Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-00810
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 19, 2019
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:19-cv-00734
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 16, 2019 4:24 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Represented By
BENJAMIN W HULSE
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR.
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
ETHAN STUPKA
Represented By
Yvonne M Flaherty
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
SHELLEY VAN NATTER HUTSON
Clark Love & Hutson Gp - Houston Tx
contact info
WILLIAM MICHAEL MORELAND
Clark Love & Hutson Gp - Houston Tx
contact info
YVONNE FLAHERTY
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
SCOTT A LOVE
Clark Love & Hutson Gp - Houston Tx
contact info
CLAYTON A CLARK
Clark Love & Hutson Gp - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, November 04, 2019
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/04 1:52 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT MASTER SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by ETHAN STUPKA. (HUTSON, SHELLEY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2019
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/10 4:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR on behalf of 3M COMPANY (BEALL, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2019
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/26 9:41 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by SHELLEY VAN NATTER HUTSON on behalf of ETHAN STUPKA (HUTSON, SHELLEY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2019
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/25 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM MICHAEL MORELAND on behalf of ETHAN STUPKA (MORELAND, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/25 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A LOVE on behalf of ETHAN STUPKA (LOVE, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/25 1:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CLAYTON A CLARK on behalf of ETHAN STUPKA (CLARK, CLAYTON)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2019
9 9 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Fri 04/19 12:42 PM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-00734. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2019
8 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO- 3) from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation; transferring case to the Northern District of Florida for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rogers. Associated Cases: 0:19-cv-00732-JRT-KMM et al.(JME) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/19/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2019
7 7 (Text-only) ORDER STAYING CASE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that these proceedings are stayed in their entirety, including, without limitation, Defendant's obligation to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, until such time as the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation determines whether this matter will be transferred to an MDL and, if so, in what jurisdiction. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 4/4/2019. (KAT) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/19/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2019
6 6 STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL by 3M Company. Jointly Signed by Ethan Stupka. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/19/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2019
5 5 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez for all further proceedings. Judge Susan Richard Nelson, Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-734 JRT/KMM . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim, Judge Joan N. Ericksen, Judge Susan Richard Nelson, Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright, Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 3/26/2019 and by Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 3/27/2019. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/19/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2019
4 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Clayton A. Clark, Scott A. Love, W. Michael Moreland as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/19/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Summons Issued as to 3M Company. (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/19/2019.]
Related: [-]
2 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil 3rd, 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-734 (SRN/SER). (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/19/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6740604) filed by Ethan Stupka. Filer requests summons issued. (Flaherty, Yvonne) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/19/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet