City of Rome, New York v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45284 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2019 |
Case in other court: | New York Northern, 6:19-cv-00376 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:33 PM EST |
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Anda Inc
|
|
Defendant
Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Associated Pharmacies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Stuart D. Baker
|
|
Defendant
CVS Albany, LLC
|
|
Defendant
CVS Indiana, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS RX Services, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 110, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Depomed, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
John Doe
Toledo, OH 43608
|
|
Defendant
John Doe Corporation
|
|
Defendant
#1-10 John Does
|
|
Defendant
Endo Generics Holding, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith LLC
|
|
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Indivior, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
8741 Landmark Road
Richmond, VA 23228 |
|
Defendant
McKesson Specialty Care Distribution Corporation
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Institutional, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Omnicare Distribution Center LLC
|
|
Defendant
Omnicare of New York, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Omnicare, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technology
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technology Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of New York, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
50 West Broad St., Suite 1330
Columbus, OH 43215 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Elizabeth LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Kadian LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc. (f/k/a Watson Laboratories, Inc. Florida)
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. (f/k/a Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Salt Lake City))
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis South Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Totowa LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Sales, LLC
|
|
Defendant
BR Holdings Associates L.P.
|
|
Defendant
BR Holdings Associates, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Beacon Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bellco Drug Corp.
|
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith Holding Company
|
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith Holdings, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Kinray, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kinray, LLC
|
|
Defendant
PLP Associates Holdings Inc. f/k/a Purdue Holdings Inc.
|
|
Defendant
PLP Associates Holdings L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Holdings, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rosebay Medical Company L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rosebay Medical Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Rome, New York
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories NY, Inc. (f/k/a Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Copiague))
Terminated: 11/04/2019
|
Docket last updated: 06/24/2019 5:00 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 28, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporaton, Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc., Associated Pharmacies, Inc., Stuart D. Baker, CVS Albany, LLC, CVS Indiana, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS RX Services, Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Depomed, Inc., John Doe, John Doe Corporation, John Does, Endo Generics Holding, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H.D. Smith, LLC, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Indivior, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises, LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Mallinckrodt, LLC, McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., McKesson Specialty Care Distribution Corporation, McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC, Mylan Institutional, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Omnicare Distribution Center, LLC, Omnicare of New York, LLC, Omnicare, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P., Rhodes Technology, Rhodes Technology, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of New York, Inc., Beverly Sackler, David A Sackler, Jonathan D Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard S Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Sandoz, Inc., Specgx, LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Trust for the Benefit of members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walmart Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 4694399) filed by The City of Rome, New York.(jdp, ) [Transferred from nynd on 4/18/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Friday, March 29, 2019 | ||
TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe/ John Does/ John Does Corporation in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summonses for service of process on a "John Doe" defendant at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against these defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identities. When plaintiff determines the identity of the "John Doe" defendants, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendants pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons will be issued at that time. (jdp, ) [Transferred from nynd on 4/18/2019.] | ||
2 | 2 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporaton, Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc., Associated Pharmacies, Inc., Stuart D. Baker, CVS Albany, LLC, CVS Indiana, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS RX Services, Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Depomed, Inc., John Doe, John Doe Corporation, John Does, Endo Generics Holding, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H.D. Smith, LLC, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Indivior, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises, LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Mallinckrodt, LLC, McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., McKesson Specialty Care Distribution Corporation, McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC, Mylan Institutional, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Omnicare Distribution Center, LLC, Omnicare of New York, LLC, Omnicare, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P., Rhodes Technology, Rhodes Technology, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of New York, Inc., Beverly Sackler, David A Sackler, Jonathan D Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard S Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Sandoz, Inc., Specgx, LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Trust for the Benefit of members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walmart Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp..(jdp, ) [Transferred from nynd on 4/18/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 7 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 8 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 9 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 10 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 11 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 12 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 13 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 14 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 15 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 16 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 17 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 18 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 19 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 20 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 21 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 22 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 23 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 24 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 25 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 26 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 27 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 28 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 29 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 30 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 31 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 32 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 33 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 34 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 35 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 36 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 37 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 38 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 39 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 40 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 41 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 42 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 43 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 44 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 45 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 46 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 47 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 48 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 49 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 50 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 51 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 52 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 53 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 54 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 55 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 56 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 57 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 58 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 59 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 60 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 61 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 62 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 63 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 64 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 65 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 66 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 67 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 68 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 69 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 70 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 71 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 72 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 73 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 74 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 75 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 76 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 77 Summons Issued | ||
3 | 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 7/2/2019 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/25/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jdp, ) [Transferred from nynd on 4/18/2019.] | |
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Northern District of Ohio for inclusion into MDL-2804 National Prescription Opiate Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Dan A. Polster, U.S. District Judge. (plp) [Transferred from nynd on 4/18/2019.] | |
5 | 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New York Northern. Case number 6:19-cv-00376. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |