WINTERS v 3M COMPANY
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-00791 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Missouri Western, 4:19-cv-00120 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 16, 2019 5:13 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRIAN WINTERS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, November 04, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 11/04 3:36 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT MASTER SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by BRIAN WINTERS. (HUTSON, SHELLEY) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/21 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR on behalf of 3M COMPANY (BEALL, CHARLES) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/26 9:43 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by SHELLEY VAN NATTER HUTSON on behalf of BRIAN WINTERS (HUTSON, SHELLEY) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/25 4:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM MICHAEL MORELAND on behalf of BRIAN WINTERS (MORELAND, WILLIAM) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/25 3:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A LOVE on behalf of BRIAN WINTERS (LOVE, SCOTT) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/25 1:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CLAYTON A CLARK on behalf of BRIAN WINTERS (CLARK, CLAYTON) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/24 4:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS P CARTMELL on behalf of BRIAN WINTERS (CARTMELL, THOMAS) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY)
Fri 04/19 9:37 AM
Case transferred in from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 4:19-cv-00120. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
6 | 6 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER, CTO-2, from John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel, transferring case to Northern District of Florida to be included in MDL No. 2885. Signed on April 16, 2019. Case electronically transferred. (Jones, Robin) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/19/2019.] | |
Wednesday, April 10, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 STATUS REPORT by 3M Company.(Crabb, Michael) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/19/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Conditional Transfer Order | ||
Thursday, April 04, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 ORDER granting Defendant's3 unopposed motion to stay. This action is STAYED pending a determination by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL No. 2885, of whether to consolidate and transfer this case. Defendant shall file a status update within 30 days after a decision by the panel. Signed on 4/4/2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Phillips, Caleb) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/19/2019.] | |
Monday, April 01, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 Consent MOTION to stay Pending JPML's Determination Regarding Consolidation filed by Michael T. Crabb on behalf of 3M Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Michael T. Crabb added to party 3M Company(pty:dft))(Crabb, Michael) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/19/2019.] | |
Wednesday, February 20, 2019 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Woods, Gloria) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/19/2019.] | |
Att: 1 MAP General Order | ||
Tuesday, February 19, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company filed by Jeffrey M. Kuntz on behalf of Brian Winters. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6180571. Service due by 5/20/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/19/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |