Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-00836
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 19, 2019
Terminated:Oct 16, 2019
Case in other court:Missouri Western, 6:19-cv-03039
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 16, 2019 4:18 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Represented By
CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR.
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola Fl
contact info
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By
CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR.
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER JOHNSON
Represented By
ASHLEY C. KELLER
Keller Lenkner LLC
contact info
TRAVIS D LENKNER
Keller Lenkner Llc - Chicago Il
contact info
ASHLEY CONRAD KELLER
Keller Lenkner Llc - Chicago Il
contact info
Tim J. Riemann
Funk Riemann LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, October 16, 2019
15 15 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 10/16 3:23 PM
CLERK'S DISMISSAL re14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice (djb)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 10/16 11:44 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CHRISTOPHER JOHNSON (KELLER, ASHLEY)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2019
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/19 4:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR on behalf of 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (BEALL, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2019
12 12 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 06/17 2:05 PM
NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2019
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/26 2:05 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHRISTOPHER JOHNSON. AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC waiver sent on 4/18/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (KELLER, ASHLEY)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2019
10 10 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Fri 04/19 4:03 PM
Case transferred in from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 6:19-cv-03039. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2019
9 9 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER, CTO-2, from John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel, transferring case to Florida Northern to be included in MDL No. 2885. Signed on 4/16/19. Case electronically transferred. (James, Carrie) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/19/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2019
8 8 ORDER granting5 &6 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Travis D Lenkner and Ashley C Keller for Christopher Johnson allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at [LINK:PACER] . This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/19/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2019
7 7 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Christopher Johnson. Waiver sent to 3M Company on 2/14/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Keller, Ashley) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/19/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 11, 2019
6 6 Motion to allow Ashley Keller to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6169677) filed by Tim J. Riemann on behalf of Christopher Johnson. (Riemann, Tim) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/19/2019.]
Related: [-]
5 5 Motion to allow Travis Lenkner to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6169663) filed by Tim J. Riemann on behalf of Christopher Johnson. (Riemann, Tim) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/19/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 01, 2019
4 4 ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER. Pursuant to the Order of the Honorable Brian C. Wimes, this case was reassigned to the Honorable Stephen R. Bough for all further proceedings. Please note the new case number: 6 19-3039 CV-S-SRB. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Burch, Steve) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/19/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER OF TRANSFER: Pursuant to L.R. 83.9(c), the Clerk of the Court is directed to take all necessary steps to transfer this matter to District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 2/1/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/19/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 31, 2019
2 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Keller, Jeanne) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/19/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
Wednesday, January 30, 2019
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Tim J. Riemann on behalf of Christopher Johnson. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6150139. Service due by 4/30/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Riemann, Tim) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/19/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet