Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin Gross
Case #: 1:19-bk-10872
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2019
Terminated:Sep 13, 2019
Plan Confirmed:Jun 18, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Fuse, LLC
700 N Central Ave Ste 600
Glendale, CA 91203-3438
Represented By
James E. O'Neill
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801

Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago
Thursday, July 01, 2021
345 345 claims Records Transmittal & Receipt - SF135 Thu 07/01 6:40 PM
Records Transmittal & Receipt - SF135. Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 25, 2021
344 344 claims Claims Register Fri 06/25 4:06 PM
Claims Register Alphabetical and Numerical Order . Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Numerical