Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-00798
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 19, 2019
Case in other court:Missouri Western, 4:19-cv-00202
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 16, 2019 4:47 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Represented By
CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR.
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola Fl
contact info
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By
CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR.
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
RICK SCISM
Represented By
Brandon J.B. Boulware
Boulware Law LLC
contact info
Erin D Lawrence
Boulware Law LLC
contact info
BRANDON BOULWARE
Boulware Law Llc - Kansas City Mo
contact info
JEREMY M SUHR
Boulware Law Llc - Kansas City Mo
contact info
ERIN D LAWRENCE
Boulware Law Llc - Kansas City Mo
contact info
Jeremy M. Suhr
Boulware Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, October 25, 2019
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 10/25 9:40 AM
MASTER SHORT FORM FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by RICK SCISM. (BOULWARE, BRANDON)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2019
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/15 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR on behalf of 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (BEALL, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2019
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 06/14 4:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by RICK SCISM. AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (BOULWARE, BRANDON)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 06/14 4:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by RICK SCISM. 3M COMPANY served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (BOULWARE, BRANDON)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2019
10 10 service Summons Issued Thu 05/16 7:49 AM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY, #1 AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2019
9 9 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 04/30 9:43 AM
NOTICE of Summons to Issue to Aearo Technologies, LLC by RICK SCISM (BOULWARE, BRANDON)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 04/30 9:42 AM
NOTICE of Summons to Issue to 3M Company by RICK SCISM (BOULWARE, BRANDON)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2019
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/23 9:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN D LAWRENCE on behalf of RICK SCISM (LAWRENCE, ERIN)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/23 9:41 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JEREMY M SUHR on behalf of RICK SCISM (SUHR, JEREMY)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/23 9:33 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRANDON BOULWARE on behalf of RICK SCISM (BOULWARE, BRANDON)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2019
4 4 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Fri 04/19 10:01 AM
Case transferred in from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 4:19-cv-00202. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2019
3 3 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER, CTO-2, from John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel, transferring case to Northern District of Florida to be included in MDL No. 2885. Signed on April 16, 2019. Case electronically transferred. (Jones, Robin) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/19/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2019
2 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Ellis, Lindsey) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/19/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Brandon J.B. Boulware on behalf of Rick Scism. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6226987. Service due by 6/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Boulware, Brandon) (Ellis, Lindsey). [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/19/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/20/2019) Civil Cover Sheet