Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:19-cr-01014
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Apr 20, 2019 12:45 AM MST
Defendant
Rafael Munoz-Molina (1)
Represented By
Joel C Parris
Joel Craig Parris
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Arturo A Aguilar
Us Attorneys Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/20/2019 1:19 AM MST
Thursday, March 21, 2019
Arrest of Rafael Munoz-Molina on 3/21/2019. (ADI-MLH, ) [4:19-mj-08689-N/A-LAB]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2019
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Rafael Munoz-Molina. (ADI-MLH, ) [4:19-mj-08689-N/A-LAB]
Related: [-]
2 2 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro: Initial Appearance Without Counsel as to Rafael Munoz-Molina held on 3/22/2019. Defendant(s) state true name to be the same. An attorney is appointed to represent the defendant(s). Government's motion for detention and request for continuance of the Detention Hearing is granted. Defendants temporarily detained in the custody of the U.S. Marshal., Interpreter required for Rafael Munoz-Molina (1) Spanish., Appearances : AUSA Jesse Figueroa(duty) for the Government. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Ignacio Barrientos assists defendant. Detention Hearing set for 3/26/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau. Preliminary Hearing set for 3/26/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau. Related [+] Hearing held 02:06 PM to 02:35 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ADI-REC, ) [4:19-mj-08689-N/A-LAB]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
3 3 MINUTE ORDER: Added appointed attorney Joel C Parris (CJA) for Rafael Munoz-Molina. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MYE, ) [4:19-mj-08689-N/A-LAB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2019
5 5 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau: Detention Hearing as to Rafael Munoz-Molina held on 3/26/2019. Defendant ordered detained pending trial., Preliminary Hearing as to Rafael Munoz-Molina waived on 3/26/2019. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court.. Assigning attorney Arturo A Aguilar for USA., Magistrate case referral is Judge Bowman. Appearances : AUSA Anna Wright, attorney on duty for the Government, CJA Attorney Joel Parris for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Leilanie Solis assists defendant. Related [+] Hearing held 10:28 AM to 11:01 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ADI-CXE, ) [4:19-mj-08689-N/A-LAB]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
6 6 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Rafael Munoz-Molina. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau on 3/26/2019.(ADI-CXE, ) [4:19-mj-08689-N/A-LAB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
7 7 INDICTMENT Related [+] as to Rafael Munoz-Molina (1) count(s) 1. Arraignment set for 5/3/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro. ***NOTICE: Counsel is advised as to ARRAIGNMENT set, TRIAL date is 6/11/2019 at 9:30 AM, and PLEA DEADLINE is 5/24/2019. NOTE: Notice of Intent to Waive Defendant's Presence at Arraignment shall be filed no later than Wednesday prior to arraignment. (ADI-MCO, )
Related: [-] dacted for Public Disclosure
8 8 SEALED UNREDACTED INDICTMENT as to Rafael Munoz-Molina. (ADI-MCO, )
Related: [-]