4/18/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order | ||
Wednesday, February 06, 2019 | ||
20 | 20 ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Time for McKesson Corporation to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the period in which the McKesson Corporation must answer, object, plead, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and raise Fed. R. Civ. Pro. Rule 12 defenses is extended to 45 days after any ruling by the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 2/6/2019. (dgr) [Transferred from gand on 4/18/2019.] | |
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
21 | 21 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): Tuesday, April 30, 2019, through and including Wednesday, May 8, 2019, and Tuesday, May 28, 2019, through and including Friday, May 31, 2019, and Wednesday, June 12, 2019, through and including Friday, June 14, 2019, and Wednesday, July 3, 2019, through and including Wednesday, July 10, 2019., by Larry David Wolfe. (Wolfe, Larry) [Transferred from gand on 4/18/2019.] | |
Friday, April 05, 2019 | ||
Case electronically transferred to District of Northern District of Ohio for inclusion in MDL No. 2804. (rsg) [Transferred from gand on 4/18/2019.] | ||
Civil Case Terminated. (rsg) [Transferred from gand on 4/18/2019.] | ||
22 | 22 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Case to be transferred to Northern District of Ohio for inclusion in MDL No. 2804. (rsg) [Transferred from gand on 4/18/2019.] | |
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
23 | 23 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Georgia Northern. Case number 2:18-cv-00220. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |