Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-00902
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2019
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:19-cv-00531
Last checked: Monday Oct 21, 2019 6:28 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Represented By
CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR.
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola Fl
contact info
JERRY W BLACKWELL
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
S Jamal Faleel
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
BENJAMIN W HULSE
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By
CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR.
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola Fl
contact info
Faris Rashid
Greene Espel Pllp
contact info
Plaintiff
SHAUN RIFFE
Represented By
SHAWN FOX
Tracey & Fox Law Firm - Houston Tx
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Tracey & Fox Law Firm - Houston Tx
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, November 05, 2019
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 11/05 9:38 AM
Short Form Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by SHAUN RIFFE. (TRACEY, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2019
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/19 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR on behalf of 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (BEALL, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2019
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/15 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SEAN PATRICK TRACEY on behalf of SHAUN RIFFE (TRACEY, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2019
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/30 12:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SHAWN FOX on behalf of SHAUN RIFFE (FOX, SHAWN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2019
12 12 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Tue 04/23 8:00 AM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-00531. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
11 11 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO- 3) from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation; transferring case to the Northern District of Florida for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rogers. Associated Cases: 0:19-cv-00392-JRT-KMM et al.(JLB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/23/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
10 10 (Text-only) ORDER STAYING CASE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that these proceedings are stayed in their entirety. This stay includes any obligation on the part of the defendants to Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. In order to promote efficient and organized management of this litigation, this case will remain stayed until further order of the Court, following a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation regarding whether this case will be transferred to an MDL. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 3/13/2019. (KAT) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/23/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
9 9 STIPULATION re1 Notice of Removal,, to Extend Deadline for Responsive Pleading by 3M Company. Jointly Signed by Plaintiff Shaun Riffe and Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/23/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2019
8 8 ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez for all further proceedings. Judge Michael J. Davis, Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-531 (JRT/KMM) . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim, Judge Patrick J. Schiltz, Judge Eric C. Tostrud, and Judge Michael J. Davis on 3/06/2019, and by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 3/07/2019.(lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/23/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
7 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/23/2019.]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies, LLC re1 Notice of Removal,, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/23/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2019
5 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-531 (MJD/DTS). (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/23/2019.]
Related: [-]
4 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Sean Patrick Tracey, Shawn P. Fox, Clinton Casperson, Mikal C. Watts, Francisco Guerra IV, Erin Rogiers as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/23/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement,1 Notice of Removal,, (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/23/2019.]
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/23/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number 27-cv 19-2292 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6709511) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested.. (Hulse, Benjamin) Modified text on 3/5/2019 (lmb). [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/23/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 State Court Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Notice of Judicial Assignment,
Att: 4 Affidavit of Service,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) Order Companion Cases,
Att: 6 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 7 Federal Civil Cover Sheet