Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-00872
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2019
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:19-cv-00595
Last checked: Saturday Oct 19, 2019 5:38 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Represented By
JERRY W BLACKWELL
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
S Jamal Faleel
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR.
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola Fl
contact info
BENJAMIN W HULSE
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By
Faris Rashid
Greene Espel Pllp
contact info
CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR.
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
RAMSES BYRON
Represented By
ALICIA N SIEBEN
Schwebel, Goetz & Sieben
contact info
WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Schwebel Goetz & Sieben, P.A.
contact info
MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Schwebel, Goetz & Sieben
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
ANDREW COONEY
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
ALICIA N SIEBEN
Schwebel, Goetz & Sieben
contact info
WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Schwebel Goetz & Sieben, P.A.
contact info
MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Schwebel, Goetz & Sieben
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMES COSGROVE
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
ALICIA N SIEBEN
Schwebel, Goetz & Sieben
contact info
WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Schwebel Goetz & Sieben, P.A.
contact info
MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Schwebel, Goetz & Sieben
contact info
Plaintiff
STEVEN GAMBLAIN
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
ALICIA N SIEBEN
Schwebel, Goetz & Sieben
contact info
WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Schwebel Goetz & Sieben, P.A.
contact info
MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Schwebel, Goetz & Sieben
contact info
Plaintiff
ADAM JOHNSON
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
ALICIA N SIEBEN
Schwebel, Goetz & Sieben
contact info
WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Schwebel Goetz & Sieben, P.A.
contact info
MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Schwebel, Goetz & Sieben
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, February 20, 2020
17 17 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 02/20 1:28 PM
MASTER SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, filed by RAMSES BYRON. (djb)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Docket Annotation Thu 02/20 1:24 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Counsel Re15 Answer to Complaint filed by RAMSES BYRON, was filed using the incorrect civil event. The amended complaint will be refiled by the clerk. (djb)
Related: [-]
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/20 12:57 PM
Amended Short Form Complaint: Case No. 3:19-cv-872 ANSWER to Complaint by RAMSES BYRON. (CORNELL, KATHERINE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2020
14 14 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 02/13 7:33 AM
ORDER - Accordingly, pursuant to Pretrial Order No. 17, Mr. Byron was required to file a Short Form Complaint by November 5, 2019. See Case No. 3:19md2885, ECF No. 763 at 2. More than 90 days have elapsed since that deadline and no Short Form Complaint has been filed. On consideration, the Court will afford Mr. Byron one final opportunity to file a Short Form Complaint by 2/20/2020 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/13/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2019
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Thu 11/21 9:44 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:13 Order, (First named Plaintiff has not timely filed a short-form/amended complaint) (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2019
13 13 8 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 10/16 8:54 AM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 MULTI-PLAINTIFF ACTIONS. All plaintiffs named in any multi-plaintiff complaint currently pending in this MDL, except derivative plaintiffs, will be severed. For multi-plaintiff actions in which no remand motion is currently pending, all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short form complaint in the approved form, currently available on the master docket for the MDL at ECF No. 705. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of this Order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual docket for each action refiled by a severed plaintiff pursuant to this Order, whether the action is direct filed in this district or transferred here by the Panel. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2019. STEVEN GAMBLAIN, ADAM JOHNSON, ANDREW COONEY and JAMES COSGROVE terminated. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2019
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/19 4:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR on behalf of 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (BEALL, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2019
11 11 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Mon 04/22 10:31 AM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-00595. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2019
10 10 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO- 3) from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation; transferring case to the Northern District of Florida for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rogers. Associated Cases: 0:19-cv-00569-JRT-KMM et al.(JME) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/22/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2019
9 9 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez for all further proceedings. Judge Michael J. Davis, Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-595 JRT/KMM . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim, Judge Patrick J. Schiltz, Judge Eric C. Tostrud, on 3/12/2019. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 3/13/2019. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 3/15/2019. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 3/19/2019.(MMG) Modified text on 3/21/2019 (MMG). [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/22/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2019
8 8 STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL by 3M Company. Jointly Signed by Ramses Byron. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/22/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
7 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/22/2019.]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies LLC re1 Notice of Removal,, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/22/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2019
5 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19cv595 MJD/TNL. (AKL) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/22/2019.]
Related: [-]
4 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Adam Pulaski; Steven Kherkher as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (AKL) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/22/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re1 Notice of Removal,,2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/22/2019.]
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/22/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial District, Hennepin County, case number 27-cv 19-2671 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6723111) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/22/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Order Companioning Cases,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) State Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) State Affidavit of Service on 3M,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) State Affidavit of Service on Aearo Technologies LLC,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) Notice of Judicial Assignment,
Att: 7 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet